Arctic Energy Services, LLC v. Neal et al

Plaintiff: Arctic Energy Services, LLC
Defendant: Dustin Neal, Dustin Ailport and Water Way Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00108
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1836
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2018 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 08/14/2018, re: 96 Arctic Energy Services, LLC's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Denial of its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. (sphil, )
June 28, 2018 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 06/28/2018, re: 57 Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Dustin Ailport and Water Way Solutions, LLC is DENIED. (sphil)
February 22, 2018 45 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/22/2018. ORDERED that this order will remain in effect pending final disposition of plaintiff's lawsuit or further order of this Court. (sphil, ) Modified on 2/22/2018 to add docket text. (sphil, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arctic Energy Services, LLC v. Neal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arctic Energy Services, LLC
Represented By: Jon Jay Olafson
Represented By: Alice Conway Powers
Represented By: Jill Marie Szewczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Neal
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Holscher
Represented By: Rick L. Koehmstedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Ailport
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Holscher
Represented By: Rick L. Koehmstedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Water Way Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Holscher
Represented By: Rick L. Koehmstedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?