RCHFU, LLC et al v. Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation et al
Plaintiff: RCHFU, LLC, Carl Eichstaedt, III, Carla P Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Susan J Horwitz, Carol Kadison, Jeanne G Parker, Pat A Chavin, Bruce M Nesbitt, Allen D. McGee, Michael Hobin, Courtney S Rogers, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, Danny V Lackey, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, Patricia Travers, Barry Hammer, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Gail L Bayer, C & N Assets, Ltd., Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Stacey Torchon, Bonnie Likover, Lewis J Hirsch, William M Waxman, Lon Baronne, Walter H Petrie, Deborah Joy Kohler, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Bradley Properties, LLC, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Jacob Louis Slevin, Marrianne Magnuson, Edward P Meyerson, Michael G Robinson, Nelson Trust, Nancy L Lackey, Christopher Branoff, Mel A Barkan, Douglas M. Patinkin, Penny Brown, J. Holton McGee, Jeffrey Hammer, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Jonathan Lerner, Gene M. Bindler, Linda Gage-White, Deborah J. Jacoby, Derby City Investments, LLC, Joanna F. Segal, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Russell S Parker, Erich Tengelsen, Lawerence Brown, Michael B. Hurwitz, Jack Zemer, Wendy Moskowitz, Timothy J Hyland, Paul Brunswick, Nancy Lynne Shute, TSE Holdings, LLC, Mark L. Horwitz, Carol A Cushman, Olga A. Selivanova, Ronald F. Lemar, Martin Kolsky, William F Schofield, Jr., Robert Blanchard, Ellen Blanchard, Carl Andrew Rudella, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Marcie Taylor, Cass Franklin, Nancy A Petrie, Hazim Safi, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Neil Spizizen, David Schaecter, Rosemary W Reid, Richard B. Bindler, Robert Kaufmann, Michael B. Gross, Julie C Canner, Donald A. Kurz, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, John Egle, William R. Benz, Amy S Bernstein, Charles B Buchanan, Susan Holloway Weinkle, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, David Friedman, Jeffrey Richter, Jennfier Colson, Amy D Ronner, Sidney Brown, Craig Lipton, Emily Vogl, Susan P Stasney, Richard Louis Levengood, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Thomas M Prose, Stuart A. Epstein, Robert Buzzetti, Hope S Barkan, Carol Anne Cannon, Lee James Chimerakis, Jeffrey Rappin, Susan Ann Sherman, Bruce E Reid, Gilbert P Gradinger, Margaret A. Castleman, Katherine F. Cuntz, Zamalt, LLC, Kevin E Grant, Maria P. Giudici, Ludmila Malakhova, Rocky J Mountain, Kimberley Branoff, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, Mirjana Randic Trust, Evan F. Trestman, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Alan B. Schneider, Heather Cramer, Sharon R Wackeen, Carol J. Hidalgo, Morris M Jurkowitz, D&J Properties, LLC, Carole Kolsky, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Caroline I Gurland, Norman C Creech, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Elizabeth M Simon and Annette Kalcheim Trust
Defendant: Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation and Cobalt Travel Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv01301
Filed: May 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Pitkin
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER withdrawing #405 Motion to Strike as per Defendant Marriott's request. See ECF #424. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/11/2019. Text Only Entry(GPG)
June 11, 2019 Filing 424 NOTICE to Withdraw Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Jason Bass and the Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Jon Simon that Rely on the Bass Report (ECF #405) by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC (Marx, Ian)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/31/2019. Discovery due by 7/17/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/29/2019. (tsher, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 422 STATUS REPORT and Request for Entry of Order Implementing Fifth Additional Case Schedule Addendum by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Fifth Additional Case Schedule Addendum, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Marx, Ian)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER finding as moot #418 Motion for Leave to Restrict- see ECF #420 resolving the issue. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/31/2019. Text Only Entry(GPG)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 420 ORDER granting #414 Motion for Leave to Restrict-ECFs #406-1 and 406-2 Shall be maintained at Level 1 Restriction. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/31/2019. Text Only Entry(GPG)
May 30, 2019 Filing 419 MEMORANDUM regarding #418 Supplemental MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/30/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
May 30, 2019 Filing 418 Supplemental MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Marx, Ian)
May 24, 2019 Filing 417 RESPONSE to #405 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Jason Bass and the Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Jon Simon that Rely on the Bass Report filed by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Reiser, Matthew)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER taking under advisement #414 Motion for Leave to Restrict-pending notice of conferral pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(a). by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/24/2019. Text Only Entry(GPG)
May 24, 2019 Filing 415 MEMORANDUM regarding #414 MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/24/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
May 24, 2019 Filing 414 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Marx, Ian)
May 22, 2019 Filing 413 TRANSCRIPT of TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 04/25/2019 before Magistrate Judge Gallagher. Pages: 1-13. Prepared by: AB Court Reporting & Video, Inc.. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (AB Court Reporting & Video, Inc., )
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 412 ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/16/2019, re: [#396] APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court are OVERRULED.(sphil, ) Modified on 5/16/2019 to edit text. (sphil, ).
May 16, 2019 Filing 411 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Greg Jacobson by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Reiser, Michael)
May 16, 2019 Filing 410 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Robert A. Sklar by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Reiser, Michael)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER granting #403 Motion for Leave to Restrict--For the reasons set forth in Marriotts motion, the motion is granted. ECFs #395-8 and 395-9 SHALL be maintained at Level 1 Restriction. So Ordered. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/15/2019. Text Only Entry(GPG)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER granting #388 Motion for Leave to Restrict-- For the reasons set forth in Marriotts motion, the motion is granted. ECF #378 and all attachments SHALL be maintained at Level 1 Restriction. So Ordered. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/15/2019. Text Only Entry(GPG)
May 13, 2019 Filing 407 MEMORANDUM regarding #405 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Jason Bass and the Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Jon Simon that Rely on the Bass Report filed by Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/13/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
May 10, 2019 Filing 406 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Exhibits A and B to #405 MOTION to Strike the Expert Report by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Marx, Ian) Modified on 5/13/2019 to add linkage and document title. (sphil, ).
May 10, 2019 Filing 405 WITHDRAWN MOTION to Strike the Expert Report of Jason Bass and the Portions of the Supplemental Expert Report of Jon Simon that Rely on the Bass Report by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian S. Marx, #2 Exhibit C)(Marx, Ian) Modified on 6/11/2019 to withdraw the Motion pursuant to #425 Order. (sphil, ).
May 6, 2019 Filing 404 MEMORANDUM regarding #403 MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/6/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
May 6, 2019 Filing 403 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Marx, Ian)
May 6, 2019 Filing 402 RESPONSE to [#396] Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision of April 7, 2019 filed by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Marx, Ian)
May 2, 2019 Filing 401 REPLY to Response to #379 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND COMPLAINT REGARDING THE 2013 AFFILIATION AGREEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Schrag, Michael)
April 25, 2019 Filing 400 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher: Discovery Hearing held on 4/25/2019. APPEARANCES, all via telephone: For Plaintiffs, Michael Schrag, Linda Lam, and Tyler Meade; For Marriott Defendants, Philip Sellinger and Ian Marx; and for the Association Defendant, Andrew Nussbaum. The Court Orders that the deadline to serve supplemental expert rebuttal reports will be extended from May 20, 2019 to June 3, 2019. Additionally, the Court Orders the deadline for filing the discussed motion to strike shall be May 10, 2019. FTR: Grand Junction. (gpgsec ) Text Only Entry
April 25, 2019 Filing 399 RESPONSE to #397 Status Report by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Schrag, Michael)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER: Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 4/25/2019 04:00 PM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher to discuss matters set forth in document at ECF [# 397]. Parties to coordinate and call in to 970-241-8932, Extension 8235. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on April 25, 2019. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
April 24, 2019 Filing 397 Supplemental STATUS REPORT and Request for Immediate Telephone Conference to Address Impending Deadlines in Light of Plaintiffs' Unauthorized Service of an Expert Report by Defendant Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.. (Marx, Ian)
April 22, 2019 Filing 396 OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, re: #386 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Plaintiffs. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #395 filed on 4/22/2019). Text Only Entry.(sphil, )
April 22, 2019 Filing 395 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Reiser, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Schrag, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Filing 394 RESPONSE to #379 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND COMPLAINT REGARDING THE 2013 AFFILIATION AGREEMENT filed by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Livingston, Jessica)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 393 MINUTE ORDER: This minute Order strikes ECF #391. While discussing a variety of topics, Marriotts motion essentially requests one thing, suspension of the May 20, 2019 deadline for replying to the Dev and Simon reports. The motion does not contain a conferral statement pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(a) and for that reason the motion (ECF #391) is stricken without prejudice and with leave to re-file subsequent to future conferral. With regard to this subject in general, which includes Plaintiffs filing of the Bass report as an exhibit, Plaintiffs intent on that score, and Marriotts possible motion to strike, the Court Orders the parties to hold a meaningful conferral on these issues before returning to the Court on this subject. ECF #392 remains restricted at Level 1 Restriction until further order of the Court. So Ordered. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/17/2019. Text Only Entry (GPG)
April 17, 2019 Filing 392 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Exhibit A to #391 STATUS REPORT and Request for Immediate Telephone Conference by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Marx, Ian) Modified on 4/17/2019 to add document title and linkage. (sphil, ).
April 17, 2019 Filing 391 STRICKEN STATUS REPORT and Request for Immediate Telephone Conference to Address Impending Deadlines in Connection with Plaintiffs' Unauthorized Service of an Expert Report from Jason Bass by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation. (Marx, Ian) Modified on 5/3/2019 to strike document pursuant to #393 Minute Order. (sphil, ).
April 15, 2019 Filing 390 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Certain Plaintiff Depositions Pursuant to the Court's April 5, 2019 Minute Order by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation. (Marx, Ian)
April 12, 2019 Filing 389 MEMORANDUM regarding #388 MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/12/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
April 11, 2019 Filing 388 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation. (Marx, Ian)
April 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #338 Motion for additional remedies. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/7/19. (GPG)
April 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER denying #376 Motion by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/7/19. (GPG)
April 4, 2019 Filing 385 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Text Only Entry Dispositive Motions due by 7/5/2019 pursuant to 384 Minute Order. (nmarb, )
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 384 MINUTE ORDER- Pending before the Court are a variety of motions which will be ruled upon in-turn. At this juncture, in anticipation of those Orders, the Court modifies the Scheduling Order as follows and as stipulated to by the parties: (1) Plaintiffs Deadline to Serve Supplemental Affirmative Reports of Dr. Dev and Mr. Simon limited to the SMS Survey, SMS Reports and the MVC Points pricing spreadsheet information produced on December 28, 2018: April 12, 2019; (2) Defendants Deadline to Serve Supplemental Rebuttal Reports of Dr. Israel and Dr. King: May 20, 2019; (3) Expert Discovery Cut-off: June 21, 2019; (4) Dispositive Motions: July 5, 2019; (5) Deadline to File Daubert Motions: July 19, 2019; (6) Deadline to File Motions in Limine: July 26, 2019. Additionally, still pending before the Court is an issue raised regarding additional depositions Marriott may wish to take prior to trial of the Plaintiff owners in anticipation of certain owners testifying at trial. See ECF #238. Within ten (10) days, the parties Shall file a joint memorandum as to whether this is still an issue needing Court resolution. If this topic needs to be held until resolution of other predicate matters, the parties shall so state. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/4/19. Text Only Entry (GPG)
April 3, 2019 Filing 383 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher: Scheduling Conference held on 4/3/2019. Parties presented argument pertaining to pending discovery motions and scheduling matters. Court reserves ruling. APPEARANCES: For Plaintiff, Matthew Ferguson, Linda Lam, Michael Schrag, and Michael Reiser; For Marriott Defendants, Ian Marx and Philip Sellinger; For Aspen Highlands Defendant, Jessica Livingston; all via telephone. FTR: Grand Junction. (gpgsec, ) Text Only Entry
March 29, 2019 Filing 382 Joint STATUS REPORT On Areas of Agreement and Disagreement by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation. (Marx, Ian)
March 29, 2019 Filing 381 MEMORANDUM regarding #376 Motion for Supplemental Expert Reports to Analyse Newly Produced Data. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/29/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 380 MEMORANDUM regarding #379 Amended Motion to Amend Scheduling Order and Complaint Regarding the 2013 Affiliation Agreement. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/29/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
March 28, 2019 Filing 379 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND COMPLAINT REGARDING THE 2013 AFFILIATION AGREEMENT by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document SEVENTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND, #2 Proposed Document REDLINE OF SEVENTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND)(Decker, Anne)
March 28, 2019 Filing 378 (RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1) Exhibits B, C, and D to #377 Brief by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D)(Marx, Ian) Modified to add title on 3/29/2019 (cthom, ).
March 28, 2019 Filing 377 BRIEF re #376 Brief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Request for Addition of New Expert Witness After Expiration of Expert Report Deadlines by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian S. Marx, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit E)(Marx, Ian)
March 28, 2019 Filing 376 MOTION Request for Supplemental Expert Reports to Analyse Newly Produced Data by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Reiser Decl. ISO Request to Designate New Expert, #2 Exhibit Ex. A ISO Request to Designate New Expert, #3 Exhibit Ex. B ISO Request to Designate New Expert, #4 Exhibit Ex. C ISO Request to Designate New Expert, #5 Exhibit Ex. D ISO Request to Designate New Expert, #6 Exhibit Ex. E ISO Request to Designate New Expert, #7 Exhibit Ex. F ISO Request to Designate New Expert)(Decker, Anne) Modified to correct title and add motion event on 3/29/2019 (cthom, ).
March 28, 2019 Filing 375 RESPONSE (Amended) Regarding Plaintiff's Additional Expert Report by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Livingston, Jessica)
March 28, 2019 Filing 374 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #373 Response filed by attorney Jessica Livingston. The filing is missing the required Certificate of Service. A Certificate of Service shall be made part of the pleading in ECF (See ECF Civil Procedures IV Electronic Filing 4.7 Service). It needs to list all parties entitled to service or notice, and the manner in which service or notice was accomplished on each party. (Text Only Entry) (cthom, )
March 28, 2019 Filing 373 RESPONSE Regarding Plaintiff's Additional Expert Report by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Livingston, Jessica)
March 18, 2019 Filing 372 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Scheduling Conference held on 3/18/2019. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/3/2019 10:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. FTR: Grand Junction - AM. (tsher, ) Modified on 3/21/2019 to correct hearing date (tsher, ).
