Cooper v. OFS 2 Deal 2, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Tyeler Cooper
Defendant: OFS 2 Deal 2, LLC, KLX Inc. and KLX Energy Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv01291
Filed: June 18, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Referring Judge: Nina Y. Wang
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 17, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Joint Motion for Approval Settlement Agreement, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 03/17/2016.(cthom, ) Modified to correct judge association on 3/17/2016 (cthom, ).
March 10, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Raymond P. Moore: In-Court Hearing held on 3/10/2016, granting 73 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Counsel for defendants shall file a redacted settlement agreement. Court Reporter: Tammy Hoffschildt. (cpear)
November 23, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/23/15 GRANTING 59 Motion to Withdraw Document; 10 Motion to Compel Arbitration is WITHDRAWN. Status Report due by 12/22/2015 to advise the court as to the progress, if any, of resolution and any further amendments of the scheduling order that may be requested.(nmarb, )
September 21, 2015 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Motion as follows: Plaintiff shall have up to and including October 19, 2015 to file a Sur-reply in to the KLX Defendants pending Motion to Compel Arbitration [#10] by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/21/15.(nmarb, )
September 3, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/3/15 striking 28 Motion for Leave to Conduct Discovery and File a Sur-Reply for failure to meet-and-confer. (bsimm, )
July 16, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/16/15. A Scheduling Conference is set for 8/27/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang.T he parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed scheduling order in a Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the Scheduling Conference. (bsimm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. OFS 2 Deal 2, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyeler Cooper
Represented By: Brian David Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFS 2 Deal 2, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KLX Inc.
Represented By: Dan Hartsfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KLX Energy Services LLC
Represented By: Dan Hartsfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?