In re: Adia Janine Paysinger

In_re: Adia Janine Paysinger
Appellant: Kevin D. Heupel and Heupel Law, P.C
Appellee: Adia Janine Paysinger
Interested_party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado and U.S. Trustee
Case Number: 1:2016cv00082
Filed: January 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER affirming the bankruptcy court's decision. Denying as moot the debtors' Motion to Dismiss Appeal 16 . Denying the debtors' Motion to Correct the Record on Appeal 23 . The case is remanded to the bankruptcy court for the limited purpose of awarding the debtors their reasonable attorneys' fees and costs incurred in defending this appeal under § 362(k), by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/4/2017. (ebuch)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 13 the Motion for Extension To File Appellant Brief and Access To Trial Transcripts 11 filed February 17, 2016, to the extent the appellant seeks removal of the restriction on Volume IV [10-4] of the Bankruptcy Record on Appeal [1 0]. That the Response to Appellants Motion for Extension To File Appellant Brief and Access to Trial Transcripts and Appellees Motion for Access To Trial Transcripts 13 filed February 18, 2016, is Granted to the extent the appellee seeks removal of the restriction on Volume IV [10-4] of the Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/3/2016.(cmira)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ESTABLISHING BANKRUPTCY APPEAL BRIEFING REQUIREMENTS, by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/25/2016. (evana, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Adia Janine Paysinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In_re: Adia Janine Paysinger
Represented By: Erik B. Atzbach
Represented By: Geoffrey Hugh Atzbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kevin D. Heupel
Represented By: Kevin Dean Heupel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Heupel Law, P.C
Represented By: Kevin Dean Heupel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Adia Janine Paysinger
Represented By: Erik B. Atzbach
Represented By: Geoffrey Hugh Atzbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?