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 370 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/18/2019, re: #351 Stipulation of Dismissal of Party, filed by Robert A. Sklar Trust, #350 Stipulation of Dismissal of Party, filed by Greg Jacobson. ORDERED that, all claims of plaintiff Robert A. Sklar against Aspen Highlands Condominium Association and all claims of plaintiff Greg Jacobson against Aspen Highlands Condominium Association were dismissed with prejudice as of the entry of the Stipulations for Dismissal [Docket Nos. 350 and 351]. No orders of dismissal are necessary. (sphil, )
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER denying #337 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify-WITHOUT PREJUDICE and with leave to file again within ten (10) days. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/18/19. (GPG)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER denying #339 Motion for Attorney Fees-WITHOUT PREJUDICE and with leave to re-file at the appropriate time. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/18/19. Text Only Entry (GPG)
March 17, 2019 Filing 371 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #367 Response, filed by attorney Anne Decker.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry). (sphil, )
March 17, 2019 Filing 367 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT CONCERNING THE MARRIOTT DEFENDANTS LATE PRODUCTION OF STATISTICAL DATA, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT CONCERNING THE MARRIOTT DEFENDANTS LATE PRODUCTION OF STATISTICAL DATA)(Decker, Anne)
March 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 366 MINUTE ORDER- The Court vacates its earlier Order, (ECF #365), granting leave to currently file a sur-reply on the amendment issue (ECF #337). Instead, for reasons which will be addressed in a subsequent Order, the Court denies the request to file a sur-reply as MOOT at this time. Marriott may NOT file a sur-reply at this time. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/17/2019. Text Only Entry (GPG)
March 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER granting #358 Motion for Leave-however, it is unclear if ECF #358 is intended to be that sur-reply or if Marriott intends to docket a separate pleading (ECF #358 contains many of the arguments that the Court would expect to be in a sur-reply). If ECF #358 is that document, Marriott shall so state, and in the alternative Marriott shall promptly docket their sur-reply. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/17/19. Text Only Entry (GPG)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER, Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2019 09:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Telephone Appearance pre-approved by calling 970-241-8932, Extension 8235. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on March 15, 2019. Text Only Entry (gpgsec )
March 15, 2019 Filing 363 REPLY to #362 Response,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, in Further Support of Request for Entry of Order Implementing Fourth Additional Case Schedule Addendum and Request for Conference by Defendants Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation. (Marx, Ian)
March 13, 2019 Filing 362 RESPONSE to #361 Status Report, by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Schrag, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 361 STATUS REPORT and Request for Entry of Order Implementing Fourth Additional Case Schedule Addendum by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Marx, Ian)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 360 MEMORANDUM regarding #358 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to #337 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint and Scheduling Order filed by Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/1/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
February 28, 2019 Filing 359 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #358 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to #337 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint and Scheduling Order filed by attorney Ian S. Marx. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry). (sphil, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 358 MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to #337 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint and Scheduling Order by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Marx, Ian)
February 19, 2019 Filing 357 REPLY to Response to #338 MOTION for Costs And Other Relief filed by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Schrag, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Filing 356 REPLY to Response to #337 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint and Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Schrag, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Schrag, Michael)
February 19, 2019 Filing 355 REPLY to Response to #339 MOTION for Attorney Fees Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs filed by Plaintiffs Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Reply Affidavit of Matthew C. Ferguson in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs)(Ferguson, Matthew)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER granting #352 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages-a reply of no more than 15 pages-exclusive of title and signature page-may be filed. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/15/2019. Text Only Entry (GPG)
February 15, 2019 Filing 353 MEMORANDUM regarding #352 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Neil G Arnovitz, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Lucy D Anda, Rock Pile, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz Trust. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/15/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
February 14, 2019 Filing 352 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiffs Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz. (Ferguson, Matthew)
February 14, 2019 Filing 351 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Robert A. Sklar by Plaintiff Robert A. Sklar Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) (Proposed) Order re Amended Fed. R. Civ. 41(a)(A)(ii) Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice of Plaintiff Robert A. Sklar's Claims Against Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association ("AHCA"))(Ferguson, Matthew)
February 12, 2019 Filing 350 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Greg Jacobson by Plaintiff Greg Jacobson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order re Fed. R. Civ. 41(a)(6)(A)(ii) Stipulation for Dismissal w/ Prejudice of Plaintiff Greg Jacobson Against Aspen Highlands Condo Association ("AHCA")(Ferguson, Matthew)
February 12, 2019 Filing 349 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party Robert A. Sklar by Plaintiff Robert A. Sklar Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order re Fed. R. Civ. 41(a)(6)(A)(ii) Stipulation for Dismissal w/ Prejudice of Plaintiff Robert A. Sklar Against Aspen Highlands Condo Association ("AHCA"))(Ferguson, Matthew)
February 8, 2019 Filing 348 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anne Orelind Decker on behalf of Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack ZemerAttorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Hope S Barkan(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Hope S Barkan(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Mel A Barkan(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Mel A Barkan(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Karen G. Baronne(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Karen G. Baronne(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Lon Baronne(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Lon Baronne(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Gail L Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Gail L Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Jeffrey A Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Jeffrey A Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party John Benko(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party John Benko(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Natalie Benko(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Natalie Benko(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Karen Schneider Benrubi(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Karen Schneider Benrubi(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Richard Benrubi (pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Richard Benrubi (pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Katherine M. Benz (pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Katherine M. Benz (pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party William R. Benz (pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party William R. Benz (pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Benz Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Benz Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party John Bergstrom(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party John Bergstrom(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Jeffrey C Bermant(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Jeffrey C Bermant(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Amy S Bernstein(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Amy S Bernstein(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Jeffrey L Bernstein(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Jeffrey L Bernstein(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Gene M. Bindler(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Gene M. Bindler(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Richard B. Bindler(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Richard B. Bindler(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Constance H Blacher(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Constance H Blacher(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party David S Blacher(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party David S Blacher(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Ellen Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Ellen Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Anne Orelind Decker added to party Je
February 5, 2019 Filing 347 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Michael J. Reiser, Jr. by Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr on behalf of Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack ZemerAttorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Hope S Barkan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Hope S Barkan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Mel A Barkan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Mel A Barkan(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Karen G. Baronne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Karen G. Baronne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Lon Baronne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Lon Baronne(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party John Benko(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party John Benko(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Natalie Benko(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Natalie Benko(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Karen Schneider Benrubi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Karen Schneider Benrubi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Richard Benrubi (pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Richard Benrubi (pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Katherine M. Benz (pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Katherine M. Benz (pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party William R. Benz (pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party William R. Benz (pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Benz Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Benz Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party John Bergstrom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party John Bergstrom(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Jeffrey C Bermant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Jeffrey C Bermant(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Amy S Bernstein(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Amy S Bernstein(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Jeffrey L Bernstein(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Jeffrey L Bernstein(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Gene M. Bindler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Gene M. Bindler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Richard B. Bindler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Richard B. Bindler(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Constance H Blacher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Constance H Blacher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party David S Blacher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party David S Blacher(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Ellen Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party Ellen Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser, Sr added to party J
February 4, 2019 Filing 346 RESPONSE to #338 MOTION for Costs And Other Relief filed by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Marx, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Marx, Ian)
February 4, 2019 Filing 345 RESPONSE to #339 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Marx, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Marx, Ian)
February 4, 2019 Filing 344 RESPONSE to #337 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint and Scheduling Order filed by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Marx, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Marx, Ian)
February 4, 2019 Filing 343 RESPONSE to #338 MOTION for Costs And Other Relief filed by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Livingston, Jessica)
February 4, 2019 Filing 342 RESPONSE to #337 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint and Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Livingston, Jessica)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 341 MEMORANDUM regarding #337 Motion to Amend Complaint and Scheduling Order, #338 Motion for Costs and Other Relief, #339 Motion for Attorney Fees. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/15/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
January 14, 2019 Filing 340 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #339 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by attorney MICHAEL SCHRAG. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry). (sphil, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 339 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Ferguson, #2 Exhibit A to Ferguson Decl., #3 Exhibit B to Ferguson Decl., #4 Exhibit C to Ferguson Decl., #5 Declaration of Michael Reiser, #6 Exhibit A to Reiser Decl., #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16)(Schrag, Michael)
January 14, 2019 Filing 338 MOTION for Costs And Other Relief by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Meade, Tyler)
January 14, 2019 Filing 337 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tyler Meade in Support of Motion to Confirm Order of Attachment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Tyler Meade, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Tyler Meade, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Tyler Meade, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Tyler Meade, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Tyler Meade, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Tyler Meade)(Meade, Tyler)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER granting #334 Motion to Withdraw-Mr. Daniel Shea is hereby withdrawn. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/10/19. Text Only Entry (GPG)
January 9, 2019 Filing 335 MEMORANDUM regarding #334 MOTION to Withdraw of Daniel Shea filed by Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/9/19. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
January 9, 2019 Filing 334 MOTION to Withdraw of Daniel Shea by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Shea, Daniel)
January 8, 2019 Filing 333 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #332 Notice (Other) filed by attorney Daniel Shea. The document is filed incorrectly. Action to take - REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In order for an attorney to be withdrawn as counsel of record, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney must be filed. An attorney cannot be withdrawn by a Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney and/or Substitution of Counsel. Refer to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a).(Text Only Entry). (sphil, )
January 8, 2019 Filing 332 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Daniel Shea by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association (Shea, Daniel)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 283 Motion for Sanctions as per ECF #330. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/31/2018. Text Only Entry (GPG)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #223 Motion for Sanctions by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/31/2018. (GPG)
December 21, 2018 Filing 329 REPLY to Response to #319 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Z)(Shea, Daniel)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER re: Third Additional Case Schedule Addendum By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/19/2018. Discovery due by 2/14/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/25/2019. (tsher, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 326 TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on November 20, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Gallagher. Pages: 1-87. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 327 Plaintiffs' Opposition to #319 Aspen Highlands condominium Association's MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs'. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #325 filed on 12/10/2018). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 325 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Simon Report, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 Management Agreement, #4 Exhibit 4 Cobalt Affiliation Agreement, #5 Exhibit 5 Cobalt and Lion&Crown Agreement, #6 Exhibit 6 2013 Affiliation Agreement, #7 Exhibit 7 November 2014 Sobeck E-mail, #8 Exhibit 8 July 2012 Cobalt Letter, #9 Exhibit 9 August 2012 AHCA Letter, #10 Exhibit 10 August 2012 Neveloff Letter, #11 Exhibit 11 November 2012 Gosch Letter, #12 Exhibit 12 December 2012 Board Letter, #13 Exhibit 13 January 2013 Mercer E-mail, #14 Exhibit 14 Attachment to Mercer Letter, #15 Exhibit 15 Gosch Deposition, #16 Exhibit 16 Marino Deposition, #17 Exhibit 17 March 2013 Mercer E-mail, #18 Exhibit 18 Member Comments, #19 Exhibit 19 May 2013 Letter, #20 Exhibit 20 APCO Survey Report, #21 Exhibit 21 APCO Focus Group Report, #22 Exhibit 22 Cunningham Deposition, #23 Exhibit 23 Bachelor Gulch Results, #24 Exhibit 24 Jupiter Results, #25 Exhibit 25 November 2012 Mullenix Letter, #26 Exhibit 26 June 2013 Bennis E-mail, #27 Exhibit 27 Affiliation Survey, #28 Exhibit 28 December 2013 Neveloff E-mail, #29 Exhibit 29 February 2014 Neveloff E-mail, #30 Exhibit 30 December 2013 AHCA E-mail, #31 Exhibit 31 Mercer Deposition, #32 Exhibit 32 April 2014 Mercer E-mail, #33 Exhibit 33 RFA Responses, #34 Exhibit 34 April 2014 Sobeck E-mail, #35 Exhibit 35 December 2013 Sobeck E-mail, #36 Exhibit 36 January 2014 Mercer E-mail, #37 Exhibit 37 April 2014 AHCA Letter, #38 Exhibit 38 Robinson Report)(Schrag, Michael)
November 20, 2018 Filing 323 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2018. FTR: Grant Junction - PM. (tsher, )
November 20, 2018 Filing 324 Exhibits in Support of #323 Minutes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(tsher, ) Modified on 11/27/2018 to link to correct document (tsher, ).
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER Re: Second Additional Case Schedule Addendum by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/20/2018. Expert Discovery due by 1/31/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 2/11/2019. (jgonz, )
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 321 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the Stipulation on Briefing Schedule #320 and Magistrate Judge Gallagher's Additional Case Schedule Addendum #316 , plaintiffs may have until December 10, 2018 to respond to defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association's motion for summary judgment #319 . Any reply shall be due on or before December 21, 2018. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/7/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
November 2, 2018 Filing 320 STIPULATION RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Lam, Linda) Modified on 11/6/2018 to add a gavel to entry pursuant to direction from the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Gallagher. (nmarb, ).
October 22, 2018 Filing 319 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Declaration of Condominium, #2 Exhibit B - Management Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Randy Mercer Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - April 22, 2013 Email Exclusive Resorts, #5 Exhibit E - April 22 2014 3rd Home Afilliation email, #6 Exhibit F - April 2013 Letter, #7 Exhibit G - May 2013 Letter to Members, #8 Exhibit H - July 2013 letter, #9 Exhibit I - October 2013 Letter, #10 Exhibit J - November 2013 Letter, #11 Exhibit K - December 4, 2013 Email to Philip and Elana Schneider, #12 Exhibit L - Vote Count Exchange Email, #13 Exhibit M - Memorandum of Understanding, #14 Exhibit N - Mercer Deposition, #15 Exhibit O - Oliver Deposition, #16 Exhibit P - Marino Deposition, #17 Exhibit Q - Aspen Member Survey Comments, #18 Exhibit R - Schneider Deposition, #19 Exhibit S - April 2018 Usage Information, #20 Exhibit T - November 21, 2012 Cease-and-Desist Letter, #21 Exhibit U - Neveloff Deposition, #22 Exhibit V - Gosch Depostion, #23 Exhibit W - September 21, 2012 Memo from Brownstein Hyatt to the Board, #24 Exhibit X - April 24, 2014 Acknowledgement of and Joinder to Affiliation Agreement, #25 Exhibit Y - Original Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand)(Shea, Daniel)
October 17, 2018 Filing 318 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Christopher Lillie on behalf of Aspen Highlands Condominium AssociationAttorney Andrew Christopher Lillie added to party Aspen Highlands Condominium Association(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Christopher Lillie added to party Aspen Highlands Condominium Association(pty:dft) (Lillie, Andrew)
October 17, 2018 Filing 317 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Martin Nussbaum on behalf of Aspen Highlands Condominium AssociationAttorney Andrew Martin Nussbaum added to party Aspen Highlands Condominium Association(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Martin Nussbaum added to party Aspen Highlands Condominium Association(pty:dft) (Nussbaum, Andrew)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 316 AMENDED ORDER to attach Addendum: The dates in the attached addendum are adopted and so made an Order of the Court. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on October 16, 2018. Text Only Entry (gpgsec )
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER: The dates in the attached addendum are adopted and so made an Order of the Court. Dispositive Motions due by 1/20/2019. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on October 16, 2018. Text Only Entry (gpgsec )
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 314 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #311 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation; striking #312 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association may file a motion for summary judgment not to exceed 25 pages. Plaintiffs' response shall not exceed 25 pages. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/15/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
October 12, 2018 Filing 313 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #312 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by attorneyDaniel F. Shea.Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (sphil, )
October 12, 2018 Filing 312 STRICKEN MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB)(Shea, Daniel) Modified on 10/15/2018 to add text STRICKEN per Docket No. 314 (pabsec).
