Chen v. CenturyLink
Plaintiff: Julie Chen
Defendant: CenturyLink
Case Number: 1:2015cv01651
Filed: August 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 OPINION AND ORDER by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/18/17. (pglov)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/12/15. (msksec, )
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER Resetting Scheduling Conference or 11/12/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 11/5/2015, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/19/15. (sgrim)
August 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Conference for 10/29/2015 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 10/22/2015, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/5/15. (sgrim)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chen v. CenturyLink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenturyLink
Represented By: Karen H. DuWaldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Chen
Represented By: Francis K. Culkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?