Morales Sarabia v. Garibaldi Ramirez et al
Plaintiff: Grace Del Carmen Morales Sarabia
Defendant: Sergio Garibaldi Ramirez and Canterbury Park MHC, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02128
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Canterbury Park MHC, LLC.(Murphy, Timothy)
October 9, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #10 Order Setting Scheduling Conference, 23 Order, to Sergio Garibaldi Ramirez, 2529 Swale Run, Colorado Springs, CO 80916. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER: The Clerk is directed to send the #10 Order to Defendant Sergio Garibaldi Ramirez. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/9/2018. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2 )
October 4, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Defendant's Information, by Defendant Sergio Garibaldi Ramirez (angar, )
September 28, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Gillian Dale on behalf of Canterbury Park MHC, LLCAttorney Gillian Dale added to party Canterbury Park MHC, LLC(pty:dft) (Dale, Gillian)
September 28, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sergio Garibaldi Ramirez.(evana, )
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Canterbury Park MHC, LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint no later than 10/11/2018. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/28/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
September 27, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM regarding #17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand filed by Canterbury Park MHC, LLC. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/27/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 27, 2018 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand by Defendant Canterbury Park MHC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Murphy, Timothy)
September 26, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grace Del Carmen Morales Sarabia. Canterbury Park MHC, LLC served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (Gilman, Ryan)
September 26, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grace Del Carmen Morales Sarabia. Sergio Garibaldi Ramirez served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (Gilman, Ryan)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph Anthony O'Keefe terminated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/25/18. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM regarding #11 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Joseph A. O'Keefe's Withdraw of Appearance filed by Grace Del Carmen Morales Sarabia, #12 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Joseph A. O'Keefe's Motion to Withdraw of Appearance filed by Grace Del Carmen Morales Sarabia. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge William J. Martinez on 9/25/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Joseph A. O'Keefe's Motion to Withdraw of Appearance by Plaintiff Grace Del Carmen Morales Sarabia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(O'Keefe, Joseph)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Joseph A. O'Keefe's Withdraw of Appearance by Plaintiff Grace Del Carmen Morales Sarabia. (O'Keefe, Joseph) Modified on 9/25/2018 to terminate (jgonz, ).
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/5/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 09/20/2018. (ksena)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued by Clerk on 8/27/2018 (Attachments: #1 Summons) (angar, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Sergio Garibaldi Ramirez and Canterbury Park, MHC, LLC by Plaintiff Grace Del Carmen Morales Sarabia. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons)(Gilman, Ryan)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 Administrative Notice: The summons submitted will not be issued. A summons that is addressed to multiple defendants - must be issued for each defendant to be served. Please file completed summons for each defendant for issuance using the event Summons Request (Text Only Entry) (angar, )
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2017 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/ 22/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/22/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Sergio Garibaldi Ramirez and Canterbury Park, MHC, LLC by Plaintiff Grace Del Carmen Morales Sarabia. (Gilman, Ryan)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (cmadr, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Canterbury Park MHC, LLC, Sergio Garibaldi-Ramirez (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6258709)Attorney Ryan Charles Gilman added to party Grace Del Carmen Morales-Sarabia(pty:pla), filed by Grace Del Carmen Morales-Sarabia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Gilman, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales Sarabia v. Garibaldi Ramirez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Del Carmen Morales Sarabia
Represented By: Ryan Charles Gilman
Represented By: Joseph Anthony O'Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Garibaldi Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canterbury Park MHC, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Michael Murphy
Represented By: Gillian Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?