October 12, 2018 Filing 311 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Shea, Daniel)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 310 MINUTE ORDER: The dates in the attached addendum are adopted and so made an Order of the Court. The dispositive motion filing deadline is now 12/17/2018. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/5/18. (GPG)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER: Motions Hearing re Motions at ECF's [#223 and #283] set for 11/20/2018 12:30 PM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on September 25, 2018. Text Only Entry (gpgsec )
September 25, 2018 Filing 308 RESPONSE to #306 Status Report,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Marx, Ian)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 307 Corrected ADDENDUM to Revised Scheduling Order, Section 9 by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/21/2018. Motions due by 10/1/2018 (tsher, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 306 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Corrections to Addendum to Scheduling Order)(Schrag, Michael)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER: Notice to Set: Telephone Setting Conference set for 9/25/2018 11:00 AM for the purpose of setting a hearing on ECFs [#223 and #283]. Parties wishing to participate in the setting are to confer and coordinate so that all are on one line when the call is placed to Gallagher Chambers at 970-241-8932, Extension "0". By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on September 20, 2018. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 304 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Status Conference held on 9/11/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 12/17/2018. FTR: Grand Junction - PM. (tsher, )
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ADDENDUM to Revised Scheduling Order, Section 9, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/10/2018. (tsher, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 302 RESPONSE to #300 Status Report,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Marx, Ian)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER: At the request of the parties, Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/7/2018 03:00 PM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Parties may appear telephonically by dialing (970) 241-8932, Extension 8225 on one conference line to the Court. Parties may provide a very short written summary of issues to the Court which is due by 3:00 PM on Thursday, 9/6/2018. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on September 4, 2018. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 300 STATUS REPORT and Request to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher to Enter (Proposed) Addendum to Revised Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Addendum Annotated, #2 Exhibit Addendum Clean)(Ferguson, Matthew)
August 21, 2018 Filing 298 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on July 11, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Gallagher. Pages: 1-40. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 299 Plaintiff's REPLY in Support of 283 MOTION for Sanctions and a Default Judgment Against Certain Marriott Defendants Based on APCO Documents filed by Plaintiff RCHFU, LLC., et al. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #297 filed on 08/20/2018). Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 297 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Linda Lam, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Lam, Linda)
August 6, 2018 Filing 296 BRIEF in Opposition to 283 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tricia Meisner, #2 Exhibit Ex A)(Masters, David)
August 6, 2018 Filing 295 BRIEF in Opposition to 283 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Ian S Marx, #2 Exhibit Ex A, #3 Exhibit Ex B, #4 Exhibit Ex C, #5 Exhibit Ex D, #6 Exhibit Ex F, #7 Exhibit Ex G, #8 Exhibit Ex H)(Masters, David)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER granting #292 Motion for Extension of Time to File, Defendant may respond to the Motion (ECF #282) by no later than August 6, 2018. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/31/2018. Text Only Entry (GPG)
July 31, 2018 Filing 293 MEMORANDUM regarding #292 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Motion filed by Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/31/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
July 31, 2018 Filing 292 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Motion by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Masters, David)
July 24, 2018 Filing 291 REPLY to Response to #223 MOTION for Sanctions and a Default Judgment Against Certain Marriott Defendants (RESPONSE TO SUR-REPLY) filed by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Schrag, Michael)
July 17, 2018 Filing 290 SURREPLY re #223 MOTION for Sanctions and a Default Judgment Against Certain Marriott Defendants filed by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ian Marx, #2 Exhibit A - April 24, 2014 Agreement)(Marx, Ian)
July 11, 2018 Filing 289 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher: Status Conference held on 7/11/2018. The Motion at [ECF #202 ] (and Responses and Replies associated therewith) is/are Ordered withdrawn. Plaintiff may re-file with regard to those portions which they still consider outstanding. With regard to the document at [ECF #282 ], noting agreement of the parties to an extended deadline, the Court Orders that the Response date for all defendants to this document shall be July 31, 2018.FTR: Grand Junction-PM. (jgonz, ) Modified on 7/17/2018 to add text(jgonz, ).
July 11, 2018 Filing 288 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #287 Status Report, filed by attorney Ian S. Marx. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry). (sphil, )
July 11, 2018 Filing 287 STATUS REPORT by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(DeMais, Jaclyn)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER granting #279 Motion for Leave: Within seven (7) days, the Marriott Defendants may file a sur-reply (to ECF #278) of no more than 3 pages and Plaintiffs may respond, within seven (7) days thereafter, also filing no more than 3 pages. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/10/18. Text Only Entry (GPG)
July 10, 2018 Filing 285 STATUS REPORT For July 11, 2018 Status Conference with Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Chart of Despositions)(Ferguson, Matthew)
July 5, 2018 Filing 284 MEMORANDUM regarding 283 MOTION for Sanctions and a Default Judgment filed by RCHFU, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/5/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
July 3, 2018 Filing 283 Plaintiffs' MOTION for SANCTIONS and a DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST CERTAIN MARRIOTT DEFENDANTS by Plaintiff RCHFU, LLC, et al. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #282 filed on 07/03/2018). Text only entry. (sphil, )
July 3, 2018 Filing 282 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matt Ferguson, #2 1, #3 2, #4 3, #5 4, #6 5, #7 6, #8 7, #9 8, #10 9, #11 10, #12 11, #13 12, #14 13, #15 14, #16 15, #17 16, #18 17, #19 18, #20 19, #21 20, #22 21, #23 22, #24 23, #25 24, #26 25, #27 26, #28 27, #29 28, #30 29, #31 30, #32 31, #33 32, #34 33, #35 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schrag, Michael)
July 2, 2018 Filing 281 RESPONSE to #279 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Motion for Sanctions and a Default Judgment Against Certain Marriott Defendants filed by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Ferguson, Matthew)
June 29, 2018 Filing 280 MEMORANDUM regarding #279 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/29/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
June 29, 2018 Filing 279 MOTION for Leave to by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Masters, David)
June 15, 2018 Filing 278 REPLY to Response to #223 MOTION for Sanctions and a Default Judgment Against Certain Marriott Defendants filed by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Schrag, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Schrag, Michael)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 277 MINUTE ORDER: The Court grants the additional time requested (and then some) in ECF #276 to meet and confer and provide a report to the Court on various issues. Pending, and referred to this Magistrate Judge, are several issues relating to claimed discovery violations and requests for sanctions. The Court Ordered the parties to meet and confer and narrow the issues. The parties joint status report indicates that meetings have occurred and that progress is being made. The Court finds it appropriate to grant the parties until July 10, 2018 to continue to discuss the matters and to comply with the prior Court Order on the subject. So Ordered. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/14/2018. Text Only Entry (GPG)
June 14, 2018 Filing 276 STATUS REPORT and Joint Request to Extend Time to Report to Court on Meet and Confer by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Ferguson, Matthew)
June 6, 2018 Filing 275 RESPONSE to #265 Order Providing Notice of No Objection and Production of Document by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Marx, Ian)
June 1, 2018 Filing 274 REPLY to Response to #223 MOTION for Sanctions and a Default Judgment Against Certain Marriott Defendants filed by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew C. Ferguson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Schrag, Michael)
June 1, 2018 Filing 273 RESPONSE to #223 MOTION for Sanctions and a Default Judgment Against Certain Marriott Defendants filed by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Ian S Marx, #2 Exhibit A Letters, #3 Exhibit B Nov 10 Letter, #4 Exhibit C Responses to RFP, #5 Exhibit D Ack Agreement, #6 Exhibit E Sobeck Excerpts, #7 Exhibit F Privilege Log Excerpts, #8 Exhibit G March 12 Email, #9 Exhibit H March 13 Email, #10 Exhibit I April 2 Email, #11 Exhibit J May 31 Email, #12 Exhibit K Cunningham Excerpts, #13 Exhibit L Sobeck Excerpts 2, #14 Exhibit M Affliliation Agreement)(Masters, David)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting #269 Motion for Leave to Restrict: The Court Orders that both ECF#246 (the unredacted Memo) and the attachments to ECF#247 (the Borkholder Exhibits)shall be restricted at Level 2 restriction. Within seven (7) days of the conclusion of litigation over this discrete sub-issue, the parties shall notify the Court and this Order to restrict may be modified as appropriate. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/30/18. Text Only Entry (GPG)
May 30, 2018 Filing 271 MEMORANDUM regarding #269 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/30/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
May 29, 2018 Filing 270 ANSWER to Complaint by Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC.(Marx, Ian)
May 29, 2018 Filing 269 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Marx, Ian)
May 29, 2018 Filing 268 NOTICE of Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition - John C. Vaughan by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer (Reiser, Michael)
May 29, 2018 Filing 267 ANSWER to #250 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Aspen Highlands Condominium Association.(Shea, Daniel)
May 29, 2018 Filing 266 ANSWER to #250 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, by Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC.(Marx, Ian)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER re #239 Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/22/2018. This Order shall be stayed for fourteen days or until the conclusion of any objection thereto. (tsher, )
May 22, 2018 Filing 264 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2. (tsher, )
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER taking under advisement #202 Motion to Compel: The Court has been referred Plaintiffs motion to compel (ECF #202), the response (ECF #213), reply (ECF #215), and sur-reply (ECF #221) applicable to this discrete dispute. The issue is with regard to provision of documents (thousands) and other associated discovery disputes. Given the nature of the dispute(s), the Court finds that it will be beneficial and ORDERS that Counsel (either lead Counsel or Counsel with significant involvement) SHALL meet and confer on the matter. The Court expects that Counsel shall: (1) narrow the issues as to what documents or other information have not been provided; and (2) determine what other issues surrounding this discrete dispute still exist. The conferral shall occur within fourteen (14) days. Following the conferral and within ten (10) days thereafter, the parties, jointly if in accord and separately if in disagreement, shall file with the Court a brief report (each party shall have no more than three (3) pages of text and no attachments) reporting to the Court the current status of the dispute. The Court will then further review the matter. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/21/18. Text Only Entry (GPG)
May 18, 2018 Filing 262 RESPONSE to #223 MOTION for Sanctions and a Default Judgment Against Certain Marriott Defendants filed by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jessica Black Livingston in Support of The Aspen Highlands Condominium Association's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Shea, Daniel)
May 18, 2018 Filing 261 REPLY to Response to 241 MOTION to Compel In Camera Review of an Unredacted Version of Marriott's Strategic Plan Memorandum filed by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Schrag, Michael)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MINUTE ORDER : Marriott Defendants shall disregard the Court's Order at ECF #259 as the document the Court was seeking is at ECF #246. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/17/2018. Text Only Entry (GPG)
May 16, 2018 Filing 259 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2. (tsher, )
May 16, 2018 Filing 258 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #257 Supplement/Amendment, #254 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #223 MOTION for Sanctions and a Default Judgment Against Certain Marriott Defendants and Leave to File Excess Pages, #253 Response, filed by attorney Ian S. Marx. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (sphil, )
May 16, 2018 Filing 257 Marriott Defendant's SUPPLEMENTAL Response to the Court's Order of May 14, 2018 Concerning the Identification of Documents on a Privilege Log by Defendants Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Marx, Ian) Modified on 5/17/2018 to correct document title. (sphil, ).
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER granting #254 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, The Marriott Defendants now have up to and including June 1, 2018 to file their response to the Motion and may include an additional 3 pages as requested. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/16/18. Text Only Entry (GPG)
May 16, 2018 Filing 255 MEMORANDUM regarding #254 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #223 MOTION for Sanctions and a Default Judgment Against Certain Marriott Defendants and Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/16/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
May 16, 2018 Filing 254 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #223 MOTION for Sanctions and a Default Judgment Against Certain Marriott Defendants and Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Marx, Ian)
May 16, 2018 Filing 253 RESPONSE to 252 Minute Order,, Unrestricted Copies of Memorandum (ECF #249) and the Borkholder Declaration (ECF # 247-not including any attachments) by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kathi Borkholder in Support of Marriott Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel)(Marx, Ian)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 252 MINUTE ORDER The Marriott Defendants shall file their memorandum (ECF #249) and the Borkholder declaration (ECF #247-NOT including any attachments) without restriction. This is in keeping with the Marriott Defendants notation on this subject, see ECF #249, p. 2, fn 1). This Courts Order requiring unrestricted filing of these two documents shall not constitute a waiver of the attorney-client privilege. Rather, the purpose of this Order is to allow Plaintiffs a fuller opportunity to respond-even in this in camera circumstance. Plaintiffs shall have forty-eight (48) hours to file any additional response after compliance with this Order by the Marriott Defendants. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/16/18. Text Only Entry (GPG)
May 15, 2018 Filing 251 REPLY to 245 the Court's Order of May 14, 2018 Concerning the Identification of Documents on a Privilege Log by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Schrag, Michael) Modified on 5/16/2018 to correct linkage. (sphil, ).
May 15, 2018 Filing 250 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P)(Ferguson, Matthew)
May 15, 2018 Filing 249 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: Memorandum in Opposition to #239 Motion to Compel by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC.. (Marx, Ian) Modified on 5/15/2018 to add document title and add linkage. (sphil, ).
May 15, 2018 Filing 248 RESPONSE to 245 Order on Motion to Compel,, Concerning the Identification of Documents on a Privilege Log by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Marx, Ian)
May 15, 2018 Filing 247 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: Declaration of Kathi Borkholder to #239 Motion to Compel by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(DeMais, Jaclyn) Modified on 5/15/2018 to document title and add linkage. (sphil, ).
May 15, 2018 Filing 246 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 2: Strategic Plan Memo by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC.. (DeMais, Jaclyn) Modified on 5/15/2018 to add document title. (sphil, ).
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER granting 241 Motion to Compel: Within twenty-four (24) hours, The Marriott Defendants SHALL submit to the Court, at Level 2 restriction, the item designated as the CGC Strategic Plan in unrestricted form for in camera review. In addition, Defendants may submit the additional explanation and documents referenced in their initial response (ECF #240), also at Level 2 restriction. Within the same 24 hours, Defendants shall also, in a separate and unrestricted filing, identify exactly where the CGC Strategic Plan was listed on any privilege log. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/14/2018. Text Only Entry (GPG)
May 14, 2018 Filing 244 MEMORANDUM regarding 241 MOTION to Compel filed by Hope S Barkan. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/14/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
May 13, 2018 Filing 243 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #240 Response, filed by attorney Ian S. Marx. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry). (sphil, )
May 13, 2018 Filing 240 RESPONSE #239 TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL IN CAMERA REVIEW OF AN UNREDACTED VERSION OF MARRIOTTS STRATEGIC PLAN MEMORANDUM AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED RELIEF by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (DeMais, Jaclyn) Modified on 5/14/2018 to add linkage. (sphil, ).
