Macieyovski v. City and County of Devner, Department of General Services

Plaintiff: Vincent Macieyovski
Defendant: City and County of Devner, Department of General Services
Case Number: 1:2015cv01550
Filed: July 22, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Nina Y. Wang
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 52 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 53 Motion for Summary Judgment. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/6/17. (kfinn)
March 8, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/8/16. (bsimm, )
March 7, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/7/16. The Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order 32 is GRANTED; Defendant's Opposing Motion To The Defendant Join And Stipulated Motion For Protective Order is DENIED; and This court will separately enter the Protective Order. (bsimm, )
September 30, 2015 22 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/30/15. Text Only Entry (msksec, )
September 29, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER withdrawing 10 Motion to Dismiss; AND granting 17 Motion to Withdraw Document, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/29/15.(nmarb, )
August 6, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/6/15. A Scheduling Conference is set for 9/29/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed scheduling order in a Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the Scheduling Conference. (bsimm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macieyovski v. City and County of Devner, Department of General Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Macieyovski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Devner, Department of General Services
Represented By: Franklin A. Nachman
Represented By: John-Paul Christopher Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?