Mincic v. BNSF Railway Company
Plaintiff: Francis C. Mincic
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01931
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Amended ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/19/2018 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 09/19/2018. (ksena)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Conference/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline For Filing of Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent To United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction set for 9/25/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/01/2018. (ksena,)
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNSF Railway Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6221392)Attorney Shawn M. Sassaman added to party Francis C. Mincic(pty:pla), filed by Francis C. Mincic. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Sassaman, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mincic v. BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis C. Mincic
Represented By: Shawn M. Sassaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?