Whitaker v. Medicredit, Inc.

Plaintiff: Deloris Whitaker
Defendant: Medicredit, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv01772
Filed: August 17, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE Without Prejudice pursuant to the 34 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/9/2016. (evana, )
January 26, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 01/26/16 granting 31 Stipulated Motion To Extend the Discovery Cutoff Date and Dispositive Motion Deadline. The Scheduling Order is amended as follows: Discovery due by 3/16/2016 and Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2016. The Final PretrialConference remains set on May 3, 2016, at 9:30 a.m.(nmarb, )
September 15, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 9/15/2015. (emill)
August 17, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/17/2015. (evana, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitaker v. Medicredit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deloris Whitaker
Represented By: David Michael Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicredit, Inc.
Represented By: Scott J. Dickenson
Represented By: Alicia Michelle Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?