Wolf et al v. Schadegg et al

Plaintiff: David J. Wolf and Wolf Auto Center Sterling, LLC
Defendant: Michael Schadegg and Shawn Cochran
Case Number: 1:2015cv01035
Filed: May 15, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER; Defendants' Answer 50 is STRICKEN without prejudice. 52 Motion to Correct and 61 Motion to Extend are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to correct the captionof this case as indicated on the caption of this Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/2/16.(morti, )
March 21, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/21/16. Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) # 12 is DENIED.(lgale, )
March 9, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/9/16. Motion to Amend Complaint and Add Additional Parties # 36 is DENIED.(lgale, )
January 22, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/22/16. (lgale, )
December 30, 2015 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/30/15. Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint to Add Additional Parties and File Corrected Page to the Same # 33 is DENIED without prejudice.(lgale, )
November 5, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER; 29 Stipulated Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order is GRANTED, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/5/15.(morti, )
September 24, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated ORDER re: 26 Stipulation filed by David J. Wolf, Wolf Auto Center Sterling, LLC, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/24/15. (morti, )
September 17, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Civil Trial Procedures Order, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/17/15. (morti, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolf et al v. Schadegg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David J. Wolf
Represented By: Craig D. Joyce
Represented By: Michelle Renee Magruder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wolf Auto Center Sterling, LLC
Represented By: Craig D. Joyce
Represented By: Michelle Renee Magruder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Schadegg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?