Handy et al v. Board of County Commissioners for the County of Jefferson et al
Plaintiff: Wyatt T. Handy, Jr. and Ashlee M. Handy
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners for the County of Jefferson, Tera L. Fisher and Brandon H. Johnson
Case Number: 1:2018cv00789
Filed: April 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Gordon P. Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER denying 122 Motion to Alter or Amend a Judgment by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/1/20.(jdyne, )
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 80 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/28/20.(jdyne, )
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER DENYING 90 Motion for Discovery. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is DENIED. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/6/2020. (skclc2)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING 94 Motion to Strike 92 Plaintiffs' Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. The Motion [# 94 ] is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Response to the Motion for Summary Judgment [# 92 ] is STRICKEN. IT IS FURTHER ORD ERED that Plaintiffs shall have until December 23, 2019 to file a response to the motion for summary judgment that complies with Judge Jacksons Practice Standards and the Local Rules. Plaintiffs are warned that failure to file a response that complies with Local Rule of Practice 10.1 and Judge Jackson's practice standards may result in the response being summarily stricken without leave to refile. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 12/12/2019. (skclc2)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 76 Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel Discovery. The Motion is GRANTED IN PART to the extent that Defendant Fisher shall supplement her response to Interrogatory No. 14 in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 33(d) by either (a) ascertaining the answer to No. 14 by her review of the applicable records she mentioned, or, assuming the burden of deriving or ascertaining the answer will be substantially the same for either party, (b) specifying th e records (by bates number) that must be reviewed and giving Plaintiffs a reasonable opportunity to examine those records to the extent not already produced. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 33(d). Defendant Fisher's supplemental response shall be serv ed on Plaintiffs no later than November 25, 2020.The Motion is DENIED IN PART to the extent that no additional response is required by Defendants to Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 4, and 5, and Requests for Production Nos. 15, 16, and 23.3. Finally, the Motion is DENIED IN PART to the extent it seeks leave to request the additional information discussed above. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/14/2019. (skclc2)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER adopting 45 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to Dismiss by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/27/19. (jdyne, )
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 3/4/19 re 31 Defendants MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint [Doc. No. 9] filed by Brandon H. Johnson, Tera L. Fisher. The Court RECOMMENDS that Defenda nts Fisher and Johnsons Motion to Dismiss [ECF. #31] be GRANTED in part, to the extent it seeks dismissal of Plaintiffs Fourteenth Amendment Equal Protection claims against Defendants in their individual and official capacities, and the Fourth Amendment official capacity claims against Defendants, and DENIED in part, to the extent it seeks dismissal of the Plaintiffs Fourth Amendment individual capacity claims against Defendants. (nmarb, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handy et al v. Board of County Commissioners for the County of Jefferson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyatt T. Handy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashlee M. Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners for the County of Jefferson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tera L. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon H. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?