Gonzalez v. Jefferson County et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Gonzalez
Defendant: Robert Reardon, Monica Albers, Jeff Shrader and Jefferson County
Case Number: 1:2018cv01998
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Filing 11 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #6 Order on Motion for Order, Addressed to Raymond Gonzalez. (evana, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #4 MOTION for Order to Addressed to Raymond Gonzalez. (evana, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #5 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Addressed to Raymond Gonzalez. (evana, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Addressed to Raymond Gonzalez. (evana, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Raymond Gonzalez. (evana, )
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff shall have up to and including October 5, 2018, to cure the remaining deficiencies. Plaintiff is reminded that the action will be dismissed without further notice if he fails to cure the remaining deficiencies within the time allowed. Plaintiff's request for appointment of counsel (ECF No. #4 ) is denied as premature, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/7/2018. (angar, ) Forms mailed as Ordered
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action, by Plaintiff Raymond Gonzalez. (angar, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 Letter re: MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Raymond Gonzalez. (angar, )
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies. If Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/7/2018. (angar, )
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Monica Albers, Jefferson County, Robert Reardon, Jeff Shrader, filed by Raymond Gonzalez.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Jefferson County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Reardon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Albers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Shrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?