Silva v. US Bank, National Assoc. et al
Plaintiff: Margaret A. Silva
Defendant: US Bank, National Assoc., Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, series 2007, NCI, Christine Duffy, Lawrence E. Castle, Robert J. Hopp, Robert (I) J. Hopp, MERS Inc., David J Stevens, Paul King, 18th Judicial District and Richard B. Caschette
Case Number: 1:2017cv01529
Filed: June 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER granting 132 Motion to Extend Time to File a Notice of Appeal, by Judge William J. Martinez on 06/24/2019. (wjmlc1)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/14/2018. The Court respectfully RECOMMENDS that Defendants Motions [# 57 , # 59 , # 61 , # 62 , # 80 ] be GRANTED, and that the Second Amended Complaint [# 47 ] be DISMISSED (jgonz, )
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Overruling Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order Regarding Recusal. Plaintiff's Objection to the Order (ECF No. 46 ) is OVERRULED; The Order (ECF No. 39 ) is AFFIRMED. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/17/2017. (angar, )
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Adopting Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Plaintiff's Objection to the Recommendation (ECF No. 15 ) is OVERRULED; The Recommendation (ECF Nos. 13 , 14 ) is ADOPTED in its entirety; Plaintiffs Motion seeking a temporary restraining order (ECF Nos. 3 , 11 ) is DENIED without prejudice. ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/15/2017. (angar, )
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/9/17 re 43 Amended Forthwith Motion for an Order to Show Cause Why a Motion for TRO/Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue. The Court hereby respectfully RECOMMENDS that the Motion 43 be DENIED. (lgale, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silva v. US Bank, National Assoc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret A. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank, National Assoc.
Represented By: Corinne Christine Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, series 2007, NCI
Represented By: Corinne Christine Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Duffy
Represented By: Christopher Kirk Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence E. Castle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Hopp
Represented By: Robert J. Hopp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert (I) J. Hopp
Represented By: Robert J. Hopp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERS Inc.
Represented By: Corinne Christine Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J Stevens
Represented By: Allison R. Ailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 18th Judicial District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard B. Caschette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?