Ziankovich v. Large et al
Plaintiff: Youras Ziankovich
Defendant: Bryon M. Large and James C. Coyle
Case Number: 1:2017cv02039
Filed: August 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Presiding Judge: Nina Y. Wang
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER that Plaintiff Youras Ziankovich's Motion to Relieve Plaintiff from the Order Affirming and Adopting the Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge and Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Fourth Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) (Doc. # 79 ) is DENIED, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/30/2020.(evana, )
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER That Plaintiff's Objection (Doc. # 70 ) to the Recommendation is OVERRULED; Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang's Recommendation (Doc. # 69 ) as to issue preclusion is AFFIRMED and ADOPTED as an Order of this Court; Pursuant to Rule 1 2(d), Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 52 ) is CONVERTED into a Motion for Summary Judgment; Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. # 52 ) is GRANTED; Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. # 12 ) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and Plaintiff's Fourth Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Be Issued (Doc. # 48 ) is DENIED AS MOOT, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/18/2019.(evana, )
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 3/8/2019. This court respectfully RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's 48 Fourth MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Order to Show Cause be DENIED. (nywlc2, )
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Relief From the Final Judgment and for Reconsideration of the Final Judgment. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 12/11/2017. (athom, )
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/5/2017. I respectfully RECOMMEND that Plaintiff's Second MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for Order to Show Cause 14 be DENIED without prejudice; and that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 12 be DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Younger v. Harris, 401 U.S. 37 (1971). (nywlc2, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ziankovich v. Large et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Youras Ziankovich
Represented By: Youras Ziankovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryon M. Large
Represented By: LeeAnn Morrill
Represented By: Grant T. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C. Coyle
Represented By: LeeAnn Morrill
Represented By: Grant T. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?