Colorado Farm Bureau Insurance Company v. AGCO Corporation
Plaintiff: Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: AGCO Corporation
Case Number: 1:2018cv01847
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/17/2018. Scheduling Conference set 9/20/2018 is vacated and reset for 9/28/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/17/2018. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
August 31, 2018 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-01847-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER re: #16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/31/2018. Parties do not consent. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). (tsher, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 16 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Poppe, Nicholas)
August 29, 2018 Filing 15 Defendant AGCO Corporation's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Jury Demand by AGCO Corporation.(Lund, Eric)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/15/2018. AGCO Corporation answer due 8/29/2018. (mdave, )
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 08/15/2018. Consent Form due by 9/4/2018. (mdave, )
August 14, 2018 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant AGCO Corporation. (Lund, Eric)
August 14, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Eric T. Lund by Eric T. Lund on behalf of AGCO CorporationAttorney Eric T. Lund added to party AGCO Corporation(pty:dft) (Lund, Eric)
August 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Joan S. Allgaier by Joan S. Allgaier on behalf of AGCO CorporationAttorney Joan S. Allgaier added to party AGCO Corporation(pty:dft) (Allgaier, Joan)
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Kenneth H. Lyman by Kenneth H. Lyman on behalf of AGCO CorporationAttorney Kenneth H. Lyman added to party AGCO Corporation(pty:dft) (Lyman, Kenneth)
July 31, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. AGCO Corporation served on 7/25/2018, answer due 8/15/2018. (Mayer, Ellis)
July 24, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tsher, )
July 23, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to AGCO CORPORATION by Plaintiff Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Mayer, Ellis)
July 23, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Ellis J. Mayer by Ellis Jay Mayer on behalf of Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Ellis Jay Mayer added to party Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company(pty:pla) (Mayer, Ellis)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/23/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2018 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No summons issued. (rvill, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against AGCO Corporation (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6206446)Attorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party Colorado Farm Bureau Insurance Company, A/S/O Diamond A Farms, a Colorado Corporation(pty:pla), filed by Colorado Farm Bureau Insurance Company, A/S/O Diamond A Farms, a Colorado Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Poppe, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colorado Farm Bureau Insurance Company v. AGCO Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGCO Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth H. Lyman
Represented By: Eric T. Lund
Represented By: Joan S. Allgaier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Represented By: Ellis Jay Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?