Dallas Buyers Club, LLC v. Doe 1 et al

Plaintiff: Dallas Buyers Club, LLC
Defendant: John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, John Doe 4, John Doe 5, John Doe 6, John Doe 7, John Doe 8, John Doe 9, John Doe 10, John Doe 11 and John Doe 12
Case Number: 1:2015cv02264
Filed: October 13, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 4, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 28 Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, it is ORDERED that Defendant John Doe 3 is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from this action, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 4/4/2016. (evana, )
March 29, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 26 Notice of Dismissal of Parties filed by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, it is ORDERED that Defendants John Does 1, 6, 7, 8, 10, and 11 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE from this action, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 3/29/2016. (evana, )
January 19, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party filed by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Defendant, John Doe 9, is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE from this action, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/19/2016. (evana, )
January 5, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 16 Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, it is ORDERED that Defendant, John Doe 12, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from this action, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 1/5/2016. (evana, )
December 11, 2015 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 14 Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC. Defendant, John Doe 2, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from this action. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 12/11/2015. (athom, )
November 13, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 12 Notice of Dismissal of Party filed by Dallas Buyers Club, LLC, it is ORDERED that defendant, John Doe 5, is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from this action, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 11/13/2015. (evana, )
October 15, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Take Limited Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/15/2015.(mdave, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dallas Buyers Club, LLC v. Doe 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Buyers Club, LLC
Represented By: David John Stephenson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?