Palmer v. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office
Plaintiff: Palmer and Toni R. Palmer
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office
Case Number: 1:2016cv02376
Filed: September 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 96 Letter from U.S. Supreme Court regarding Petition for Writ of Certiorari re #82 Notice of Appeal, ; assigned Supreme Court No. 18-7514 ( Appeal No. 18-1028) (angar, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 95 Letter from U.S. Supreme Court regarding Petition for Writ of Certiorari re #82 Notice of Appeal, ; assigned Supreme Court No. 18-7514 ( Appeal No. 18-1028) (angar, )
November 9, 2018 Filing 94 MANDATE of USCA as to #82 Notice of Appeal, filed by Toni R. Palmer, #93 USCA Order/Opinion/Judgment : (USCA Case No. 18-1028). (sphil, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 93 USCA Order and Judgment as to #82 Notice of Appeal, filed by Toni R. Palmer : (USCA Case No. 18-1028) (This document is not the Mandate). The district court's judgment is affirmed. (sphil, )
April 12, 2018 Filing 92 Pro Se survey deadline set. Pro Se Survey to be mailed by 5/21/2018. re: #91 (dhans, )
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 AMENDED JUDGMENT. Judgment #79 AMENDED TO ADD the following: Pursuant to the Order Vacating Award of Costs entered by Judge William J. Martnez on April 11, 2018, #90 , it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Court, on its own motion, hereby VACATES its prior award of costs. Each party shall bear its own costs. (dhans, )
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER VACATING AWARD OF COSTS. ORDERED: Considering the nature of Plaintiff's claims and the circumstances of this case, the Court, on its own motion hereby VACATES its prior award of costs, and AMENDS the prior entry of final judgment #79 to reflect that each party in this case will bear its own costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/11/2018. (dhans, )
March 19, 2018 Filing 89 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal re #82 Notice of Appeal, by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer (Palmer, Toni)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Stay of Bill of Costs Pending Appeal #87 is GRANTED. The Court construes Plaintiff's pro se Motion, in part, as a request that execution upon the award of costs be stayed pending appeal, without requiring Plaintiff to post a supersedeas bond under Rule 62(d). That request is granted. Given the circumstances of the case and the practicalities of obtaining a supersedeas bond for the amount of the Clerk's cost award, any execution upon the award of costs is STAYED pending resolution of Plaintiff's appeal and/or further Order of the Court, without any requirement for Plaintiff to post a supersedeas bond. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/22/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmlc2, )
February 19, 2018 Filing 87 First MOTION to Stay Bill of Costs by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer. (Palmer, Toni)
February 13, 2018 Filing 86 Costs Taxed by Clerk in the amount of $3,864.55 against Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer and in favor of Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. (ebutl)
January 23, 2018 Filing 85 USCA Case Number 18-1028 for #82 Notice of Appeal, filed by Toni R. Palmer. (angar, )
January 22, 2018 Filing 84 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #82 Notice of Appeal, filed by Toni R. Palmer to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Pro Se, Fee not paid, 1915 motion filed,) (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet and Preliminary Record)(angar, )
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Granting #81 Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and FED. R. APP. P. 24 and Denying Request for Free Transcript, by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/22/2018. (angar, )
January 20, 2018 Filing 82 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #81 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed.R.App.P.24, #78 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal)(Palmer, Toni)
January 20, 2018 Filing 81 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed.R.App.P.24 by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal)(Palmer, Toni)
January 10, 2018 Filing 80 Proposed Bill of Costs by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court Reporter Costs)(Wiletsky, Mark)
December 27, 2017 Filing 79 FINAL JUDGMENT pursuant to #78 Order Adopting November 17, 2017, Recommendation of Magistrate Judge and Granting Summary Judgment. Entered by the Clerk of the Court on 12/27/2017. (cpear)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Adopting November 17, 2017 Recommendation of Magistrate Judge #73 and Granting #40 Summary Judgment. by Judge William J. Martinez on 12/22/2017. (wjmlc2, )
December 8, 2017 Filing 77 RESPONSE to Objection to #73 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment [and Supporting Brief] filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. (Wiletsky, Mark)