May 11, 2018 Filing 241 Plainitffs' MOTION to Compel in Camera Review of an Unredacted Version by Plaintiff Hope S Barkan, et al. (Public Entry for Restricted Document #239 filed on 05/11/2018). Text only entry. (sphil, )
May 11, 2018 Filing 239 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Reiser, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Schrag, Michael)
May 10, 2018 Filing 242 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #238 Response, filed by attorney Jaclyn DeMais. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry). (sphil, )
May 10, 2018 Filing 238 RESPONSE to #234 Status Conference, Court's Order Directing the Parties to State Their Positions with Respect to Certain Plaintiff Depositions by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (DeMais, Jaclyn) Modified on 7/12/2018 to convert into motion (jgonz, ).
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER granting #185 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/10/2018. Plaintiffs shall docket their sixth amended complaint (currently filed at ECF #185-18). (tsher, )
May 9, 2018 Filing 236 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #235 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney DAIVD L. MASTERS. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents. (Text Only Entry). (sphil, )
May 9, 2018 Filing 235 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David L. Masters on behalf of Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLCAttorney David L. Masters added to party Cobalt Travel Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David L. Masters added to party Cobalt Travel Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David L. Masters added to party Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The(pty:dft), Attorney David L. Masters added to party Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The(pty:dft), Attorney David L. Masters added to party Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David L. Masters added to party Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David L. Masters added to party Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney David L. Masters added to party Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney David L. Masters added to party Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David L. Masters added to party Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC(pty:dft) (Masters, David)
May 3, 2018 Filing 234 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Status Conference held on 5/3/2018. Discussion held regarding outstanding motions. Finding good cause, the Court will change the current Scheduling Order deadlines as set forth on the record. Plaintiff to submit new proposed Order. FTR: Grand Junction - PM. (tsher, )
May 3, 2018 Filing 233 MEMORANDUM regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions and a Default Judgment Against Certain Marriott Defendants #223 . Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/3/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec) Modified on 5/16/2018 to add docket number of referred motion (pabsec).
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER [Corrected], by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/3/2018. (tsher, )
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 231 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/3/2018. Discovery due by 7/16/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 10/9/2018. Motions due by 10/9/2018. (tsher, )
May 2, 2018 Filing 230 Proposed Scheduling Order and Notice of Filing by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Revised Scheduling and Status Conference)(Ferguson, Matthew)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 229 MINUTE ORDER granting #222 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation. Plaintiff may file a motion for sanctions and default judgment not to exceed 18 pages. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/2/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/2/2018 03:00 PM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Telephone appearance is pre-approved. Counsel shall confer among themselves as to which party will convene all parties on one line prior to placing the call to the courtroom at 970-241-8932, Extension 8225. The Court does not have the ability to conference multiple parties so all parties are to be on the line at the time the Court is contacted. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on May 1, 2018. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
May 1, 2018 Filing 227 MEMORANDUM regarding Status Report, and Requests for Entry of Revised Scheduling and Status Conference. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/1/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
April 30, 2018 Filing 226 STATUS REPORT and Request for Entry of Revised Scheduling Order and Extension of Discovery by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Ferguson, Matthew) Modified on 5/1/2018 to change event type. (sphil, ).
April 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 225 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/30/2018. Motions due by 9/10/2018. (tsher, )
April 27, 2018 Filing 224 Request for Judicial NOTICE re #223 MOTION for Sanctions and a Default Judgment Against Certain Marriott Defendants REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Schrag, Michael) Modified on 4/30/2018 to correct document title. (sphil, ).
April 27, 2018 Filing 223 MOTION for Sanctions and a Default Judgment Against Certain Marriott Defendants by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael J. Reiser, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schrag, Michael)
April 27, 2018 Filing 222 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schrag, Michael)
April 23, 2018 Filing 221 SURREPLY re #202 MOTION to Compel Discovery and For Sanctions Against The Marriott Defendants filed by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Beer, Naomi)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting #218 Motion for Leave: The Court Grants the motion and will allow a sur-reply of no more than five (5) pages. The Court takes under advisement the motion for oral argument. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/23/2018. Text Only Entry (GPG)
April 23, 2018 Filing 219 MEMORANDUM regarding #218 MOTION for Leave to Submit a Short Sur-Reply (Opposed) and Unopposed Motion to Set Oral Argument #202 MOTION to Compel Discovery and For Sanctions Against The Marriott Defendants filed by Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/23/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
April 23, 2018 Filing 218 MOTION for Leave to Submit a Short Sur-Reply (Opposed) and Unopposed Motion to Set Oral Argument #202 MOTION to Compel Discovery and For Sanctions Against The Marriott Defendants by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Beer, Naomi)
April 12, 2018 Filing 217 Marriott Defendants' ANSWER to #119 Amended Complaint by Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC.(Beer, Naomi)
April 12, 2018 Filing 216 Aspen Highlands ANSWER to #119 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Aspen Highlands Condominium Association.(Shea, Daniel) Modified on 4/16/2018 to add docket text. (sphil, ).
April 10, 2018 Filing 215 REPLY to Response to #202 MOTION to Compel Discovery and For Sanctions Against The Marriott Defendants filed by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew C. Ferguson ISO sanctions motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Ritz Carlton Development Company co Marriott Intl Subpoena, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Ritz Carlton Hotel Company co Marriott Intl Subpoena, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 John Hearns co Marriott Intl Subpoena, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Nicholas DiMeglio co Marriott Intl Subpoena)(Ferguson, Matthew)
April 6, 2018 Filing 214 RESPONSE to #211 MOTION for Order to Enter a Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Beer, Naomi)
April 2, 2018 Filing 213 RESPONSE to #202 MOTION to Compel Discovery and For Sanctions Against The Marriott Defendants filed by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Ian S. Marx in Support of Marriott Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S)(Beer, Naomi)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MEMORANDUM regarding Request for Entry of Revised Scheduling Order. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/2/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
March 30, 2018 Filing 211 STATUS REPORT and REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schrag, Michael) Modified on 4/2/2018 to change event type. (sphil, ). Modified on 7/12/2018 terminate motion (jgonz, ).
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/29/2018, re: #129 Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Associations Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint and #131 Marriott Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Fifth Amended Complaint are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth in this order. ORDERED that plaintiffs' first and second claims are dismissed insofar as they are based on the alleged failure to enforce, violation of, and failure to disclose a violation of the restrictive covenants contained in the Master Declaration and Declaration of Condominium. (sphil, )
March 28, 2018 Filing 209 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Jaclyn DeMais by Jaclyn DeMais on behalf of Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLCAttorney Jaclyn DeMais added to party Cobalt Travel Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jaclyn DeMais added to party Cobalt Travel Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jaclyn DeMais added to party Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The(pty:dft), Attorney Jaclyn DeMais added to party Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The(pty:dft), Attorney Jaclyn DeMais added to party Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jaclyn DeMais added to party Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jaclyn DeMais added to party Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jaclyn DeMais added to party Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jaclyn DeMais added to party Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jaclyn DeMais added to party Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC(pty:dft) (DeMais, Jaclyn)
March 27, 2018 Filing 208 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #206 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Roger B. Kaplan. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents. (Text Only Entry). (sphil, )
March 27, 2018 Filing 206 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Roger B. Kaplan by Roger Brian Kaplan on behalf of Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLCAttorney Roger Brian Kaplan added to party Cobalt Travel Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Roger Brian Kaplan added to party Cobalt Travel Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Roger Brian Kaplan added to party Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The(pty:dft), Attorney Roger Brian Kaplan added to party Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The(pty:dft), Attorney Roger Brian Kaplan added to party Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Roger Brian Kaplan added to party Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Roger Brian Kaplan added to party Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Roger Brian Kaplan added to party Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Roger Brian Kaplan added to party Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Roger Brian Kaplan added to party Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC(pty:dft) (Kaplan, Roger)
March 26, 2018 Filing 207 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #205 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Todd L. Schleifstein. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents. (Text Only Entry). (sphil, )
March 26, 2018 Filing 205 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Todd Schleifstein by Todd Lawrence Schleifstein on behalf of Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLCAttorney Todd Lawrence Schleifstein added to party Cobalt Travel Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Lawrence Schleifstein added to party Cobalt Travel Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Lawrence Schleifstein added to party Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Lawrence Schleifstein added to party Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Lawrence Schleifstein added to party Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Lawrence Schleifstein added to party Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Lawrence Schleifstein added to party Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Lawrence Schleifstein added to party Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Lawrence Schleifstein added to party Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Lawrence Schleifstein added to party Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC(pty:dft) (Schleifstein, Todd)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER taking under advisement #202 Motion to Compel: any response SHALL be filed within ten (10) days. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/21/2018. Text Only Entry (GPG)
March 20, 2018 Filing 203 MEMORANDUM regarding #202 Motion to Compel Discovery and for Sanctions Against the Marriott Defendants. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/20/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
March 20, 2018 Filing 202 MOTION to Compel Discovery and For Sanctions Against The Marriott Defendants by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Ferguson, Matthew)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 03/19/2018. ORDERED that the Court's Order to Show Cause #192 is DISCHARGED. (sphil, )
March 15, 2018 Filing 200 RESPONSE to #191 Notice of Supplemental Authorities, by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Schrag, Michael)
March 14, 2018 Filing 199 REPLY to Response to #185 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #136 Order, #119 Amended Complaint, #60 Scheduling Order, #161 Scheduling Order, #184 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Schrag, Michael)
March 12, 2018 Filing 198 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Timbers BG Management, LLC by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Beer, Naomi)
March 12, 2018 Filing 197 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents to RCC-BG Condominium Association, Inc. by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Beer, Naomi)
March 12, 2018 Filing 196 NOTICE of Subpoena to Produce Documents to Gerald McCarthy by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Beer, Naomi)
March 7, 2018 Filing 195 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on March 29, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Gallagher. Pages: 1-12. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
March 7, 2018 Filing 194 BRIEF re #192 Order to Show Cause, (Brief in Response to Court's Order to Show Cause) by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Beer, Naomi)
February 28, 2018 Filing 193 RESPONSE to #185 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #136 Order, #119 Amended Complaint, #60 Scheduling Order, #161 Scheduling Order, #184 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (Marriott Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Scheduling Order to Add Claim for Exemplary Damages and Motion to Amend Complaint) filed by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Beer, Naomi)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/26/2018. ORDERED that, on or before 5:00 p.m. on March 8, 2018, defendants Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., The Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC, The Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, and The Lion & Crown Travel Company, LLC shall show cause why this case should not be remanded due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, )
February 22, 2018 Filing 191 NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities Submitted in Further Support of re: #131 MOTION to Dismiss Fifth Amended Complaint by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beer, Naomi)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER granting #184 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, the filing party may file up to 18 pages on this issue. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/20/18. Text Only Entry (GPG)
February 20, 2018 Filing 189 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher: Discovery Hearing held on 2/20/2018. Discovery due by 5/14/2018. FTR: Courtroom A-201. (slibi, )
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER, Set Hearings: Discovery Dispute Hearing set for 2/16/2018 from 1:00 PM to 3:00 PM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Telephonic appearance is pre-approved; however, counsel must confer among themselves so that prior to contacting the Court, all parties shall be on one line as the Court does not have the ability to conference multiple parties. At the time of the hearing, please contact the Court at 970-241-8932, EXTENSION 8225. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on February 13, 2018. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER granting #162 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva terminated by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/8/2018. Text Only Entry (GPG)
February 8, 2018 Filing 186 MEMORANDUM regarding #162 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel of Lilia Bulgucheva filed by Plaintiffs; #184 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Plaintiffs; #185 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify filed by Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/08/2018. Text Only Entry. (sphil, )
February 7, 2018 Filing 185 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #136 Order, #119 Amended Complaint, #60 Scheduling Order, #161 Scheduling Order, #184 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew C. Ferguson, #2 Appendix A, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17)(Meade, Tyler)
February 7, 2018 Filing 184 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Meade, Tyler)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER denying #166 Motion for Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of Stephen P. Weisz by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/28/2018. (jgonz, )
January 26, 2018 Filing 182 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Dispute Hearing held on January 12, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Gallagher. Pages: 1-32. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER finding as moot #153 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify as this filing was resolved by ECF #161. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/23/2018. Text Only Entry (GPG)
January 18, 2018 Filing 179 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #168 Declaration, of Ian S. Marx in Support of Marriott Defendants Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion for Protective Order Precluding the Disposition of Stephen P. Weisz by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Beer, Naomi)
January 18, 2018 Filing 178 BRIEF in Support of #166 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of Stephen P. Weisz filed by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Beer, Naomi)
January 12, 2018 Filing 180 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Discovery Hearing held on 1/12/2018. It is likewise Ordered that 2/9/2018 shall be the deadline for the parties to provide a Discovery Dispute Chart to the Court - be it the same or updated. FTR: Grand Junction - PM. (tsher, )
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting #175 Motion to Clarify: The prior lack of a reply time was based on the perceived need to resolve this matter quickly over the holidays before a set deposition. With that urgency now gone, it is appropriate to allow a reply. It is Ordered that Marriott Defendants may file a reply on or before January 18, 2018 of no greater length than the response. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/11/2018. Text Only Entry (ggall, )
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MEMORANDUM regarding #175 MOTION to Clarify re 172 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, filed by Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/11/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
January 11, 2018 Filing 175 MOTION to Clarify re 172 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Beer, Naomi)
January 8, 2018 Filing 174 BRIEF in Opposition to #166 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of Stephen P. Weisz filed by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Schrag Decl. ISO Opp. to Motion for Protective Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Schrag, Michael)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER, Set/Reset Hearings: At the parties' request, a Discovery Dispute Hearing is set for 1/12/2018 12:00 PM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Parties are pre-approved to call in to the courtroom with the instruction that Plaintiff shall bear responsibility for ensuring that all parties wishing to appear telephonically are on one line prior to calling in to the courtroom at 970-241-8932, Extension 8225. The Court does not have the ability to conference multiple parties so all parties are to be on the line at the time the Court is contacted. Parties are advised to review Judge Gallagher's practice standards and to supply a Joint Discovery Dispute Chart by 9 a.m. on 1/11/2018 to Gallagher_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on January 4, 2018. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
December 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #171 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Under the circumstances, with the understanding that there is no deposition scheduled for 12/29/17, the Court finds good cause to grant the motion and Orders that Plaintiffs shall file their response to the Rule 26 Motion or before January 8, 2017. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/25/17. Text Only Entry (ggall, )
December 25, 2017 Filing 171 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #166 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of Stephen P. Weisz by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Reiser, Matthew)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER taking under advisement #166 Motion for Protective Order: Any response may be filed no later than noon on 12/26/17. No reply will be accepted without further Order of the Court. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/22/17. Text Only Entry (ggall, )
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 MEMORANDUM regarding #166 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of Stephen P. Weisz filed by Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/22/17. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
December 22, 2017 Filing 168 DECLARATION of Ian S. Marx regarding MOTION for Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of Stephen P. Weisz #166 by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Envelope C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Beer, Naomi)
December 22, 2017 Filing 167 DECLARATION of Mary Helon regarding MOTION for Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of Stephen P. Weisz #166 by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Beer, Naomi)
December 22, 2017 Filing 166 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of Stephen P. Weisz by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Beer, Naomi)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER, Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/28/2018 01:00 PM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Telephone appearance is pre-approved. Counsel shall confer among themselves as to which party will convene all parties on one line prior to placing the call to the courtroom at 970-241-8932, Extension 8225. The Court does not have the ability to conference multiple parties so all parties are to be on the line at the time the Court is contacted. If a party anticipates discussion of more substantive matters that would require a hearing with more than 30 minutes, or personal appearances, please contact chambers 10 days prior to this status conference to explore the necessity of rescheduling. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on December 14, 2017. Text Only Entry (gpgsec)
November 28, 2017 Filing 164 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #162 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by attorney Matthew Reiser. The document is filed incorrectly. Refer to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5. Attorney has been contacted with instructions. (Text Only Entry) (sphil, )
November 28, 2017 Filing 163 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #162 Notice (Other) filed by attorney Matthew Reiser. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (sphil, )
November 28, 2017 Filing 162 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel of Lilia Bulgucheva by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer (Reiser, Matthew) Modified on 11/29/2017 to correct document type. (sphil, ).
