Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC v. Charter Communications,Inc.
Plaintiff: Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC
Defendant: Charter Communications,Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC and Time Warner Cable, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01345
Filed: June 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/31/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (jgonz, )
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Charter Communications,Inc. answer due 8/17/2018; Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC answer due 8/17/2018. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/26/2018. (jgonz, )
July 25, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Thomas Lee Duston on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Thomas Lee Duston added to party Charter Communications,Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Lee Duston added to party Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC(pty:dft) (Duston, Thomas)
July 16, 2018 Filing 15 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants Charter Communications,Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Seedorf, Kyle)
June 22, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Charter Communications,Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. Charter Communications,Inc. answer due 7/16/2018; Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC answer due 7/16/2018. (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 11, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Reza Mirzaie on behalf of Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLCAttorney Reza Mirzaie added to party Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC(pty:pla) (Mirzaie, Reza)
June 11, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marc Aaron Fenster on behalf of Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLCAttorney Marc Aaron Fenster added to party Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC(pty:pla) (Fenster, Marc)
June 11, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jay Young Chung on behalf of Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLCAttorney Jay Young Chung added to party Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC(pty:pla) (Chung, Jay)
June 11, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Philip X. Wang on behalf of Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLCAttorney Philip X. Wang added to party Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC(pty:pla) (Wang, Philip)
June 6, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC. Charter Communications,Inc. served on 6/4/2018, answer due 6/25/2018; Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC served on 6/4/2018, answer due 6/25/2018. (Fenster, Eric)
June 4, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, )
June 4, 2018 Filing 7 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (dbera, )
June 1, 2018 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
June 1, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Charter Communications, Inc. and Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC. (Fenster, Eric)
June 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Eric Bryan Fenster on behalf of Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC (Fenster, Eric)
June 1, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE re #1 Complaint, AO 120 by Plaintiff Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC (Fenster, Eric)
June 1, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Fenster, Eric)
June 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Charter Communications,Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6132582)Attorney Eric Bryan Fenster added to party Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Fenster, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC v. Charter Communications,Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications,Inc.
Represented By: Kyle Paul Seedorf
Represented By: Thomas Lee Duston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC
Represented By: Kyle Paul Seedorf
Represented By: Thomas Lee Duston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle Paul Seedorf
Represented By: Thomas Lee Duston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Realtime Adaptive Streaming, LLC
Represented By: Eric Bryan Fenster
Represented By: Jay Young Chung
Represented By: Philip X. Wang
Represented By: Marc Aaron Fenster
Represented By: Reza Mirzaie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?