Guarantee Company of North America USA, The v. TK Construction US LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Guarantee Company of North America USA, The |
Defendant: |
TK Construction US, LLC, TK Mining Services, LLC, TK Construction, LLC, Big Sky, LLC, TK Diversified Services, LLC, TK Holdings Ltd, Amy L. Fischer, Keith E. Buhrdorf, David A. Schaaf and Earnest E. Schaaf |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv01668 |
Filed: |
August 5, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Colorado |
Office: |
Denver Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Kathleen M. Tafoya |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 22, 2016 |
Filing
100
ORDER of Administrative Closure. Stipulated Request to Administratively Close Case approved. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/22/2016. (cmira)
|
January 12, 2016 |
Filing
84
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/12/16. (sgrim)
|
January 11, 2016 |
Filing
81
ORDER re: 79 Notice of Automatic Stay and Suggestion of Bankruptcy filed by Amy L. Fischer. It is therefore ORDERED that all proceedings against Defendant Amy L. Fischer are STAYED unless and until relief from the automatic stay in Bankruptcy Case No. 15-23854-MER is granted. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a status report in this case within ten days of any relief from stay in the bankruptcy case, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/11/16. (morti, )
|
December 10, 2015 |
Filing
75
ORDER Motion Hearing for Motion for Preliminary Injunction 63 set for 1/29/2016 02:00 PM before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/10/2015. (mlace, )
|
November 9, 2015 |
Filing
60
TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER Five (5) day Bench Trial set for 10/24/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Trial Preparation Conference set for 10/20/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 11/9/2015. (mlace, )
|
September 29, 2015 |
Filing
36
AMENDED ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/9/2015 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/29/15. (sgrim)
|
August 11, 2015 |
Filing
10
ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/9/2015 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 11/2/2015, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/11/15. (sgrim)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Guarantee Company of North America USA, The v. TK Construction US LLC et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Guarantee Company of North America USA, The |
Represented By: |
Vincent Joseph Wegher |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: TK Construction US, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: TK Mining Services, LLC |
Represented By: |
Shannon Marie Bell |
Represented By: |
William James Kelly, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: TK Construction, LLC |
Represented By: |
Shannon Marie Bell |
Represented By: |
William James Kelly, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Big Sky, LLC |
Represented By: |
Shannon Marie Bell |
Represented By: |
William James Kelly, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: TK Diversified Services, LLC |
Represented By: |
Shannon Marie Bell |
Represented By: |
William James Kelly, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: TK Holdings Ltd |
Represented By: |
Shannon Marie Bell |
Represented By: |
William James Kelly, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Amy L. Fischer |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Keith E. Buhrdorf |
Represented By: |
Shannon Marie Bell |
Represented By: |
William James Kelly, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: David A. Schaaf |
Represented By: |
Shannon Marie Bell |
Represented By: |
William James Kelly, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Earnest E. Schaaf |
Represented By: |
Shannon Marie Bell |
Represented By: |
William James Kelly, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?