Walcott v. USA

Plaintiff: Janet L. Walcott
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2015cv02630
Filed: December 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Gordon P. Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:6213
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 OPINION AND ORDER granting 67 Motion for Summary Judgment by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/13/18. (pglov)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPINION AND ORDER sustaining in part and overruling in part 51 Objections, adopting in part and rejecting in part 47 Recommendation, and granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to Dismiss, by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/7/17. (dkals, )
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/5/16. (dkals, )
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCY by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/3/15. (dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walcott v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet L. Walcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?