Four Winds Interactive LLC v. 22 MILES, Inc.
Plaintiff: Four Winds Interactive LLC
Defendant: 22 MILES, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv00704
Filed: March 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 OPINION AND ORDER denying 132 Motion to Strike by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/24/18. (dkals, )
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying 62 Motion to Stay, by Magistrate Judge Scott T Varholak on 1/11/2017. (slibi, )
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER; 3 Motion for Entry of Protective Order is DENIED without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/3/16.(morti, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Four Winds Interactive LLC v. 22 MILES, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Four Winds Interactive LLC
Represented By: Evan Michael Rothstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 22 MILES, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Koppelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?