Continental Casualty Company v. Kidney Real Estate Associates of Arvada, LLC

Petitioner: Continental Casualty Company
Respondent: Kidney Real Estate Associates of Arvada, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00551
Filed: March 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Affirming the 35 February 22, 2019 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge and Granting Petitioner's 1 Petition to Appoint Umpire. Neil Mekelburg of Pie Consulting & Engineering is appointed umpire for purposes of the parties' dispute over the property appraisal at issue. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 03/13/2019. (athom, )
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 1 MOTION for Order to by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/22/19. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that the Petition 1 be GRANTED and that Neil Mekelburg of Pie Consulting & Engineering be appointed as umpire with respect to the insurance policy appraisal provision applicable to this case. (lgale, )
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/30/2018. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Respondents Motion to Dismiss 11 be DENIED. (jgonz, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Continental Casualty Company v. Kidney Real Estate Associates of Arvada, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Continental Casualty Company
Represented By: Brendan O'Rourke Powers
Represented By: Priscilla Tomescu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kidney Real Estate Associates of Arvada, LLC
Represented By: David Jeffrey Furtado
Represented By: Rodney Joseph Monheit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?