Caruso v. Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC

Plaintiff: Shirley Caruso
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv01578
Filed: July 24, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Referring Judge: Nina Y. Wang
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE THE COURT having reviewed the Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice ECF No. 33 pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and being fully advised in the premises, DOES HEREBY ORDER that this case is Dismissed with Prejudice, with each party to pay her or its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/22/2016. (evana, )
September 9, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/09/15. (nmarb, )
August 3, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF PILOT PROGRAM CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/3/15. A Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed scheduling order in a Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the Scheduling Conference. The parties shall complete and file the Pilot Program Consent Form on or before 8/28/2015. (bsimm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caruso v. Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Caruso
Represented By: David Michael Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC
Represented By: Adam F. Aldrich
Represented By: Scott Stephen Gallagher
Represented By: Edward P. Timmins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?