Insight Global, LLC v. McDonald et al

Plaintiff: Insight Global, LLC
Defendant: Mary McDonald and Beacon Hill Staffing Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2017cv01915
Filed: August 8, 2017
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 18:1836
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2018 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: the Plaintiff's 88 Motion for Leave to Amend its Complaint is GRANTED and Beacon Hill's 67 Objections to the Magistrate Judge's 62 Minute Order are DENIED AS MOOT. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/21/2018. (msklc3)
May 3, 2018 80 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER denying 15 Motion to Dismiss and granting 14 Motion to Dismiss by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/3/18. (dkals, )
April 30, 2018 78 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 15 Motion to Dismiss and granting 14 Motion to Dismiss by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/30/18. (dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Insight Global, LLC v. McDonald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Insight Global, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Sanchez
Represented By: Matthew Jeffery Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary McDonald
Represented By: Laurie J. Rust
Represented By: Maral Shoaei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beacon Hill Staffing Group, LLC
Represented By: Laurie J. Rust
Represented By: Maral Shoaei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?