Hinman v. Joyce et al

Plaintiff: Brian Hinman
Defendant: Jonathan Joyce and City and County of Denver, Colorado
Case Number: 1:2015cv00751
Filed: April 10, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2016 79 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 77 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery Deadline and Dispositive Motion Deadline, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/25/2016. Discovery due by 4/8/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 4/22/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/09/2016 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 6/22/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty.(slibi, )
January 28, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Quash; Motion Hearing held on 1/28/2016. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
November 16, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Plaintiff's Conversion Motion, WITHDRAWING 38 Reference to Magistrate Judge of Defendant's Motion to Stay, and DENYING Defendant's 37 Motion to Stay, by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/16/2015.(cthom, )
October 23, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 15 City and County of Denver's Motion to Dismiss, by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/23/2015.(cthom, )
July 30, 2015 33 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: granting without prejudice 28 Motion to Quash; Motion Hearing held on 7/30/2015. FTR: Courtroom A 501. (mdave, )
June 29, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/29/2015. (mdave, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinman v. Joyce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Hinman
Represented By: Raymond K. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Joyce
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Evan P. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver, Colorado
Represented By: Conor Daniel Farley
Represented By: Evan P. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?