Trimarco v. Ergen

Plaintiff: Michael C Trimarco
Defendant: Charles E. Ergen, III
Case Number: 1:2018cv00170
Filed: January 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12:1821
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/9/2019, re: 37 parties' Joint Stipulated Motion to Restrict Access is GRANTED; 41 Motion for Leave to Restrict is DENIED without prejudice; 43 defendant's Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 and 28 U.S.C. § 1927 is DENIED; 48 defendant's Request for Ruling on Motion for Sanctions is DENIED as moot. ORDERED that, within fourteen days of this order, the parties shall file eit her (1) redacted versions of the Albee declaration [Docket No. 38-6], the exhibits attached to the Albee Declaration [Docket Nos. 38-7, 38-8, 38-9, 38-10, 38-11, 38-12, 38-13], and Exhibits B and C to the Trimarco declaration [Docket Nos. 38-3, 38-4], or (2) a renewed motion to restrict explaining why such redaction is impracticable. (sphil, ) Modified on 1/9/2019 to correct docket text. (sphil, ).
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 05/17/2018. ORDERED that, on or before 5:00 p.m. on May 30, 2018, plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs' Second MOTION for Leave to Respond to 32 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Response, filed by Michael C Trimarco 29 is GRANTED. ORDERED that plaintiff 's response to the Court's show cause order shallspecifically address the impact of the following evidence on the Court's determination of defendant's domicile: (1) defendant's residency at the same address in Switzerland sin ce 2009; (2) defendant's possession of a Swiss residency card since 2009; (3) defendants possession of a Swiss driver's license since 2009; (4) defendant's renunciation of U.S. citizenship in 2011; and (5) the suggestion, in the 2016 letter restoring defendant's U.S. citizenship, that defendant sought restoration of his U.S. citizenship in order to visit his ailing grandmother. (sphil, )
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 04/16/2018. ORDERED that, on or before 5:00 p.m. on April 20, 2018, plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to the Courts lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trimarco v. Ergen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C Trimarco
Represented By: Howard Kleinhendler
Represented By: Jocelyn Meredith Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles E. Ergen, III
Represented By: Hugh Q. Gottschalk
Represented By: Brett Michelle Mull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?