December 1, 2017 Filing 75 OBJECTION to #73 Report and Recommendations filed by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Audio Exhibits 1-4 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 9 part 1, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 9 part 2, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 9 part 3, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 part 4, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9 part 5, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 22)(Palmer, Toni)
November 30, 2017 Filing 76 Conventionally Submitted Material : USB - Exhiibits 1 - 4 to Objection to Report and Recommendations, #75 by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer Text Only Entry (angar, )
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on #73 the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya regarding Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment #40 . As advised by Judge Tafoya, Plaintiff's Objection(s), if any, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72(b) is due within 14 days of service of the Recommendation, which the Court understands to have been served on Plaintiff as an e-filer on November 17, 2017. Given the rapidly approaching trial setting, the Court hereby MODIFIES Defendant's Response deadline pursuant to Rule 72(b)(2). Defendant's Response, if any, will be due 7 days after Plaintiff's objection (if any) is filed or by December 8, 2017, whichever is earlier. Absent prior leave to exceed it, both parties must comply with the 15-page limitation set out by WJM Revised Practice Standards III.C.1. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/21/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmlc2, )
November 17, 2017 Filing 73 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment [and Supporting Brief] filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. The court respectfully RECOMMENDS that Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals' Motion for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support (Doc. No. #40 ) be GRANTED in its entirety, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 11/17/2017. (jgonz, )
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Adopting June 12, 2017 Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff's Objection (ECF No. #43 ) to the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation is OVERRULED, The Magistrate Judge's Recommendation (ECF No. #41 ) is ADOPTED in its entirety. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (ECF No. #32 ) is DENIED. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/13/2017. (angar, )
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: A 3-Day Trial to the Court is hereby set to begin on January 22, 2018 at 8:30 a.m., in Courtroom A801. The Final Trial Preparation Conference is set for January 5, 2018 at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom A801. Counsel are directed to the Court's Revised Practice Standards to ensure compliance with all deadlines triggered by the dates of the Final Trial Preparation Conference and Trial. In so doing, the parties are strongly encouraged to take advantage of the "Trial Preparation Conference & Trial Checklist" available #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/27/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Motion for Settlement Conference #67 . Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED given that the Defendant has no interest in participating in such a court settlement conference, and the undersigned will not order what would be an exercise in futility. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/25/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/25/17. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Exhibit List, #2 Defendant's Exhibit List) (sgrim)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER. The telephonic conference scheduled on September 26, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/25/17. (sgrim)
September 20, 2017 Filing 67 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Conference by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Palmer, Toni)
September 20, 2017 Filing 66 Proposed Pretrial Order by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Defendant Exhibit List)(Wiletsky, Mark)
September 20, 2017 Filing 65 REPLY to Response to #54 MOTION to Strike #48 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,, filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. (Wiletsky, Mark)
September 6, 2017 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE of Service by mail by Clerk of Court re #63 Courtroom Minutes to Toni Palmer, 4705 Iran Street, Denver, CO 80249. Text Only Entry. (sgrim)
September 6, 2017 Filing 63 COURTROOM MINUTES for Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/6/2017 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of the Practice Standards for District Judge William J. Martinez to Plaintiff Toni Palmer at 4705 Iran Street, Denver, CO 80249. The Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference in continued to September 26, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. The parties shall initiate a conference call and contact chambers at 303-335-2780 at the scheduled time. The parties are further directed to use a LAND LINE; NO CELLULAR, CORDLESS OR SPEAKER PHONES ARE PERMITTED. An amended Final Pretrial Order, including new exhibit lists, as discussed, shall be prepared by the parties and submitted to the court on or before September 20, 2017.FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim) Modified on 9/6/2017 to add document.
