Wisehart v. Wisehart et al
Plaintiff: Arthur Mckee Wisehart
Defendant: Arthur Dodson Wisehart, Wisehart Springs Inn, Charles Winston Wisehart, Arthur Wisehart and Art Wisehart
Case Number: 1:2018cv00021
Filed: January 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Presiding Judge: Nina Y. Wang
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTIONS FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE AND FOR RECONSIDERATION AND ENTERING JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS entered by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/14/2020. Granting in part and denying in part 206 Motio n for Order. Granting in part and denying in part 209 Motion to Vacate. Accordingly, the Court grants summary judgment to the Defendants on all claims in this case. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of the Defendants on all claims and shall close this case. (rkeec)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 196 OPINION AND ORDER denying 127 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/5/19. (dkals, )
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Esther Salas on 1/3/18. (cm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 1/4/2018.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wisehart v. Wisehart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Mckee Wisehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Dodson Wisehart
Represented By: Mark Apelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisehart Springs Inn
Represented By: Mark Apelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Winston Wisehart
Represented By: Mark Apelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Wisehart
Represented By: Mark Apelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Art Wisehart
Represented By: Mark Apelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?