Keyes v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Honey Keyes
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 1:2018cv01966
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/26/2018 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/15/18. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
August 10, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Affiirmative Defenses by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The.(Walls, William)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: This matter comes before the Court sua sponte. The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. The parties are directed to jointly contact Chambers by telephone at (303) 844-4694 or by email at Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to obtain a scheduling conference date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/8/18. (rbjsec.)
August 7, 2018 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #12 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-01966-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
August 7, 2018 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
August 3, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David M. Roth on behalf of Honey KeyesAttorney David M. Roth added to party Honey Keyes(pty:pla) (Roth, David)
August 3, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Samuel Frank Mitchell on behalf of Honey KeyesAttorney Samuel Frank Mitchell added to party Honey Keyes(pty:pla) (Mitchell, Samuel)
August 2, 2018 Filing 9 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (dbera, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (dbera, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. By ShayKara Whitaker, District Court Judge, Douglas County on 07/29/2018.(dbera, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet upon Registered Agent The Division of Insurance on 07/06/2018 (dbera, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The, filed by Honey Keyes.(dbera, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy M. Samberg on behalf of The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance CompanyAttorney Amy M. Samberg added to party The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Samberg, Amy)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Other Affiliate The Travelers Indemnity Company, Other Affiliate Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Other Affiliate Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Walls, William)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company from Douglas County District Court, Case Number 2018CV30608. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6227487), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint - State, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet - State, #3 Exhibit C - Summons - State, #4 Exhibit D - Return of Service - State, #5 Exhibit E - Register of Action - State, #6 Exhibit F - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time - State, #7 Exhibit G - Entry of Appearance - State, #8 Exhibit H - Order Granting Motion - State, #9 Exhibit I - Periodic Report, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walls, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keyes v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Honey Keyes
Represented By: David M. Roth
Represented By: Samuel Frank Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Amy M. Samberg
Represented By: William Ryan Walls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?