Martinez et al v. Stevens et al
Plaintiff: Johnn A. Vidmar, Eugene Martinez and Joshua Gram
Defendant: Estep, Stevens, Soto and Waters
Case Number: 1:2018cv02160
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. If Mr. Martinez fails to file an amended complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed in part without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/4/2018. (angar, )
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #7 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/3/2018. (angar, )
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to Dismiss in Part. Plaintiffs Joshua Gram and Johnn A. Vidmar are dismissed without prejudice as parties to this action pursuant to Rule 41(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure because they failed to prosecute and cure the deficiencies as directed within the time allowed, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/2/2018. (angar, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, and MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, by Plaintiff Eugene Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(evana, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 7 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Eugene Martinez. (evana, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #1 Complaint, 2 Case Assigned to Judge, #3 Notice (Other) Addressed to Joshua Gram. (angar, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER by Plaintiff Eugene Martinez. (angar, )
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiffs to Cure Deficiencies. If any Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, that Plaintiff will be dismissed as a party to this action without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/24/2018. (angar, )
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE Re: Law Library at CSP Not Giving Access by Plaintiffs Joshua Gram, Eugene Martinez, Johnn A. Vidmar (dbera, )
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Estep, Soto, Stevens, Waters, filed by Eugene Martinez, Johnn A. Vidmar, Joshua Gram. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dbera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. Stevens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnn A. Vidmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Gram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?