Oldershaw v. DaVita Healthcare Partners, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kelsey Oldershaw
Defendant: DaVita Healthcare Partners, Inc. and Total Renal Care Inc.
Case Number: 1:2015cv01964
Filed: September 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 215
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 OPINION AND ORDER granting 198 Motion to Decertify, and granting in part and denying in part 199 Motion for Summary Judgment and 209 Motion to Strike, by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/4/19. (dkals, )
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 SUPPLEMENTAL OPINION AND ORDER WITH REGARD TO BIFURCATION OF CLAIMS by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/1/17. (dkals, )
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting 41 Motion to Amend the Stipulated Scheduling and Discovery Order. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 04/21/16.(jhawk, )
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Motion to Vacate Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. The ENE is RESET for 6/28/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Confidential Statements shall be submitted by e-mail in PDF format addressed to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 6/21/2016. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/14/16. (nywlc1)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. The Court, having reviewed representative Plaintiff Kelsey Shaw's Motion to Amend Complaint 28 , hereby GRANTS the Motion but REJECTS the form of Amended Complaint attached as (Doc. 28-1). Plaintiffs shall file a corrected form of Complaint, using the Court's "Amended Complaint" event inCM/ECF, on or before Monday, March 21, 2016. Signed by Judge John L. Kane on 03/14/16.(jhawk, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oldershaw v. DaVita Healthcare Partners, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Oldershaw
Represented By: Colleen Therese Calandra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DaVita Healthcare Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Renal Care Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?