My24HourNews.Com, Inc. v. AT&T Corporation

Plaintiff: My24HourNews.Com, Inc.
Defendant: AT&T Corporation
Case Number: 1:2015cv01210
Filed: June 9, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Referring Judge: Nina Y. Wang
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2016 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 5/17/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/11/16. (nywlc1)
December 9, 2015 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as MOOT 69 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply; STRIKING for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 70 Motion for Order and 74 Motion for Leave to Restrict, with leave to re-file no later than 12/11/15. The Parties should be prepared to argue 68 Motion for Sanctions and to Compel at the Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang.By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 12/9/15.(nywlc1)
November 19, 2015 64 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/19/15. (bsimm, )
October 22, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery, as described herein. Plaintiff shall propound discovery no later than 10/30/15; Defendant shall respond to discovery requests on or before 11/20/15; Plaintiff shall respond to 46 Motion to Di smiss on or before 12/4/15; any reply shall be filed on or before 12/11/15. A Motion Hearing on 46 Motion to Dismiss is set for 12/18/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/22/15. (nywlc1)
August 24, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 35 Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice. Defendant AT&T, Inc. is hereby dismissed without prejudice from this action. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 08/24/2015. (athom, )
July 10, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/10/15 granting 11 Stipulated Motion to Reschedule July 31, 2015 Scheduling Conference and Extend Related Dates. The Scheduling Conference set for 7/31/2015 is VACATED and reset for 8/19/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (bsimm, )
June 22, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/22/15. A Scheduling Conference is set for 7/31/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed scheduling order in a Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the Scheduling Conference. (bsimm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: My24HourNews.Com, Inc. v. AT&T Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: My24HourNews.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corporation
Represented By: Lee Frederick Johnston
Represented By: Tucker K. Trautman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?