Lassley et al v. Aminokit Laboratories, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Julia Walker and Brandon Lassley
Defendant: Aminokit Laboratories, Inc., Tamea Rae Sisco, White Lodging Services Corporation, Tamea (I) Rae Sisco and Jonathon Lee
Case Number: 1:2015cv01531
Filed: July 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MINUTE ORDER granting 88 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and to Add Claim for Negligence Against Defendant White Lodging, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/04/2016.(slibi, )
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 85 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint to Add Claim for Negligence Against Defendant White Lodging, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/29/2016.(slibi, )
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 01/26/16 DENYING 79 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify; DENYING 79 Motion for Hearing/Conference.(nmarb, )
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Adopting 63 Report and Recommendations That defendants Renewed Partial Motion To Dismiss Based on Statute of Limitations 49 , filed October 22, 2015, is denied, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/23/2015.(evana, )
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTE ORDER granting 65 Defendant White Lodging Service Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Entry of "Eyes Only" Protective Order. Written Eyes Only Protective Order (65-1) is approved and made an Order of Court. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/17/2015. (emill)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 EYES ONLY PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/16/2015. (emill)
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/03/2015. (slibi, )
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2016 01:15 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Nine (9) day Jury Trial set for 9/12/2016 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 8/25/2016 at 01:15 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/19/2015. (mlace, )
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 34 Defendant Jonathan Lee, M.D.'s Joiner in White Lodging Services Corporation's Partial Motion to Dismiss Based on Statute of Limitations; granting 41 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint; denying as moot 16 White Lodging Services Corporation's Partial Motion to Dismiss Based on Statute of Limitations; denying as moot 23 Jonathan Lee, M.D.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/15/2015.(slibi, )
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF PILOT PROGRAM CONSENT FORM On or before 9/8/2015 parties shall complete and file the Pilot Program Consent Form 3 . Consent Form due by 9/8/2015. Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 7/22/2015. (emill)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lassley et al v. Aminokit Laboratories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Walker
Represented By: Jordana Griff Gingrass
Represented By: Jeremy Ira Pollack
Represented By: Jerome Mark Reinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Lassley
Represented By: Jordana Griff Gingrass
Represented By: Jeremy Ira Pollack
Represented By: Jerome Mark Reinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aminokit Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamea Rae Sisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Lodging Services Corporation
Represented By: Lindsey Warren Jay
Represented By: Scott Alan McGath
Represented By: Richard K. Rediger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamea (I) Rae Sisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathon Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?