Zachary Collins v. University of Colorado Medical Center Aurora Central et al
Plaintiff: Zachary Collins
Defendant: University of Colorado Medical Center Aurora Central and Medical Center of Aurora, The
Case Number: 1:2018cv01939
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 13 JUDGMENT re: #12 Order of Dismissal by Clerk on 9/14/2018. (angar, )
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of Dismissal. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/14/2018. (angar, )
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiency within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/31/2018. (angar, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:18-cv-01087. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
July 30, 2018 Filing 10 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge David O. Carter transferring case to DISTRICT OF COLORADO. Original file electronically sent. The Court further declines to rule on Plaintiffs IFP application to allow the Colorado federal court to evaluate its merits. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2018.]
July 20, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Order to Show Cause #6 filed by Plaintiff Zachary Collins (es) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Plaintiffs response to this order (not to exceed five pages) will be due by July 20. Alternatively, if Plaintiff acknowledges that he cannot maintain the action in this California federal court, he can voluntarily dismiss the action without prejudice and without further consequence on his own. A notice of dismissal filed by July 20 will serve to discharge this order. (See Minute Order for further details) re: APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 (vm) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 3 APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Short Form) filed by Plaintiff Zachary Collins. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Zachary Collins. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants The Medical Center of Aurora, University of Colorado Medical Center Aurora Central. Case assigned to Judge David O. Carter for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Zachary Collins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (et) [Transferred from California Central on 7/31/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zachary Collins v. University of Colorado Medical Center Aurora Central et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Colorado Medical Center Aurora Central
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Center of Aurora, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?