Zeller v. Ventures Trust 2013-I-NH
Plaintiff: Penelope Zeller
Defendant: Ventures Trust 2013-I-NH, MCM Capital Partners LLC and Debra Johnson
Case Number: 1:2015cv01077
Filed: May 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Presiding Judge: Nina Y. Wang
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Accepting Magistrate Judge's Recommendation. Ordered that the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 85 isaccepted. Ordered that the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 76 is granted. Ordered that the judgment shall enter in favor of defendants on all of plaintiff's remaining claims. Ordered that this case is closed. Signed by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/19/16. (jhawk, )
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 02/24/16, Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 3/17/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Amended Ex-parte Forthwith Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Request for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue Prohibiting Defendant Eagle Vista From Evicting Plaintiff from Her Home Located at 3030 Saint Paul Street in Denver Colorado 41 is DENIED. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/11/15.(pabsec)
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying without prejudice 37 Motion for TRO by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 08/10/15.(jhawk, )
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 06/08/15 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference for 8/14/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Motion Hearing held on 5/28/2015. ORDER denying 8 Motion for Order. Court Reporter: Janet Coppock. (kpreu)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeller v. Ventures Trust 2013-I-NH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penelope Zeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventures Trust 2013-I-NH
Represented By: Jennifer C. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCM Capital Partners LLC
Represented By: Jennifer C. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?