El Paso Glass Company, Inc. v. David Boland, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: El Paso Glass Company, Inc.
Defendant: David Boland, Inc. and Western Surety Company
Case Number: 1:2017cv02072
Filed: August 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Scott T. Varholak
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Pursuant to the #23 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Action With Prejudice, this case is DISMISSED, each party to pay its own attorney fees and costs. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/30/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
August 30, 2018 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Action by Plaintiff El Paso Glass Company, Inc.. (Baumchen, Colin)
July 31, 2018 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff El Paso Glass Company, Inc.. (Baumchen, Colin)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting Defendants' Request for Stay. The Court GRANTS Defendants' Alternative Motion to Stay this Case. (Doc. #10 .) All deadlines in this case are STAYED pending completion of the parties' contractually-mandated mediation procedures. The Clerk of the Court shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2. Within 7 days of the completion of the parties contractually-mandated mediation procedures, the parties are DIRECTED to file a notice in this Court informing the Court of the outcome of those procedures and requesting either that this case be dismissed or reopened. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/30/2018. (athom, )
March 1, 2018 Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/1/2018. Status Conference set for 5/2/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: STV - C203. (morti, )
November 22, 2017 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint or Alternatively To Stay this Action filed by Defendants David Boland, Inc., Western Surety Company. (Quiat, Laurin)
November 8, 2017 Filing 18 BRIEF in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint or Alternatively To Stay this Action filed by Plaintiff El Paso Glass Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Affidavit Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit B-1)(Baumchen, Colin)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines Pending Determination of Defendants Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint or Alternatively to Stay this Action. This matter is set for a Status Conference on 3/1/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/01/2017. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #11 Joint MOTION to Vacate #6 Order JOINT MOTION TO VACATE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES PENDING DETERMINATION OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT OR ALTERNATIVELY TO STAY THIS ACTION filed by El Paso Glass Company, Inc.. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/1/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/1/2017. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
November 1, 2017 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #13 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 17-cv-02072-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
November 1, 2017 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff El Paso Glass Company, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Baumchen, Colin)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER. The Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2017 10:00 AM, and associated deadlines, are VACATED to be reset, if necessary, upon resolution of #11 Joint Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference and Related Deadlines Pending Determination of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The parties shall complete and file the Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form on or before 11/01/2017. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 10/26/2017. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
October 26, 2017 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Vacate #6 Order JOINT MOTION TO VACATE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES PENDING DETERMINATION OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT OR ALTERNATIVELY TO STAY THIS ACTION by Plaintiff El Paso Glass Company, Inc.. (Baumchen, Colin)
October 18, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint or Alternatively To Stay this Action by Defendants David Boland, Inc., Western Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Quiat, Laurin)
October 4, 2017 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against David Boland, Inc., Western Surety Company, filed by El Paso Glass Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(George, Kory)
October 4, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiff El Paso Glass Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redline Amended Complaint)(George, Kory)
September 12, 2017 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by El Paso Glass Company, Inc.. David Boland, Inc. served on 9/6/2017, answer due 9/27/2017; Western Surety Company served on 9/5/2017, answer due 9/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service on Western Surety)(George, Kory)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 11/15/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 11/1/2017. (jgonz, )
August 30, 2017 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
August 30, 2017 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to David Boland, Inc. and Western Surety Company re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff El Paso Glass Company, Inc.. (Baumchen, Colin)
August 29, 2017 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (dbera, )
August 29, 2017 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
August 29, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-5685059)Attorney Kory Douglas George added to party United States ex rel. El Paso Glass Company, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by United States ex rel. El Paso Glass Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(George, Kory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: El Paso Glass Company, Inc. v. David Boland, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: El Paso Glass Company, Inc.
Represented By: Colin P. Baumchen
Represented By: Kory Douglas George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Boland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?