EBBU, LLC v. Wendschuh et al

Petitioner: EBBU, LLC
Respondent: Doomawendschuh, LLC and Michael Wendschuh
Case Number: 1:2018cv02274
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 16 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case on 10/9/2018. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Petitioner EBBU, LLC (Shoemaker, Andrew)
October 3, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EBBU, LLC. Doomawendschuh, LLC served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018. (Shoemaker, Andrew)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Restrict. The Clerk of the Court is directed to maintain the restricted public access to #4 Restricted Document and #5 Restricted Document to Level 1 access only. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/26/2018. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Petitioner EBBU, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Shoemaker, Andrew)
September 11, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jgonz, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Doomawendschuh, LLC re #2 Exhibits, #1 Petition/Application, #4 Restricted Document - Level 1, #5 Restricted Document - Level 1, #3 Exhibits,, by Petitioner EBBU, LLC. (Shoemaker, Andrew)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Doomawendschuh, LLC re #2 Exhibits, #1 Petition/Application, #4 Restricted Document - Level 1, #5 Restricted Document - Level 1, #3 Exhibits,, by Petitioner EBBU, LLC. (Shoemaker, Andrew)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER. Status Conference set for 11/9/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall file the Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form on or before 10/26/2018. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/5/2018. Text Only Entry (stvlc2, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (dbera, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 5 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Exhibit by Petitioner EBBU, LLC.. (Shoemaker, Andrew) Modified on 9/11/2018 to add document description (jgonz, ).
September 4, 2018 Filing 4 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Exhibit by Petitioner EBBU, LLC.. (Shoemaker, Andrew) Modified on 9/11/2018 to add document description (jgonz, ).
September 4, 2018 Filing 3 Exhibits in Support of #1 Petition/Application Brief In Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration by Petitioner EBBU, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Brief In Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of J. Cooper, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of J. Cooper, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of J. Cooper, #5 Exhibit 2 to Brief In Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration, #6 Exhibit 3 to Brief In Support of Petition to Compel Arbitration)(Shoemaker, Andrew)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 Exhibits in Support of #1 Petition/Application to Compel Arbitration by Petitioner EBBU, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Petition to Compel Arbitration, #2 Exhibit B to Petition to Compel Arbitration)(Shoemaker, Andrew)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION to Compel Arbitration (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6278672)Attorney Andrew Ryan Shoemaker added to party EBBU, LLC(pty:pet), filed by EBBU, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shoemaker, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EBBU, LLC v. Wendschuh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Doomawendschuh, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Wendschuh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EBBU, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Ryan Shoemaker
Represented By: Christine K. Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?