November 24, 2017 Filing 160 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #153 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify filed by attorneyMatthew C. Ferguson.The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (dkals, )
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 161 SECOND REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER, Section 9 by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/22/2017. (jgonz, )
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting #152 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. The motion is GRANTED in that the status conference set for 11/30/17 is vacated. The issues regarding amended deadlines will be addressed in a separate filing in the 2nd revised scheduling order. Within 14 days, the parties are to jointly contact the Court's Clerk at (970) 241-8932 or by email to arrange a status conference which is to be held in approximately 120 days. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/22/17. Text Only Entry (ggall, )
November 22, 2017 Filing 158 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #155 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Isabella Martinez.The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (dkals, )
November 22, 2017 Filing 157 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #154 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser.The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (dkals, )
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMORANDUM regarding #152 and #153 Motions to Amend Scheduling Order. Referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/22/17. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
November 21, 2017 Filing 155 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isabella Martinez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Hope S Barkan(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Hope S Barkan(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Mel A Barkan(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Mel A Barkan(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Karen G. Baronne(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Karen G. Baronne(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Lon Baronne(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Lon Baronne(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Gail L Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Gail L Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Jeffrey A Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Jeffrey A Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party John Benko(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party John Benko(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Natalie Benko(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Natalie Benko(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Karen Schneider Benrubi(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Karen Schneider Benrubi(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Richard Benrubi (pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Richard Benrubi (pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Katherine M. Benz (pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Katherine M. Benz (pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party William R. Benz (pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party William R. Benz (pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Benz Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Benz Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party John Bergstrom(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party John Bergstrom(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Jeffrey C Bermant(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Jeffrey C Bermant(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Amy S Bernstein(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Amy S Bernstein(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Jeffrey L Bernstein(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Jeffrey L Bernstein(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Gene M. Bindler(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Gene M. Bindler(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Richard B. Bindler(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Richard B. Bindler(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Constance H Blacher(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Constance H Blacher(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party David S Blacher(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party David S Blacher(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Ellen Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Ellen Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Jennifer Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Jennifer Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party John E Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party John E Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Robert Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Robert Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Beverly S. Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Beverly S. Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party William S. Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party William S. Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Bradford T. Oddo Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Bradford T. Oddo Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Bradley Properties, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Bradley Properties, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Marc Braha(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Marc Braha(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Christopher Branoff(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Christopher Branoff(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Kimberley Branoff (pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Kimberley Branoff (pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Lawerence Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Lawerence Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Penny Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Penny Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Robin Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Robin Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Sandra H. Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Sandra H. Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Sidney Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Sidney Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust (pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust (pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Paul Brunswick(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Paul Brunswick(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Charles B Buchanan(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Charles B Buchanan(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Charlotte S Buchanan(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Charlotte S Buchanan(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Robert Buzzetti(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Robert Buzzetti(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party C & N Assets, Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party C & N Assets, Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Monica M Campanella(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Monica M Campanella(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Julie C Canner(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Julie C Canner(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Carol Anne Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Carol Anne Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Michael A Capasso(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Michael A Capasso(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Reeta G Casey(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Reeta G Casey(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Margaret A. Castleman (pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Margaret A. Castleman (pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Michael S. Castleman (pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Michael S. Castleman (pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A. (pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A. (pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Gary S Chavin(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Gary S Chavin(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Pat A Chavin(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Pat A Chavin(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Lee James Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Lee James Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Theresa Ann Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Theresa Ann Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Kevin Clare(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Kevin Clare(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Eric C. Colson(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Eric C. Colson(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Jennfier Colson(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Jennfier Colson(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Toby L Cone(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Toby L Cone(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Corporate Retreats, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Corporate Retreats, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Perry Newton Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Perry Newton Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Daryl Cramer(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Daryl Cramer(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Heather Cramer(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Heather Cramer(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Norman C Creech(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Norman C Creech(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Susan S Creech(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Susan S Creech(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Melissa T Crowley(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Melissa T Crowley(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Katherine F. Cuntz(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Katherine F. Cuntz(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Carol A Cushman(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Carol A Cushman(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Kenneth D Cushman(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Kenneth D Cushman(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party D&J Properties, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party D&J Properties, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party DRE, Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party DRE, Inc. (pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA(pty:pla), Attorney Isabella Martinez added to party Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS,
November 21, 2017 Filing 154 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew Whitacre Reiser on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Hope S Barkan(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Hope S Barkan(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Mel A Barkan(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Mel A Barkan(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Karen G. Baronne(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Karen G. Baronne(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Lon Baronne(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Lon Baronne(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Gail L Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Gail L Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Jeffrey A Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Jeffrey A Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party John Benko(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party John Benko(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Natalie Benko(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Natalie Benko(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Karen Schneider Benrubi(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Karen Schneider Benrubi(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Richard Benrubi (pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Richard Benrubi (pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Katherine M. Benz (pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Katherine M. Benz (pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party William R. Benz (pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party William R. Benz (pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Benz Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Benz Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party John Bergstrom(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party John Bergstrom(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Jeffrey C Bermant(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Jeffrey C Bermant(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Amy S Bernstein(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Amy S Bernstein(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Jeffrey L Bernstein(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Jeffrey L Bernstein(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Gene M. Bindler(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Gene M. Bindler(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Richard B. Bindler(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Richard B. Bindler(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Constance H Blacher(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Constance H Blacher(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party David S Blacher(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party David S Blacher(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Ellen Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Ellen Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Jennifer Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Jennifer Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party John E Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party John E Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Robert Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Robert Blanchard(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Beverly S. Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Beverly S. Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party William S. Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party William S. Bloom(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Bradford T. Oddo Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Bradford T. Oddo Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Bradley Properties, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Bradley Properties, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Marc Braha(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Marc Braha(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Christopher Branoff(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Christopher Branoff(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Kimberley Branoff (pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Kimberley Branoff (pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Lawerence Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Lawerence Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Penny Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Penny Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Robin Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Robin Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Sandra H. Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Sandra H. Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Sidney Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Sidney Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust (pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust (pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Paul Brunswick(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Paul Brunswick(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Charles B Buchanan(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Charles B Buchanan(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Charlotte S Buchanan(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Charlotte S Buchanan(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Robert Buzzetti(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Robert Buzzetti(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party C & N Assets, Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party C & N Assets, Ltd.(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Monica M Campanella(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Monica M Campanella(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Julie C Canner(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Julie C Canner(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Carol Anne Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Carol Anne Cannon(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Michael A Capasso(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Michael A Capasso(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Reeta G Casey(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Reeta G Casey(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Margaret A. Castleman (pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Margaret A. Castleman (pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Michael S. Castleman (pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Michael S. Castleman (pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A. (pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A. (pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Gary S Chavin(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Gary S Chavin(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Pat A Chavin(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Pat A Chavin(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Lee James Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Lee James Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Theresa Ann Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Theresa Ann Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Kevin Clare(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Kevin Clare(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Eric C. Colson(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Eric C. Colson(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Jennfier Colson(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Jennfier Colson(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Toby L Cone(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Toby L Cone(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Corporate Retreats, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Corporate Retreats, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Perry Newton Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Perry Newton Cox(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Daryl Cramer(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Daryl Cramer(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Heather Cramer(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Heather Cramer(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Norman C Creech(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Norman C Creech(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Susan S Creech(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Susan S Creech(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Melissa T Crowley(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reiser added to party Melissa T Crowley(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Whitacre Reise
November 21, 2017 Filing 153 Proposed Scheduling Order Section 9 by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Meade, Tyler) Modified on 11/22/2017 to change event (dkals, ).
November 21, 2017 Filing 152 Joint STATUS REPORT FOR STATUS CONFERENCE ON NOVEMBER 30, 2017 AND REQUEST FOR NINETY (90) DAY EXTENSION OF CERTAIN DISCOVERY AND MOTION DEADLINES by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer. (Meade, Tyler) Modified on 11/22/2017 to change event (dkals, ).
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER: Correction as to ECF [#147]. Status Conference previously set for November 28, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED; the Status Conference set for 11/30/2017 10:30 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher will take place as previously set forth. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on November 20, 2017. Text Only Entry (gpgsec)
November 6, 2017 Filing 150 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #148 Notice (Other), #149 Notice (Other) filed by attorney Lilia Bulgucheva. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (sphil, )
November 6, 2017 Filing 149 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS TO MICHAEL MARINO by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer (Bulgucheva, Lilia)
November 6, 2017 Filing 148 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS TO IVAN SKORIC by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer (Bulgucheva, Lilia)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/30/2017 10:30 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher is hereby VACATED. Set/Reset Hearings: This Status Conference is re-set for 11/30/2017 10:30 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Telephone appearance is pre-approved; however, those parties/attorneys wishing to call in to the courtroom and appear telephonically must make arrangements prior to the hearing so that all are on the same conference call because the court does not have the ability to conference multiple parties. So all parties are to be on the line at the time the Courtroom is called. The Courtroom number is 970-241-8932, EXTENSION 8225. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on October 19, 2017. Text Only Entry (gpgsec)
October 19, 2017 Filing 146 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION TO JOHN C. VAUGHN by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1)(Bulgucheva, Lilia)
