Clementson v. UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Dany L. Clementson |
Defendant: |
UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc., Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC |
Counter_defendant: |
Dany L. Clementson |
Thirdparty_defendant: |
Cynthia Clementson |
Thirdparty_plaintiff: |
Nationstar Mortgage, LLC |
Counter_claimant: |
Nationstar Mortgage, LLC |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv01318 |
Filed: |
June 19, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
Denver |
Presiding Judge: |
Craig B. Shaffer |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 8, 2016 |
Filing
65
ORDER: Pursuant to the 64 Stipulated Dismissal With Prejudice, this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/8/2016. (ebuch)
|
October 7, 2015 |
Filing
51
ORDER denying 50 Pro se Plaintiff's Contested Motion for Reconsideration of His Motion for Remand, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/7/2015. (ebuch)
|
September 23, 2015 |
Filing
45
ORDER denying 32 Plaintiff's Motion for Remand to the District Court for Jefferson County Colorado, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/23/2015. (ebuch)
|
September 4, 2015 |
Filing
43
ORDER regarding 36 Stipulated Motion to Amend Dismissal Without Prejudice to a Dismissal With Prejudice. This matter shall be dismissed with prejudice as to Defendants Bank of America, N.A., MERSCORP Holdings, Inc., and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., only, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/4/2015. (ebuch)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Clementson v. UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Dany L. Clementson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. |
Represented By: |
Justin Donald Balser |
Represented By: |
Taylor T. Haywood |
Represented By: |
Dennis Norman Lueck, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC |
Represented By: |
Justin Donald Balser |
Represented By: |
Taylor T. Haywood |
Represented By: |
Dennis Norman Lueck, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_defendant: Dany L. Clementson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Thirdparty_defendant: Cynthia Clementson |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC |
Represented By: |
Justin Donald Balser |
Represented By: |
Taylor T. Haywood |
Represented By: |
Dennis Norman Lueck, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter_claimant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC |
Represented By: |
Justin Donald Balser |
Represented By: |
Taylor T. Haywood |
Represented By: |
Dennis Norman Lueck, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?