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER denying #45 Motion for Appointment of Counsel based on the same reasoning set forth in #25 Order denying Plaintiff's previous request for appointment of counsel. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/6/17. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2 )
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER granting in part #54 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Second Summary Judgment Response or, in the Alternative, to File a Supplemental Reply Brief. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(d), parties are not permitted to file Surreplies without leave of court. Because Plaintiff is proceeding pro se, the court will allow, in this single instance, the #48 Surreply Plaintiff filed in relation to Defendant's #40 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant is permitted to file a Response to Plaintiff's Surreply no later than 9/20/17 and not longer than ten pages in length. Further briefing by either party is prohibited. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/6/17. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2 )
August 30, 2017 Filing 60 Proposed Pretrial Order by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. (Wiletsky, Mark)
August 28, 2017 Filing 59 REPLY to Response to #54 MOTION to Strike #48 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,, filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wiletsky, Mark)
August 27, 2017 Filing 58 Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A - 7-25-17 Proposed Final Pretrial Order, #2 Attachment B Part 1 - Emails with HH re: Proposed Final Pretrial Order content, #3 Attachment B Part 2 - Emails with HH re: Proposed Final Pretrial Order content)(Palmer, Toni)
August 13, 2017 Filing 57 RESPONSE to #54 MOTION to Strike #48 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,, filed by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer. (Palmer, Toni)
July 31, 2017 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM regarding #54 MOTION to Strike #48 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,, filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/31/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 31, 2017 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM regarding #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment [and Supporting Brief] filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/31/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 31, 2017 Filing 54 MOTION to Strike #48 Brief in Opposition to Motion,,,, by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. (Wiletsky, Mark)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff, appearing pro se, has attempted to contact the court to say that there are items to which she objects or has questions concerning the proposed final pretrial order. Given the stage of the case and the outstanding pending motions, the Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/17 is VACATED. The parties are directed to meet and confer about any changes to the proposed final pretrial order. If there are changes the parties wish to incorporate, they shall file a proposed Amended Final Pretrial Order on or before 8/30/17. The Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference is reset for 9/6/17 at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall initiate a conference call and contact chambers at 303-335-2780 at the scheduled time. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/28/17. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2 )
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ORDER granting #50 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Micah David Dawson is relieved of any further representation, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/27/17. Text Only Entry (sgrim)
July 26, 2017 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM regarding #50 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/26/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 26, 2017 Filing 50 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. (Dawson, Micah)
July 25, 2017 Filing 49 Proposed Pretrial Order by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. (Attachments: #1 Defendant - Exhibit List, #2 Plaintiff - Exhibit List)(Wiletsky, Mark)
July 15, 2017 Filing 48 BRIEF in Opposition to #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment [and Supporting Brief] Response in Support of Opposition of Kaiser's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A4, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit Exhibit G Part 1, #10 Exhibit Exhibit G Part 2, #11 Exhibit Exhibit G Part 3, #12 Exhibit Exhibit G Part 4, #13 Exhibit Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit Exhibit I, #15 Exhibit Exhibit J, #16 Exhibit Exhibit K, #17 Exhibit Exhibit L, #18 Exhibit Exhibit M, #19 Exhibit Exhibit N, #20 Exhibit Exhibit N2, #21 Exhibit Exhibit O, #22 Exhibit Exhibit P, #23 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #24 Exhibit Exhibit R, #25 Exhibit Exhibit S, #26 Exhibit Exhibit T, #27 Exhibit Exhibit U Part 1, #28 Exhibit Exhibit U Part 2, #29 Exhibit Exhibit V, #30 Exhibit Exhibit W, #31 Exhibit Exhibit X Part 1, #32 Exhibit Exhibit X Part 2, #33 Exhibit Exhibit Y1, #34 Exhibit Exhibit Y2, #35 Exhibit Exhibit Z, #36 Exhibit Exhibit Z2)(Palmer, Toni)
July 10, 2017 Filing 47 RESPONSE to Objection to #41 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #32 First MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint 31 Order,, #1 ComplaintFirst MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint filed by Toni R. Palmer filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. (Wiletsky, Mark)
July 5, 2017 Filing 46 MEMORANDUM regarding #45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel filed by Toni R. Palmer. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/5/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 4, 2017 Filing 45 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Attorney's Contacted to-date, #2 Hardship Ltr. to MHUW)(Palmer, Toni)
June 30, 2017 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment [and Supporting Brief] filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. (Wiletsky, Mark)
June 26, 2017 Filing 43 OVERRULED OBJECTION to #41 Report and Recommendations filed by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer. (Palmer, Toni) Modified on 10/13/2017 to show overruled pursuant to #72 Order (angar, ).
June 16, 2017 Filing 42 BRIEF in Opposition to #40 MOTION for Summary Judgment [and Supporting Brief] filed by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sr. Case Mgr. Job Description, #2 Exhibit Perf. Self Assessment)(Palmer, Toni)
June 12, 2017 Filing 41 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya, re #32 First MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Toni R. Palmer. This Court Respectfully RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint #32 be DENIED. (nmarb, ) Modified on 6/12/2017 to add Magistrate Judge. (nmarb, ).
