Integrity Applied Science, Inc. v. Clearpoint Chemicals LLC
Plaintiff: Integrity Applied Science, Inc.
Defendant: Clearpoint Chemicals LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv02235
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/18/2018. (bwilk, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 18 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 10/18/2018 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Fact Discovery due 5/19/2019. Expert Discovery due 8/19/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 9/16/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall file their proposed order, and include a courtesy copy of the proposed order in a Word format sentby email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the conference. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (bwilk, )
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/18/2018. (bwilk, )
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM regarding #15 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Clearpoint Chemicals LLC and filed by Integrity Applied Science, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/18/18. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
October 18, 2018 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Clearpoint Chemicals LLC and by Plaintiff Integrity Applied Science, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Tamir)
October 4, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Clearpoint Chemicals LLC.(Felderman, Jacob)
October 4, 2018 Filing 13 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Integrity Applied Science, Inc.. (Goldstein, Tamir)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER construing #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond as the Parties one Stipulation for an extension of time pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(a). Defendant Clearpoint Chemicals LLC's answer or response is due by 10/4/2018. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/14/2018. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM regarding #10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Clearpoint Chemicals LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/14/18. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Clearpoint Chemicals LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Felderman, Jacob)
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Carla R. Martin on behalf of Integrity Applied Science, Inc.Attorney Carla R. Martin added to party Integrity Applied Science, Inc.(pty:pla) (Martin, Carla)
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Goldstein, Tamir)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Tamir I. Goldstein on behalf of Integrity Applied Science, Inc. (Goldstein, Tamir)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/18/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang, by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 9/10/2018. (jgonz, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Integrity Applied Science, Inc.. Clearpoint Chemicals LLC served on 8/30/2018, answer due 9/20/2018. (Goldstein, Tamir)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for non-dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. By Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 9/4/18. Text Only Entry (rkeec)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form). Modified on 8/30/2018 to correct docket entry (rsams, ).
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rsams, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Clearpoint Chemicals LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6272959)Attorney Tamir I. Goldstein added to party Integrity Applied Science, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Integrity Applied Science, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Goldstein, Tamir)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Integrity Applied Science, Inc. v. Clearpoint Chemicals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearpoint Chemicals LLC
Represented By: Jacob Robert Felderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integrity Applied Science, Inc.
Represented By: Tamir I. Goldstein
Represented By: Carla R. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?