TransFirst, LLC v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: TransFirst, LLC
Defendant: Daniel Brown, David Grek and David Y Reich
Case Number: 1:2016cv03054
Filed: December 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Broomfield
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER re: 279 Order to Show Cause. That this case is remand to the District Court, Boulder County, Boulder Colorado, where it was originally filed. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/8/2019. (cpear)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER 215 Motion for Default Judgment is DENIED; 223 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED; 224 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; and, 256 Motion to Strike is DENIED AS MOOT. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/19/2019. (cthom, )
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER denying 115 Reich's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and denying 16 Brown's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2). ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 2/13/2018. (cthom, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TransFirst, LLC v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TransFirst, LLC
Represented By: David R. Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Brown
Represented By: Patrick Michael Haines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Grek
Represented By: Patrick Michael Haines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Y Reich
Represented By: Patrick Michael Haines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?