Gama v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Lori Gama
Defendant: US Bank National Association and Nationstar Mortgage
Case Number: 1:2015cv00814
Filed: April 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 14 Motion to Remand, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/16/2015.(slibi, )
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Civil Trial Procedures Order; The FPTC/TPC will be held on March 1, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom A401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. Trial counsel must attend in person. Proposed Final Pretrial Order due on 2/23/2016. The 3-day Bench Trial is set to begin on April 4, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom A401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/1/2015. (morti, )
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/20/15. (lgale, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gama v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Gama
Represented By: Matthew Shawn Coombs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?