Gabriel v. Emergency Medical Specialists, PC. et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Gabriel
Defendant: Emergency Medical Specialists, PC. and Laurence J. Cohen
Case Number: 1:2016cv00051
Filed: January 8, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Presiding Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER adopting re 49 Report and Recommendations.; granting 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 17 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/21/17. (jdyne, )
May 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Denying 33 Plaintiff's Motion To Enforce Default Judgment as the Proper Dispositive Measure for this Case and To Seek Further Directives from the Court Pursuant to 636(b)(1)(B). Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/4/2016.(cmira)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER to the extent Plaintiff objects to the Magistrate Judges 31 Order, such Objection 32 is Overruled; to the extent Plaintiff moves to Voluntarily Dismiss certain of his claims,the 32 Motion is Denied Without Prejudice; to the extent Plaintiff seeks to preserve any previously lodged objectionor request for relief, the 32 Motion is Denied as Moot. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 5/3/2016.(cmira)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Enforce Judgment is DENIED. In addition, Plaintiff's 18 Motion to Strike is DENIED. Plaintiff has until May 20, 2016, to file his substantive responses to Defendants' 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, and 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/19/2016.(cbslc2)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabriel v. Emergency Medical Specialists, PC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergency Medical Specialists, PC.
Represented By: Ryan Harrison Tamm
Represented By: Julie E. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurence J. Cohen
Represented By: Ryan Harrison Tamm
Represented By: Julie E. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?