October 19, 2017 Filing 145 NOTICE OF SUBPOENA TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS TO CUSHMAN & WAKEFIELD WESTERN, INC. by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1)(Bulgucheva, Lilia)
October 19, 2017 Filing 144 NOTICE OF FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS CHANGE by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer (Bulgucheva, Lilia)
October 19, 2017 Filing 143 NOTICE OF SUBPOENAS TO TESTIFY AT A DEPOSITION by Plaintiffs Hope S Barkan, Mel A Barkan, Karen G. Baronne, Lon Baronne, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, John Benko, Natalie Benko, Karen Schneider Benrubi, Richard Benrubi, Katherine M. Benz, William R. Benz, Benz Living Trust, John Bergstrom, Jeffrey C Bermant, Amy S Bernstein, Jeffrey L Bernstein, Gene M. Bindler, Richard B. Bindler, Constance H Blacher, David S Blacher, Ellen Blanchard, Jennifer Blanchard, John E Blanchard, Robert Blanchard, Beverly S. Bloom, William S. Bloom, Bradford T. Oddo Trust, Bradley Properties, LLC, Marc Braha, Christopher Branoff, Kimberley Branoff, Lawerence Brown, Penny Brown, Robin Brown, Sandra H. Brown, Sidney Brown, Bruce Nesbitt Revocable Trust, Paul Brunswick, Charles B Buchanan, Charlotte S Buchanan, Robert Buzzetti, C & N Assets, Ltd., Monica M Campanella, Julie C Canner, Carol Anne Cannon, Michael A Capasso, Reeta G Casey, Margaret A. Castleman, Michael S. Castleman, Charles F. A. McCluer, III, P.A., Gary S Chavin, Pat A Chavin, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Christiane Nicolini Glazer Trust, Kevin Clare, Eric C. Colson, Jennfier Colson, Toby L Cone, Corporate Retreats, LLC, Perry Newton Cox, Daryl Cramer, Heather Cramer, Norman C Creech, Susan S Creech, Melissa T Crowley, Katherine F. Cuntz, Carol A Cushman, Kenneth D Cushman, D&J Properties, LLC, DRE, Inc., Benje R Daniel, Jr., DDS, MS, PA, Danny V. Lackey Living Trust, David S. Israel Trust, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Mark D Dembs, Mona L Dembs, Derby City Investments, LLC, Donald A. Kurz Trust, Lynda Dupre, Lois Dupre-Shuster, John Egle, Carl Eichstaedt, III, El Paso Asset Management, LLC, Judy Epstein, Stuart A. Epstein, Edward R. Farber, Krayndel Farber, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, David A Figliulo, Lesa A Figliulo, David M. Flaum, Ilene L. Flaum, Cass Franklin, Vera Stewart Franklin, Franklin Family Investments, Ltd., Brenda C Friedman, Fred H Friedman, David Friedman, Lily Ann Friedman, Kay K. Friermood, Thomas G. Friermood, Joseph Fryzer, Linda Gage-White, Gerald L. Giudici, Maria P. Giudici, Christiane Nicolini Glazer, Ronald Lawrence Glazer, Charles A Gottlob, Cynthia G Gottlob, Brett A. Gottsch, Gilbert P Gradinger, Sally A Gradinger, Graham J. Albutt Trust, Kevin E Grant, Greico Family Limited Partnership, Michael B. Gross, Guenther Partners I, LLC, Caroline I Gurland, Steve V Gurland, George W. Haligowski, Barry Hammer, Jeffrey Hammer, Renee Hammer, Robert Hammer, Hammer Family Limited Partnership, Mark E Haranzo, Bryan J Hawkins, Laura A Hawkins, Carol J. Hidalgo, Gayle Hirsch, Lewis J Hirsch, Michael Hobin, Mary Glancy Hobin, Dale Hoffman, Stephen J. Hoffman, Mark L. Horwitz, Susan J Horwitz, Louise B Hoversten, Jan H Hubbell, Robert C Hubbell, Hudson News Distributors, LLC, Brandi M. Hurwitz, Michael B. Hurwitz, Natalie B Hyland, Timothy J Hyland, Hyland Revocable Living Trust, David S Israel, Brian D. Isroff, Louise A. Isroff, J & B Woods Family Associates, LLC, J&M Zamora Family LP, JAWSFW, LLC, JH Capital Corporation, David Jackel, Greg Jacobson, Deborah J. Jacoby, Mark A. Jacoby, Julie Janicek-Wilkey, Jeffrey B. Oddo Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, John J. Schultz III Trust, Cheryl M Jones, R. David Jones, Irma Jurkowitz, Morris M Jurkowitz, Jurkowitz 1996 Family Trust, Carol Kadison, Douglas Kadison, Annette Kalcheim, Robert Kaufmann, John M. Keane, Kevin and Marcie Taylor Trust, Catherine G.C. Kimball, Garry R Kimball, Deborah Joy Kohler, Gary Sheldon Kohler, Carole Kolsky, Martin Kolsky, Kona, Ltd., Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, Krayndel Farber Trust, Donald A. Kurz, Danny V Lackey, Nancy L Lackey, David Lancashire, Landes Aspen, LLC, Dee P Lattore, Patrick A Lattore, Le Befana Trust, Ronald F. Lemar, Alexa Lerner, Jonathan Lerner, Lynda Overly Levengood, Richard Louis Levengood, Levy Ventures Limited Partnership, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Lisa Mottola Trust, Kimberly A. Littman, Thomas N. Littman, Gail Lockyer, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Maazb Family Limited Partnership, Marrianne Magnuson, Ludmila Malakhova, Vladimir Malakhova, Maria P. Giudici Trust, Richard N. Mark, Mary Glancy Hobin Trust, John Patrick McEvoy, Maria Gomez McEvoy, Allen D. McGee, J. Holton McGee, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Milan Randic Trust, Lisa Miller, Mindy R. Wexler Revocable Trust, Mirjana Randic Trust, Dan Moskowitz, Wendy Moskowitz, Lisa Mottola, Rocky J Mountain, Janet M Mountain, Mountain Drive Trust, Hal S. Mullins, Kyle Nagel, Nancy L. Lackey Living Trust, Neil Spizizen Trust, Bruce E. Nelson, Nelson Trust, Bruce M Nesbitt, Nina Development, Ltd., Jerry M Nowell, Bradford T Oddo, Jeffrey B Oddo, Rick M Oddo, Michael P Pacin, Barbara L Palazzolo, H.M. Palm, Margaret Palm, Jeanne G Parker, Russell S Parker, Douglas M. Patinkin, Jenny R. Patinkin, Judy L. Peckler, Samuel H Pepkowitz, Roberta A Pepkowitz, Pepkowitz Trust, Peter Charles Crowley Trust, Nancy A Petrie, Walter H Petrie, Anthony F Prinster, Sally L Prinster, Thomas M Prose, R. David & Cheryl M. Jones Revocable Living Trust, RCHFU, LLC, Ami Rabinowitz, Evan Rabinowitz, Milan Randic, Mirjana Randic, Jeffrey Rappin, Reeta G. Casey Revocable Living Trust, Bruce E Reid, Rosemary W Reid, Jeffrey Richter, Rick M. Oddo Trust, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Caroline Robinson, Michael G Robinson, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Ronald Lawrence Glazer Trust, Amy D Ronner, Darryl Rosen, Carla P Rosenthal, Paul C Rosenthal, Rock Pile, LLC, 8202 RCC Aspen Highlands, LLC, 831 701 Ontario Limited, Ami Rabinowitz Trust, Lucy D Anda, Stephen Andrews, Annette Kalcheim Trust, Neil G Arnovitz, Barbara L. Palazzolo Revocable Trust, Carl Andrew Rudella, Tammiejo Rudella, SIP Scotch Investments, LLC, Joel Sacher, Susan J Sacher, Deborah Cavazos Safi, Hazim Safi, David Schaecter, Alan B. Schneider, Joel A. Schneider, Merle J. Schneider, Barry K. Schochet, Phyllis Schofield, William F Schofield, Jr., Joanna F. Segal, Scott Daniel Segal, Olga A. Selivanova, Morton Eugene Sherman, Susan Ann Sherman, William N. Shoff, John J. Shultz, III, Nancy Lynne Shute, Allan C. Silverstein, Elizabeth M Simon, Howard A Simon, Shelley R. Singer, Robert A Sklar, Jacob Louis Slevin, Spencer L. Youngblood Family Partnership Ltd., Neil Spizizen, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, Deborah Stegner, Michelle Stern, TSE Holdings, LLC, Marcie Taylor, Kevin Taylor, Erich Tengelsen, John H Thames, Jr., The David & Lesa Figliulo Family Revocable Living Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Kenneth Tompkins, Kimberly Tompkins, Stacey Torchon, Patricia Travers, Evan F. Trestman, Trip Colorado, LLC, Emily Vogl, Frank R Vogl, Richard F Wackeen, Sharon R Wackeen, Alan S Waxman, William M Waxman, Dana James Weinkle, Susan Holloway Weinkle, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Gayle Weiss, Mindy R Wexler, Clair F White, D. L. Wilkey, Winston & Lady, LP, Wiviott Family Trust, Maureen D Wright, Thomas R Wright, Barbara Wrubel, Anna P Zalk, Zamalt, LLC, Brenda Zelnick, Jack Zemer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1, #2 Exhibit #2, #3 Exhibit #3, #4 Exhibit #4)(Bulgucheva, Lilia)
May 19, 2017 Filing 142 REPLY to Response to #129 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Shea, Daniel)
May 19, 2017 Filing 141 REPLY to Response to #129 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Beer, Naomi)
May 5, 2017 Filing 140 RESPONSE to #131 MOTION to Dismiss Fifth Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs (Ferguson, Matthew) Modified on 5/8/2017 clean up text (jhawk, ).
May 5, 2017 Filing 139 RESPONSE to #129 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs (Ferguson, Matthew) Modified on 5/8/2017 clean up text (jhawk, ).
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MINUTE ORDER granting #137 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation. Plaintiffs may file responses to the motions to dismiss #129 and #131 not to exceed 20 pages. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/2/17. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
May 2, 2017 Filing 137 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Marriott Defendants' and Association's Motions to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ferguson, Matthew) Modified on 5/8/2017 to clean up text (jhawk, ).
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER, SECTIONS 6 & 9: Discovery due by 12/15/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 6/11/2018, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/27/2017. (jgonz, )
April 27, 2017 Filing 135 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher: Scheduling Conference held on 4/27/2017. Appearing were: Matthew Ferguson for Plaintiffs in person; Michael Reiser for Plaintiffs via phone; Ian Marx for Marriott Defendants via phone, and Daniel Shea for Association Defendant via phone. The parties advised the Court of agreement reached on the disputed portion of the revised Scheduling Order and referred the Court to the document filed earlier this afternoon entitled Revised Scheduling Order, Sections 6 & 9 #134 . At this conference, the parties changed two deadlines (Daubert deadline is now 5/21/18 and Dispositive Motion deadline is now 6/11/18). The Court approved of these changes and interlineated those into this latest document on page 10. Thus, the final rendition of this portion of the Scheduling Order is now hereby Ordered and entitled: "Revised Scheduling Order, Sections 6 and 9 - GPG additions." FTR: Grand Junction. (gpgsec) Text Only Entry
April 27, 2017 Filing 134 Proposed Scheduling Order (updated April 27, 2017) by all Plaintiffs (Ferguson, Matthew) Modified on 4/27/2017 to clean up docket text (jhawk, ).
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER Set/Reset Hearings: Discovery Status Conference set for 4/27/2017 03:00 PM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Entered by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on April 24, 2017. Text Only Entry (gpgsec)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' Revised Scheduling Order, Sections 6 and 9 and is aware that there may be a dispute over Section 9. Parties are directed to jointly contact the Court's chambers at 970-241-8932 to schedule a 15-minute status conference to address this issue. Parties are pre-approved to appear at said status conference by telephone by calling 970-241-8932: extension 8225. For this particular discovery status conference, a discovery dispute chart per the Court's local rules is not required. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on April 17, 2017. Text Only Entry (gpgsec)
April 14, 2017 Filing 131 MOTION to Dismiss Fifth Amended Complaint by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Beer, Naomi)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MINUTE ORDER striking #128 Motion to Dismiss filed by defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC, for violation of the Court's page limitations, as expanded by Minute Order 122 entered April 6, 2017. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/14/17. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
April 14, 2017 Filing 129 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fifth Amended Complaint by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Shea, Daniel)
April 14, 2017 Filing 128 STRICKEN MOTION to Dismiss Fifth Amended Complaint by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi) Modified on 4/17/2017 stricken pursuant to the Minute Order of 04/14/17 (jhawk, ).
April 13, 2017 Filing 127 Proposed Scheduling Order Sections 6 & 9 by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Submission of Revised Scheduling Order with Disputed Item)(Ferguson, Matthew) Modified on 4/14/2017 to clean up text (jhawk, ).
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #124 Motion for Extension of Time to File proposed new Scheduling Order until April 13, 2017. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/11/2017. Text Only Entry (ggall, )
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MEMORANDUM regarding 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed New Scheduling Order. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/11/17. Text Only Entry (kpreu)
April 10, 2017 Filing 124 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed New Scheduling Order by All Plaintiffs (Ferguson, Matthew) Modified on 4/11/2017 to clean up text (jhawk, ).
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MINUTE ORDER denying Motions to Dismiss #83 and #84 by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/6/17. (dkals, )
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MINUTE ORDER granting #120 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation. The Marriott Defendants and the Aspen Highlands Condominium Association may file motions to dismiss not to exceed 20 pages. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/6/17. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
April 6, 2017 Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Conference held on February 15, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Gallagher. Pages: 1-40. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Stevens-Koenig Reporting, )
April 6, 2017 Filing 120 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC, Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
March 31, 2017 Filing 119 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Ferguson, Matthew) Modified on 4/3/2017 to clean up text pursuant to PAB chambers instruction (jhawk, ).
March 29, 2017 Filing 118 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher: Status Conference held on 3/29/2017. Appearing by telephone were: Matthew Ferguson and Michael Reiser for Plaintiffs; Daniel Shea for Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Assn; and Ian Marx for the Marriott group of Defendants. ORDERED: Court granted relief requested by parties per their joint oral motion made at this hearing as follows: Plaintiffs are allowed to file a Fifth Amended Complaint which contains the additional claim previously granted and they are allowed to add the additional contemplated plaintiffs but this shall be the final amended complaint allowed in this matter. It is FURTHER ORDERED that: The Fifth Amended Complaint shall be due on March 31, 2017; Responsive pleadings to same shall be due on April 14, 2017; the proposed new scheduling order shall be due to the Court on April 10, 2017. FTR: Grand Junction. (gpgsec) Text Only Entry
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER. In light of the Notice of Withdrawal of Objection #116 , defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association's Objection to Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Case and Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order #108 is WITHDRAWN. by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/29/17. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
March 28, 2017 Filing 116 NOTICE re #108 OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re #105 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, Order on Motion to Stay by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. Notice of Withdrawal of Objection to the Order Regarding Plaintiffs Motion to Stay Case (ECF #89) and Order Regarding Plaintiffs Motion to Modify Scheduling Order (ECF # 87) by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association (Shea, Daniel)
March 22, 2017 Filing 115 BRIEF re #107 Notice of Supplemental Authorities, by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beer, Naomi)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting (in-part) #112 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. All Defendants have extended their deadline(s) to respond to Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Complaint up to and including ten (10) days following the Courts ruling on the Associations Objection to the Magistrate Judges Order. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 3/22/17. Text Only Entry (ggall, )
March 22, 2017 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM regarding #112 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/22/17. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
March 21, 2017 Filing 112 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Shea, Daniel)
March 17, 2017 Filing 111 REPLY to #108 OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re #105 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, Order on Motion to Stay by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. Reply in Support of Objection to Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Stay Case (ECF #89) and Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify Scheduling Order (ECF #87) by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Shea, Daniel)
March 15, 2017 Filing 110 RESPONSE to #108 Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision filed by all Plaintiffs (Ferguson, Matthew) Modified on 3/16/2017 to clean up text (jhawk, ).
March 10, 2017 Filing 109 AMENDED COMPLAINT And Jury Demand against All Defendants Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party JAWSFW, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party JAWSFW, LLC(pty:pla), filed by all Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Ferguson, Matthew) Modified on 3/16/2017 (jhawk, ).
March 1, 2017 Filing 108 WITHDRAWN OBJECTION/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re #105 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, Order on Motion to Stay by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shea, Daniel) Modified on 3/29/2017 withdrawn pursuant to the order of 03/29/17 (jhawk, ).
February 23, 2017 Filing 107 NOTICE of Supplemental Authorities Submitted in Opposition to Marriott Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re: #105 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, Order on Motion to Stay filed by all Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ferguson, Matthew) Modified on 3/16/2017 to clean up text (jhawk, ).
February 16, 2017 Filing 106 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher: Discovery Hearing held on 2/15/2017. Appearing were: Matthew Ferguson (in person) and Michael Reiser (via phone) for Plaintiffs; Ian Marx (via phone) for Marriott defendants; and Daniel Shea (in person) and Jessica Livingston (via phone) for Assn defendants. Court made rulings and Set/Reset Deadlines: New Proposed Scheduling Order due to Court in 45 days (April 3, 2017). FTR: Grand Junction. (gpgsec) Text Only Entry
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #87 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; denying as moot #89 Motion to Stay Case, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/15/2017. (slibi, )
February 15, 2017 Filing 104 STATUS REPORT for Status Conference on February 15, 2017 filed by all Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ferguson, Matthew) Modified on 3/16/2017 (jhawk, ).
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ENTRY Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher Orders that a Status Conference is hereby set for 2/15/2017 04:00 PM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) to discuss discovery issues in this case. All Counsel are pre-approved to appear via telephone. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to get all parties on the line before calling into the Courtroom at 970-241-8932, ext. 8225 at the time of the hearing because the Court does not have the ability to conference multiple parties. All parties are to be on the line at the time the Court is contacted. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/10/17.FTR: Grand Junction. (gpgsec) Text Only Entry
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE ORDER: The parties are to jointly contact the Clerk for Magistrate Judge Gallagher at (970) 241-8932 within 3 business days in order to set a time to hear further argument with regard to ECF #s 87 and 89. The parties will be allowed to appear by telephone if they so choose for the hearing. The Court would like to set a 30 minute block of time within the next 10 days. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 2/9/17. Text Only Entry (ggall, )
January 24, 2017 Filing 102 REPLY to Response to #89 MOTION to Stay filed by all Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew C. Ferguson)(Meade, Tyler) Modified on 1/25/2017 to clean up text (jhawk, ).
January 19, 2017 Filing 101 REPLY to Response to #87 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify to Modify Scheduling Order filed by all Plaintiffs' (Schrag, Michael) Modified on 1/20/2017 to correct text (jhawk, ).
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 1/13/2017. (slibi, )
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM regarding #98 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated) filed by Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/13/17. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
January 13, 2017 Filing 98 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Stipulated) by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beer, Naomi)
January 11, 2017 Filing 97 BRIEF in Opposition to #89 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Beer, Naomi)
January 10, 2017 Filing 96 RESPONSE to #89 MOTION to Stay filed by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Shea, Daniel)
January 10, 2017 Filing 95 Exhibits in Support of #94 Brief in Opposition to Motion (Corrected Exhibit 3) by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Shea, Daniel)
January 6, 2017 Filing 94 BRIEF in Opposition to #87 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Shea, Daniel)
January 6, 2017 Filing 93 BRIEF in Opposition to #87 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify to Modify Scheduling Order filed by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Beer, Naomi)
December 28, 2016 Filing 92 BRIEF in Support of #83 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Shea, Daniel)
December 28, 2016 Filing 91 BRIEF in Support of #84 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Beer, Naomi)
December 22, 2016 Filing 90 MEMORANDUM regarding MOTION to Stay #89 by all Plaintiffs. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/22/16. Text Only Entry (jhawk, )
December 21, 2016 Filing 89 MOTION to Stay by all Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schrag, Michael) Modified on 12/22/2016 to correct filer text pursuant to PAB chambers instruction (jhawk, ).
