USA v. 8.11 Acres of Land, More or Less in the County of Grand, Colorado et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: 8.11 Acres of Land, More or Less in the County of Grand, Colorado, Lambright LLC, Collegiate Peaks Bank and Grand County
Case Number: 1:2017cv01553
Filed: June 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Raymond P. Moore
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/5/2019, re: 68 Motion to Limit Testimony of Gregory T. Gerken is DENIED. (sphil, )
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 65 Motion to Exclude Certain Comparable Sales in the Appraisal of David B. Clayton, denying 66 Motion to Exclude Case Studies and Paired Sales Analysis of Appraiser David Clayton, and granting 67 Motion to Exclude Landowner Valuation Evidence Premised on Speculative Residential Use, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/30/19.(dkals, )
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER re: 93 Joint Status Report by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/7/2019. (cthom, )
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re: 23 and 24 Disclaimer of Interest filed by Grand County. ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 9/19/2017. (cthom, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. 8.11 Acres of Land, More or Less in the County of Grand, Colorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Johanna Mae Franzen(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Represented By: Anthony Conley Gentner(Designation Federal Agency Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8.11 Acres of Land, More or Less in the County of Grand, Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lambright LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collegiate Peaks Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand County
Represented By: Alan N. Hassler
Represented By: Alan N. Hassler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?