Utoh v. Capital One, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel Utoh
Defendant: Capital One National Association, Capital One Services, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv00412
Filed: February 27, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice 23 is granted. ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), this matter, and all claims asserted therein, is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 06/12/15. (jhawk, )
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/26/2015 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/09/15. (jhawk, )
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/26/2015 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Entered by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 03/06/15. (jhawk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Utoh v. Capital One, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Utoh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One National Association
Represented By: John Charles Crees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Services, LLC
Represented By: John Charles Crees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?