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM regarding MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify to Modify Scheduling Order by all plaintiffs #87 . Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/19/16. Text Only Entry (jhawk, )
December 16, 2016 Filing 87 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify to Modify Scheduling Order by all plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schrag, Michael) Modified on 12/19/2016 to correct filer text pursuant to PAB chambers instruction(jhawk, ).
December 14, 2016 Filing 86 RESPONSE to #84 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs' (Schrag, Michael) Modified on 12/15/2016 to clean up text pursuant to PAB Chambers instruction (jhawk, ).
December 14, 2016 Filing 85 RESPONSE to #83 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added represent all Plaintiffs' (Schrag, Michael) Modified on 12/15/2016 to clean up text pursuant to PAB Chambers (jhawk, ).
November 23, 2016 Filing 84 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
November 23, 2016 Filing 83 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Shea, Daniel)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #80 Joint Motion Regarding Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/22/16. (dkals, )
November 18, 2016 Filing 81 Exhibits in Support of #80 Joint MOTION for Order to Regarding Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Beer, Naomi) Modified on 12/22/2017 to correct filers (athom, ).
November 18, 2016 Filing 80 Joint MOTION for Order to Regarding Responses to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi) Modified on 12/22/2017 to correct filers (athom, ).
November 11, 2016 Filing 79 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants.(Ferguson, Matthew) Modified on 4/3/2017 to clean up text pursuant to PAB chambers instruction (jhawk, ).
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Minute Order. ORDERED that defendants' Motions to Dismiss [Docket Nos. #46 and #47 are DENIED as moot. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/08/16.(jhawk, )
November 7, 2016 Filing 77 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended and Supplemental Complaint and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Casey M Rogers, Thomas M Prose, Bonnie Likover, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Andrea C Meyerson, Koppleman Family Trust, Jeffrey A Bayer, RCHFU, LLC, Larry Koppleman, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, Edward P Meyerson, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, Jerry M Nowell, Stephen Weinstein, Stephen Andrews, Carl Eichstaedt, III, Lori Lowell, Toby L Cone Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Robert A Sklar, Toby L Cone, Jack Zemer, Craig Lipton, Shirley J Davis, Jeremy Lowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Lee James Chimerakis, TSE Holdings, LLC, Gail L Bayer, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Nancy Lynne Shute, Brenda Weinstein, Richard Davis, James Richard Farquhar, Susan P Stasney, Kevin Clare, Robert Buzzetti, Courtney S Rogers, C. Richard Stasney, David Lancashire, Julie C Canner.(Ferguson, Matthew) Modified on 11/8/2016 ATTORNEY NOTIFIED TO REFILE WITH CORRECT CAPTION AND ADD NEW PARTIES TO CASE PURSUANT TO PAB INSTRUCTIONS (jhawk, ).
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Order granting Motion to Add Plaintiffs in a Third Amended Complaint 74 , plaintiffs shall file the third amended complaint on or before November 7, 2016. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 11/3/16. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
October 13, 2016 Filing 75 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Michael Joseph Reiser (Reiser, Michael)
October 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting #71 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/10/16. Text Only Entry(ggall, )
October 7, 2016 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM regarding #71 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint to Add Plaintiffs to a Third Amended COmplaint and Supporting Memorandum filed by Gail L Bayer, Casey M Rogers, Jack Zemer, Susan P Stasney, Craig Lipton, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, Lori Lowell, Koppleman Family Trust, Brenda Weinstein, Carl Eichstaedt, III, James Richard Farquhar, Stephen Andrews, Robert A Sklar, Toby L Cone Trust, TSE Holdings, LLC, Shirley J Davis, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Richard Davis, Thomas M Prose, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Larry Koppleman, David Lancashire, Bonnie Likover, Nancy Lynne Shute, Andrea C Meyerson, Julie C Canner, Toby L Cone, Lee James Chimerakis, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, Jeffrey A Bayer, Edward P Meyerson, Jeremy Lowell, C. Richard Stasney, RCHFU, LLC, Robert Buzzetti, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Courtney S Rogers, Kevin Clare, Stephen Weinstein, Jerry M Nowell. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/7/16. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
October 7, 2016 Filing 72 NOTICE re #71 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint to Add Plaintiffs to a Third Amended COmplaint and Supporting Memorandum by Plaintiffs Stephen Andrews, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, Robert Buzzetti, Julie C Canner, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Kevin Clare, Toby L Cone, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Carl Eichstaedt, III, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, David Lancashire, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Jerry M Nowell, Thomas M Prose, RCHFU, LLC, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Nancy Lynne Shute, Robert A Sklar, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, TSE Holdings, LLC, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Jack Zemer (Ferguson, Matthew)
October 7, 2016 Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint to Add Plaintiffs to a Third Amended COmplaint and Supporting Memorandum by Plaintiffs Stephen Andrews, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, Robert Buzzetti, Julie C Canner, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Kevin Clare, Toby L Cone, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Carl Eichstaedt, III, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, David Lancashire, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Jerry M Nowell, Thomas M Prose, RCHFU, LLC, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Nancy Lynne Shute, Robert A Sklar, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, TSE Holdings, LLC, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Third Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order On Unopposed Motion to Add Plaintiffs in a Third Amended Complaint)(Ferguson, Matthew)
October 5, 2016 Filing 70 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tyler Roberts Meade on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Stephen Andrews(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Gail L Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Jeffrey A Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Robert Buzzetti(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Julie C Canner(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Lee James Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Theresa Ann Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Kevin Clare(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Toby L Cone(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Richard Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Shirley J Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Dee Ann Davis Nowell(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Carl Eichstaedt, III(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party James Richard Farquhar(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Jennifer Lucille Farquhar(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Jerry M. Nowell Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Larry Koppleman(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Koppleman Family Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party David Lancashire(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Bonnie Likover(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Craig Lipton(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Jeremy Lowell(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Lori Lowell(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Andrea C Meyerson(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Edward P Meyerson(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Jerry M Nowell(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Thomas M Prose(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party RCHFU, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Robert A. Sklar Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Casey M Rogers(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Courtney S Rogers(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Nancy Lynne Shute(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Robert A Sklar(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party C. Richard Stasney(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Susan P Stasney(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party TSE Holdings, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Toby L Cone Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Brenda Weinstein(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Stephen Weinstein(pty:pla), Attorney Tyler Roberts Meade added to party Jack Zemer(pty:pla) (Meade, Tyler)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER striking #67 Motion for Leave for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1 (b), particularly as to underlining any new text. Leave is granted to refile the stricken document within 48 hours. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/5/2016. Text Only Entry(ggall, )
October 4, 2016 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM regarding #67 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Add Plaintiffs in a Third Amended Complaint; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Gail L Bayer, Casey M Rogers, Jack Zemer, Susan P Stasney, Craig Lipton, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, Lori Lowell, Koppleman Family Trust, Brenda Weinstein, Carl Eichstaedt, III, James Richard Farquhar, Stephen Andrews, Robert A Sklar, Toby L Cone Trust, TSE Holdings, LLC, Shirley J Davis, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Richard Davis, Thomas M Prose, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Larry Koppleman, David Lancashire, Bonnie Likover, Nancy Lynne Shute, Andrea C Meyerson, Julie C Canner, Toby L Cone, Lee James Chimerakis, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, Jeffrey A Bayer, Edward P Meyerson, Jeremy Lowell, C. Richard Stasney, RCHFU, LLC, Robert Buzzetti, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Courtney S Rogers, Kevin Clare, Stephen Weinstein, Jerry M Nowell. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/4/16. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
October 3, 2016 Filing 67 STRICKEN: Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Add Plaintiffs in a Third Amended Complaint; Supporting Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Plaintiffs Stephen Andrews, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, Robert Buzzetti, Julie C Canner, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Kevin Clare, Toby L Cone, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Carl Eichstaedt, III, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, David Lancashire, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Jerry M Nowell, Thomas M Prose, RCHFU, LLC, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Nancy Lynne Shute, Robert A Sklar, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, TSE Holdings, LLC, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Add Plaintiffs in a Third Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A: Plaintiffs' Third Amended and Supplemental Complaint and Jury Demand)(Ferguson, Matthew) Modified on 10/6/2016 to strike pursuant to 69 Order. (nmarb, ).
September 6, 2016 Filing 66 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #65 Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information filed by attorney JESSICA BLACK LIVINGSTON. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (jhawk, )
September 6, 2016 Filing 65 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Jessica Adler Black Livingston (Livingston, Jessica)
August 29, 2016 Filing 64 BRIEF in Support of #46 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Shea, Daniel)
August 29, 2016 Filing 63 BRIEF in Support of #47 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Beer, Naomi)
August 18, 2016 Filing 62 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 8/25/2017 pursuant to #60 . Text Only Entry (slibi, )
August 18, 2016 Filing 61 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher: Scheduling Conference held on 8/18/2016. ORDER: Scheduling Order #60 is accepted and adopted by the court. ORDER: Status Conference is set for 11/28/2017 at 10:00 A.M. before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Hearing concluded. FTR: GPG - AM. (slibi, )
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/21/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 1/19/2018. Status Conference set for 11/28/2017 10:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/18/16. (ggall, )
August 15, 2016 Filing 59 RESPONSE to #46 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Stephen Andrews, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, Robert Buzzetti, Julie C Canner, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Kevin Clare, Toby L Cone, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Carl Eichstaedt, III, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, David Lancashire, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Jerry M Nowell, Thomas M Prose, RCHFU, LLC, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Nancy Lynne Shute, Robert A Sklar, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, TSE Holdings, LLC, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Jack Zemer. (Schrag, Michael)
August 15, 2016 Filing 58 RESPONSE to #47 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Stephen Andrews, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, Robert Buzzetti, Julie C Canner, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Kevin Clare, Toby L Cone, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Carl Eichstaedt, III, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, David Lancashire, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Jerry M Nowell, Thomas M Prose, RCHFU, LLC, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Nancy Lynne Shute, Robert A Sklar, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, TSE Holdings, LLC, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Jack Zemer. (Schrag, Michael)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER granting #56 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation. Plaintiffs may file a response to the Marriott defendants' motion to dismiss #47 not to exceed 18 pages. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/15/16. Text Only Entry(pabsec)
August 12, 2016 Filing 56 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiffs Stephen Andrews, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, Robert Buzzetti, Julie C Canner, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Kevin Clare, Toby L Cone, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Carl Eichstaedt, III, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, David Lancashire, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Jerry M Nowell, Thomas M Prose, RCHFU, LLC, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Nancy Lynne Shute, Robert A Sklar, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, TSE Holdings, LLC, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Schrag, Michael)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #53 Motion for Leave to Appear: The parties shall contact the Court at (970) 241-8932 ext. 8225 at the time of the hearing. The first party requesting to appear by telephone shall bear the responsibility of including all parties in a conference call for this hearing. The Court does not have the ability to conference multiple parties so all parties are to be on the line at the time the Court is contacted. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/8/16. Text Only Entry(ggall, )
August 5, 2016 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM regarding #53 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear By Telephone for Scheduling Conference filed by Gail L Bayer, Casey M Rogers, Jack Zemer, Susan P Stasney, Craig Lipton, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, Lori Lowell, Koppleman Family Trust, Brenda Weinstein, Carl Eichstaedt, III, James Richard Farquhar, Stephen Andrews, Robert A Sklar, Toby L Cone Trust, TSE Holdings, LLC, Shirley J Davis, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Richard Davis, Thomas M Prose, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Larry Koppleman, David Lancashire, Bonnie Likover, Nancy Lynne Shute, Andrea C Meyerson, Julie C Canner, Toby L Cone, Lee James Chimerakis, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, Jeffrey A Bayer, Edward P Meyerson, Jeremy Lowell, C. Richard Stasney, RCHFU, LLC, Robert Buzzetti, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Courtney S Rogers, Kevin Clare, Stephen Weinstein, Jerry M Nowell. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 8/5/16. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
August 5, 2016 Filing 53 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear By Telephone for Scheduling Conference by Plaintiffs Stephen Andrews, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, Robert Buzzetti, Julie C Canner, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Kevin Clare, Toby L Cone, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Carl Eichstaedt, III, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, David Lancashire, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Jerry M Nowell, Thomas M Prose, RCHFU, LLC, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Nancy Lynne Shute, Robert A Sklar, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, TSE Holdings, LLC, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Jack Zemer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ferguson, Matthew)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 08/01/16 re: #51 Minute Order. Scheduling Conference set for 8/18/2016 11:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 08/01/16. Scheduling Conference set for 8/4/16 is VACATED and RESET for 8/18/2016 11:00 AM in Room 235 (Durango) before Magistrate Judge David L. West. (nmarb, )
July 28, 2016 Filing 50 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs Stephen Andrews, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, Robert Buzzetti, Julie C Canner, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Kevin Clare, Toby L Cone, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Carl Eichstaedt, III, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, David Lancashire, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Jerry M Nowell, Thomas M Prose, RCHFU, LLC, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Nancy Lynne Shute, Robert A Sklar, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, TSE Holdings, LLC, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Jack Zemer. (Schrag, Michael)
July 25, 2016 Filing 49 DECLARATION of Jeannette Greene in Support of Marriott Defendants' regarding MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint #47 by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit A3, #4 Exhibit A4, #5 Exhibit B1, #6 Exhibit B2, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E)(Beer, Naomi)
July 25, 2016 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation for Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Beer, Naomi)
July 25, 2016 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
July 25, 2016 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Defendant Aspen Highlands Condominium Association. (Shea, Daniel)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER granting #44 Motion to Exceed Page Limitation. Defendants Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., The Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC, The Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, and The Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC may file a motion to dismiss not to exceed 18 pages. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/22/16. Text Only Entry(pabsec)
July 22, 2016 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
July 21, 2016 Filing 43 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Michael Lawrence Schrag on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Stephen Andrews(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Gail L Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Jeffrey A Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Robert Buzzetti(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Julie C Canner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Lee James Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Theresa Ann Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Kevin Clare(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Toby L Cone(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Richard Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Shirley J Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Dee Ann Davis Nowell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Carl Eichstaedt, III(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party James Richard Farquhar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Jennifer Lucille Farquhar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Jerry M. Nowell Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Larry Koppleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Koppleman Family Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party David Lancashire(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Bonnie Likover(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Craig Lipton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Jeremy Lowell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Lori Lowell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Andrea C Meyerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Edward P Meyerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Jerry M Nowell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Thomas M Prose(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party RCHFU, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Robert A. Sklar Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Casey M Rogers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Courtney S Rogers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Nancy Lynne Shute(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Robert A Sklar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party C. Richard Stasney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Susan P Stasney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party TSE Holdings, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Toby L Cone Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Brenda Weinstein(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Stephen Weinstein(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Lawrence Schrag added to party Jack Zemer(pty:pla) (Schrag, Michael)
July 18, 2016 Filing 42 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #40 Amended Complaint,,, filed by attorney Matthew Ferguson. The format for the attorneys signature block is not correct. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (jhawk, )
July 18, 2016 Filing 41 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #39 Notice of Entry of Appearance, filed by attorney Linda Pham Lam. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (jhawk, )
July 18, 2016 Filing 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Casey M Rogers, Thomas M Prose, Bonnie Likover, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Andrea C Meyerson, Koppleman Family Trust, Jeffrey A Bayer, RCHFU, LLC, Larry Koppleman, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, Edward P Meyerson, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, Jerry M Nowell, Stephen Weinstein, Stephen Andrews, Carl Eichstaedt, III, Lori Lowell, Toby L Cone Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Robert A Sklar, Toby L Cone, Jack Zemer, Craig Lipton, Shirley J Davis, Jeremy Lowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Lee James Chimerakis, TSE Holdings, LLC, Gail L Bayer, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Nancy Lynne Shute, Brenda Weinstein, Richard Davis, James Richard Farquhar, Susan P Stasney, Kevin Clare, Robert Buzzetti, Courtney S Rogers, C. Richard Stasney, David Lancashire, Julie C Canner.(Ferguson, Matthew)
July 18, 2016 Filing 39 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Linda Pham Lam on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Stephen Andrews(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Gail L Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Jeffrey A Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Robert Buzzetti(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Julie C Canner(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Lee James Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Theresa Ann Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Kevin Clare(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Toby L Cone(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Richard Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Shirley J Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Dee Ann Davis Nowell(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Carl Eichstaedt, III(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party James Richard Farquhar(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Jennifer Lucille Farquhar(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Jerry M. Nowell Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Larry Koppleman(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Koppleman Family Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party David Lancashire(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Bonnie Likover(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Craig Lipton(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Jeremy Lowell(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Lori Lowell(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Andrea C Meyerson(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Edward P Meyerson(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Jerry M Nowell(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Thomas M Prose(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party RCHFU, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Robert A. Sklar Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Casey M Rogers(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Courtney S Rogers(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Nancy Lynne Shute(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Robert A Sklar(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party C. Richard Stasney(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Susan P Stasney(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party TSE Holdings, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Toby L Cone Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Brenda Weinstein(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Stephen Weinstein(pty:pla), Attorney Linda Pham Lam added to party Jack Zemer(pty:pla) (Lam, Linda)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond All Parties. Answer or other responsive pleading now due Monday, July 25, 2016. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/14/16. Text Only Entry(ggall, )
July 14, 2016 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM regarding #36 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #5 Complaint and for Plaintiff to File Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint filed by Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/14/16. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
July 13, 2016 Filing 36 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #5 Complaint,,,, and for Plaintiff to File Second Amended and Supplemental Complaint by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
June 16, 2016 Filing 35 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #33 Notice of Entry of Appearance, filed by attorney Bulgucheva, Lilia and Reiser Michael. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF) and the format for the attorneys signature block is not correct. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(d) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (jhawk, ) Modified on 6/16/2016 to add text (jhawk, ).