June 2, 2017 Filing 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment [and Supporting Brief] by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A_Henderson declaration, #2 Ex. B_Job Description, #3 Ex. C_2017-05-05 Deposition Transcript of Palmer, #4 Ex. D_2015 EEOC charge, #5 Ex. E_5-29 Investigative Summary, #6 Ex. F_Performance Improvement Plan, #7 Ex. G_PIP Chart of Prior Assignments, #8 Ex. H_Dublikar declaration, #9 Ex. I_PIP Tracking, #10 Ex. J_March Sick Notes, #11 Ex. K_3-25 E-mail Henderson to Palmer, #12 Ex. L_Hotline Summary, #13 Ex. M_FMLA Request, #14 Ex. N_Termination Letter)(Dawson, Micah)
April 24, 2017 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to #34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 First MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint 31 Order,, #1 ComplaintFirst MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint filed by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer. (Palmer, Toni)
April 10, 2017 Filing 38 BRIEF in Opposition to #32 First MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint 31 Order,, #1 ComplaintFirst MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint filed by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. (Dawson, Micah)
March 23, 2017 Filing 37 LETTER NOTICE OF CONCERN by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer. (Palmer, Toni)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Defendant shall file its Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint no later than 4/10/17. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/23/17. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2 )
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM regarding #34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 First MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint 31 Order,, #1 ComplaintFirst MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/23/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 23, 2017 Filing 34 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 First MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint 31 Order,, #1 ComplaintFirst MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond)(Dawson, Micah)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM regarding #32 First MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint 31 Order,, #1 ComplaintFirst MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint filed by Toni R. Palmer. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/14/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
March 13, 2017 Filing 32 First MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint 31 Order,, #1 Complaint, First MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Complaint by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document Amended Complaint)(Palmer, Toni)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER striking Plaintiff's Amended Title VII Complaint #30 . Plaintiff's Amended Complaint was filed more than 21 days after service of Defendant's Answer #16 , but without either prior leave of Court or written consent of the opposing party. Accordingly, the Amended Complaint is STRICKEN pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1) & (2). This Order is without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a motion for leave to amend her complaint, in compliance with Rule 15(a) and D.C.Colo.LCivR 15.1. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 3/7/17. Text Only Entry (wjmlc2, )
February 28, 2017 Filing 30 STRICKEN AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Parties, filed by Toni R. Palmer.(Palmer, Toni) Modified to strike pursuant to 31 Order on 3/7/2017 (cthom, ).
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/31/17. (sgrim)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER granting #26 Motion for Protective Order. The proposed Protective Order shall be entered. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/31/17. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2 )
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM regarding #26 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/31/2017. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
January 31, 2017 Filing 26 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Protective Order)(Dawson, Micah)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #14 Motion to Appoint Counsel by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/1/2016. (jgonz, )
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/1/16. (sgrim)
December 1, 2016 Filing 23 COURTROOM MINUTES for Scheduling Conference held on 12/1/2016 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Discovery due by 5/5/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 6/2/2017. ORDERED: A Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference is set for August 1, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall initiate a conference call and contact chambers at 303-335-2780 at the scheduled time. A proposed Final Pretrial Order shall be prepared by Defendant and submitted to Plaintiff for input and review. The proposed order shall then be submitted to the court no later than seven days before the conference. FTR: KMT C201. (sgrim)
November 28, 2016 Filing 22 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. (Dawson, Micah)
November 28, 2016 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM regarding #14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Toni R. Palmer. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/28/2016. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct ALLMTN proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/28/2016. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
November 28, 2016 Filing 19 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office. (Dawson, Micah)
November 28, 2016 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent. This case is reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 16-cv-02376-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (slibi, )
November 23, 2016 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office All parties do not consent.. (Wiletsky, Mark)
October 27, 2016 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office.(Wiletsky, Mark)
October 14, 2016 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer All parties consent. (jgonz, )
October 14, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer. (jgonz, )
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 12/1/2016 09:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 11/25/2016, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/14/16. (sgrim)
October 13, 2016 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Micah David Dawson on behalf of Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk OfficeAttorney Micah David Dawson added to party Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office(pty:dft) (Dawson, Micah)
October 12, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Brian Wiletsky on behalf of Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk OfficeAttorney Mark Brian Wiletsky added to party Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office(pty:dft) (Wiletsky, Mark)
October 11, 2016 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office served on 10/6/2016, answer due 10/27/2016. (jgonz, ) Modified to correct event on 10/12/2016 (jgonz, ).
September 27, 2016 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 USMS Form) (amenz, )
September 21, 2016 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (dkals, )
September 21, 2016 Filing 7 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #6 Order: This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 16-cv-02376-KMT. (Text Only Entry) (dkals, )
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DRAWING CASE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/21/16. (dkals, )
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, and denying #4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/21/16.(dkals, )
September 20, 2016 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer. (dbera, )
September 20, 2016 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Toni R. Palmer. (dbera, )
September 20, 2016 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
September 20, 2016 Filing 1 Title VII COMPLAINT against Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office, filed by Toni R. Palmer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(dbera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni R. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals Technology Risk Office
Represented By: Mark Brian Wiletsky
Represented By: Micah David Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?