Krikorian v. Great-West Life & Annuity Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Wahan Krikorian
Defendant: Great-West Life & Annuity Insurance Company, Great-West Life & Annuity Insurance Company of New York, Great-West Trust Company, LLC and Advised Assets Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00094
Filed: January 14, 2016
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/18/2016. (slibi, )
April 4, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Combined Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference set for 5/3/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. The Court reserves fifteen (15) days for Bench Trial: 5/8/2 017, 5/9/2017, 5/10/2017, 5/11/2017, 5/15/2017, 5/16/2017, 5/17/2017, 5/18/2017, 5/22/2017, 5/23/2017, 5/24/2017, 5/25/2017, 5/30/2017, 5/31/2017, and 6/1/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Counsel and any pro se party shall appear in courtroom A1001 on the first day of trial at 8:00 a.m. to review and discuss with the courtroom deputy clerk and the court, if necessary, any final details, arrangements, or requirements concerning the trial. Signed by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/4/2016. (cmira)
January 15, 2016 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM On or before 3/4/2016 parties shall complete and file Consent / Non-Consent Form 3 . Consent Form due by 3/4/2016. Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/15/2016. (emill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krikorian v. Great-West Life & Annuity Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great-West Life & Annuity Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark B. Blocker
Represented By: Joel Stephen Feldman
Represented By: Daniel Robert Thies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great-West Life & Annuity Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Mark B. Blocker
Represented By: Joel Stephen Feldman
Represented By: Daniel Robert Thies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great-West Trust Company, LLC
Represented By: Mark B. Blocker
Represented By: Joel Stephen Feldman
Represented By: Daniel Robert Thies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advised Assets Group, LLC
Represented By: Mark B. Blocker
Represented By: Joel Stephen Feldman
Represented By: Daniel Robert Thies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wahan Krikorian
Represented By: James Edward Miller
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Represented By: Kolin Chen-Ting Tang
Represented By: Nathan C. Zipperian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?