June 16, 2016 Filing 34 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #32 Notice of Entry of Appearance, filed by attorney Reiser, Michael. The document was scanned and not converted directly to portable document format (PDF). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 1.3(f) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil Cases). (Text Only Entry) (jhawk, )
June 16, 2016 Filing 33 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lilia Bulgucheva on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Stephen Andrews(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Gail L Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Jeffrey A Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Robert Buzzetti(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Julie C Canner(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Lee James Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Theresa Ann Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Kevin Clare(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Toby L Cone(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Richard Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Shirley J Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Dee Ann Davis Nowell(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Carl Eichstaedt, III(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party James Richard Farquhar(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Jennifer Lucille Farquhar(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Jerry M. Nowell Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Larry Koppleman(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Koppleman Family Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party David Lancashire(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Bonnie Likover(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Craig Lipton(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Jeremy Lowell(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Lori Lowell(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Andrea C Meyerson(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Edward P Meyerson(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Jerry M Nowell(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Thomas M Prose(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party RCHFU, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Robert A. Sklar Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Casey M Rogers(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Courtney S Rogers(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Nancy Lynne Shute(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Robert A Sklar(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party C. Richard Stasney(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Susan P Stasney(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party TSE Holdings, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Toby L Cone Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Brenda Weinstein(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Stephen Weinstein(pty:pla), Attorney Lilia Bulgucheva added to party Jack Zemer(pty:pla) (Bulgucheva, Lilia)
June 16, 2016 Filing 32 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Joseph Reiser on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Stephen Andrews(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Gail L Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Jeffrey A Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Robert Buzzetti(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Julie C Canner(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Lee James Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Theresa Ann Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Kevin Clare(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Toby L Cone(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Richard Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Shirley J Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Dee Ann Davis Nowell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Carl Eichstaedt, III(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party James Richard Farquhar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Jennifer Lucille Farquhar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Jerry M. Nowell Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Larry Koppleman(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Koppleman Family Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party David Lancashire(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Bonnie Likover(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Craig Lipton(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Jeremy Lowell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Lori Lowell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Andrea C Meyerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Edward P Meyerson(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Jerry M Nowell(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Thomas M Prose(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party RCHFU, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Robert A. Sklar Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Casey M Rogers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Courtney S Rogers(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Nancy Lynne Shute(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Robert A Sklar(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party C. Richard Stasney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Susan P Stasney(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party TSE Holdings, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Toby L Cone Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Brenda Weinstein(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Stephen Weinstein(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Joseph Reiser added to party Jack Zemer(pty:pla) (Reiser, Michael)
June 13, 2016 Filing 31 Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Text Only Entry Scheduling Conference set for 8/4/2016 10:45 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher pursuant to 29 Minute Order. (nmarb, )
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/13/2016. In light of the reassignment of this case to the Honorable Gordon P. Gallagher, the Scheduling Conference currently set for 8/4/2016 is vacated. (mdave, )
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 8/4/2016 10:45 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. The previously set scheduling conference remains on the same date but has been moved to GRAND JUNCTION. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/13/16. A Scheduling Conference is set in GRAND JUNCTION, Colorado at the Wayne Aspinall Federal Building - United States Courthouse, 400 Rood Avenue, Grand Junction, CO 81501 before U.S. Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. The parties shall comply with the Instructions to Scheduling Order for U.S. Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher which can be found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Parties concerned regarding travel time and expense to Grand Junction for appearances before the Magistrate Judge are referred to this Magistrate Judges policy in that regard which can be found at the above website. It is ORDERED that the Defendants shall notify all parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. Text Only Entry (ggall, )
June 10, 2016 Filing 28 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Ian S. Marx by Ian Scott Marx on behalf of Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLCAttorney Ian Scott Marx added to party Cobalt Travel Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Ian Scott Marx added to party Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The(pty:dft), Attorney Ian Scott Marx added to party Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ian Scott Marx added to party Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Ian Scott Marx added to party Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC(pty:dft) (Marx, Ian)
June 10, 2016 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Philip R. Sellinger by Philip Rabner Sellinger on behalf of Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLCAttorney Philip Rabner Sellinger added to party Cobalt Travel Company, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Philip Rabner Sellinger added to party Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The(pty:dft), Attorney Philip Rabner Sellinger added to party Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Philip Rabner Sellinger added to party Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Philip Rabner Sellinger added to party Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC(pty:dft) (Sellinger, Philip)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court reassign this matter to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Entered by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 06/09/16. (jhawk, )
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/09/2016. Aspen Highlands Condominium Association answer due 7/13/2016; Cobalt Travel Company, LLC answer due 7/13/2016; Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The answer due 7/13/2016; Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc. answer due 7/13/2016; Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation answer due 7/13/2016; Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC answer due 7/13/2016.(mdave, )
June 8, 2016 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM regarding #19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #5 Complaint, filed by Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/8/16. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/8/16. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
June 7, 2016 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Livingston, Jessica)
June 3, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel F. Shea on behalf of Aspen Highlands Condominium AssociationAttorney Daniel F. Shea added to party Aspen Highlands Condominium Association(pty:dft) (Shea, Daniel)
June 3, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jessica Adler Black Livingston on behalf of Aspen Highlands Condominium AssociationAttorney Jessica Adler Black Livingston added to party Aspen Highlands Condominium Association(pty:dft) (Livingston, Jessica)
June 3, 2016 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #5 Complaint,,,, by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Beer, Naomi)
June 3, 2016 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #17 Minute Order. All parties do not consent. This case is reassigned to Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 16-cv-01301-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (slibi, )
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE Pursuant to D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a), by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/03/2016. (slibi, )
June 2, 2016 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiffs Stephen Andrews, Gail L Bayer, Jeffrey A Bayer, Robert Buzzetti, Julie C Canner, Lee James Chimerakis, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Kevin Clare, Toby L Cone, Richard Davis, Shirley J Davis, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Carl Eichstaedt, III, James Richard Farquhar, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, Larry Koppleman, Koppleman Family Trust, David Lancashire, Bonnie Likover, Craig Lipton, Jeremy Lowell, Lori Lowell, Andrea C Meyerson, Edward P Meyerson, Jerry M Nowell, Thomas M Prose, RCHFU, LLC, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Casey M Rogers, Courtney S Rogers, Nancy Lynne Shute, Robert A Sklar, C. Richard Stasney, Susan P Stasney, TSE Holdings, LLC, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Toby L Cone Trust, Brenda Weinstein, Stephen Weinstein, Jack Zemer All parties do not consent.. (Ferguson, Matthew)
June 1, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Matthew C. Ferguson on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Stephen Andrews(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Gail L Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Jeffrey A Bayer(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Robert Buzzetti(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Julie C Canner(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Lee James Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Theresa Ann Chimerakis(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Kevin Clare(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Toby L Cone(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Richard Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Shirley J Davis(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Dee Ann Davis Nowell(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Carl Eichstaedt, III(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party James Richard Farquhar(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Jennifer Lucille Farquhar(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Jerry M. Nowell Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Larry Koppleman(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Koppleman Family Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party David Lancashire(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Bonnie Likover(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Craig Lipton(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Jeremy Lowell(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Lori Lowell(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Andrea C Meyerson(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Edward P Meyerson(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Jerry M Nowell(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Thomas M Prose(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party RCHFU, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Robert A. Sklar Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Casey M Rogers(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Courtney S Rogers(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Nancy Lynne Shute(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Robert A Sklar(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party C. Richard Stasney(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Susan P Stasney(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party TSE Holdings, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Toby L Cone Trust(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Brenda Weinstein(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Stephen Weinstein(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew C. Ferguson added to party Jack Zemer(pty:pla) (Ferguson, Matthew)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 06/01/2016. Scheduling Conference set for 8/4/2016 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. It is ORDERED that the defendants shall notify all parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. (mdave, )
May 31, 2016 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (agarc, )
May 27, 2016 Filing 12 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Motion for Extension of Time by Pitkin County District Judge Jonathan Bruce Pototsky dated 5/24/2016. (agarc, )
May 27, 2016 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Amended Complaint upon Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC on 4/29/2016. (agarc, )
May 27, 2016 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Amended Complaint upon Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation on 4/28/2016. (agarc, )
May 27, 2016 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Amended Complaint upon Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc. on 4/29/2016. (agarc, )
May 27, 2016 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Amended Complaint upon The Lion & Crown Travel, Co., LLC on 4/28/2016. (agarc, )
May 27, 2016 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and First Amended Complaint upon Cobalt Travel Company, LLC on 4/29/2016. (agarc, )
May 27, 2016 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and First Amended Complaint upon Aspen Highlands Condominium Association on 4/29/2016. (agarc, )
May 27, 2016 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Aspen Highlands Condominium Association, Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, The, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc., Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, and Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC, filed by Casey M Rogers, Thomas M Prose, Bonnie Likover, Theresa Ann Chimerakis, Andrea C Meyerson, Koppleman Family Trust, Jeffrey A Bayer, RCHFU, LLC, Larry Koppleman, Dee Ann Davis Nowell Trust, Jennifer Lucille Farquhar, Edward P Meyerson, Jerry M. Nowell Trust, Jerry M Nowell, Stephen Weinstein, Stephen Andrews, Carl Eichstaedt, III, Lori Lowell, Toby L Cone Trust, Thomas M. Prose Revocable Living Trust, Robert A Sklar, Toby L Cone, Jack Zemer, Craig Lipton, Shirley J Davis, Jeremy Lowell, Dee Ann Davis Nowell, Lee James Chimerakis, TSE Holdings, LLC, Gail L Bayer, Robert A. Sklar Trust, Nancy Lynne Shute, Brenda Weinstein, Richard Davis, James Richard Farquhar, Susan P Stasney, Kevin Clare, Robert Buzzetti, Courtney S Rogers, C. Richard Stasney, David Lancashire, and Julie C Canner. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document)(agarc, )
May 27, 2016 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
May 27, 2016 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ATTORNEY(S) IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED OR OTHER CASES: Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 11.1(a), an attorney must be a member of the U.S. District Court's bar to make an appearance and receive notice in any case before the court. The attorney records of the court reflect that the following counsel is a member of the U.S. District Courts Bar, but has not entered an appearance in this case: MATTHEW C. FERGUSON. In order to make an appearance in this case and receive any further notice regarding this case, counsel must file an entry of appearance in this case. Absent any Notice of Entry of Appearance filed, no further direct notices to counsel will be sent. Text only entry. (agarc, )
May 27, 2016 Filing 2 APPENDIX re #1 Notice of Removal,,, Civil Cover Sheet by Defendants Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc. dba Marriott Vacation Club International, Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC, The Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Beer, Naomi)
May 27, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc. dba Marriott Vacation Club International, The Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC, Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation from Pitkin County District Court, Case Number 2015cv30160. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-4997623), filed by Marriott Ownership Resorts, Inc. dba Marriott Vacation Club International, The Lion & Crown Travel Co., LLC, Ritz-Carlton Management Company, LLC, Cobalt Travel Company, LLC, Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B1 part 1, #3 Exhibit B1 part 2, #4 Exhibit B2, #5 Exhibit B3, #6 Exhibit B4, #7 Exhibit B5, #8 Exhibit B6, #9 Exhibit B7, #10 Exhibit B8, #11 Exhibit B9, #12 Exhibit B10)(Beer, Naomi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RCHFU, LLC et al v. Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Vacations Worldwide Corporation
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Schleifstein
Represented By: Naomi G. Beer
Represented By: Ian Scott Marx
Represented By: Roger Brian Kaplan
Represented By: Philip Rabner Sellinger
Represented By: David L. Masters
Represented By: Jaclyn DeMais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobalt Travel Company, LLC
Represented By: Todd Lawrence Schleifstein
Represented By: Naomi G. Beer
Represented By: Ian Scott Marx
Represented By: Roger Brian Kaplan
Represented By: Philip Rabner Sellinger
Represented By: David L. Masters
Represented By: Jaclyn DeMais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [