Prima Partners LLC v. Waterhouse et al
Plaintiff: Prima Partners LLC
Defendant: Stephen L Waterhouse and Linda L Waterhouse
Counter_claimant: Stephen L Waterhouse and Linda L Waterhouse
Counter_defendant: Stephen L Waterhouse and Linda L Waterhouse
Case Number: 1:2016cv02875
Filed: November 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 59 Prima Partners Motion to Exclude Disclosed Opinion Testimony of Defendants Expert Robert A. Woellner by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 05/03/2018. (mdave, )
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 The Waterhouses' Motion for Summary Judgment and 60 Prima Partners' Motion for Summary Judgment, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/1/2018. (tsher, )
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying in part and denying without prejudice in part 38 Waterhouses Motion for Joinder and Leave to File Amended Answer andCounterclaim by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 07/25/2017. The Court strikes the second and third claims from the Waterhouses' Amended Answer and Counterclaims. (mdave, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prima Partners LLC v. Waterhouse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen L Waterhouse
Represented By: John Leonard Watson
Represented By: James Lewis Wooll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda L Waterhouse
Represented By: John Leonard Watson
Represented By: James Lewis Wooll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prima Partners LLC
Represented By: Jonathan B. Boonin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Stephen L Waterhouse
Represented By: John Leonard Watson
Represented By: James Lewis Wooll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Linda L Waterhouse
Represented By: John Leonard Watson
Represented By: James Lewis Wooll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Stephen L Waterhouse
Represented By: John Leonard Watson
Represented By: James Lewis Wooll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Linda L Waterhouse
Represented By: John Leonard Watson
Represented By: James Lewis Wooll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?