Glenn v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Glenn
Defendant: Jacqueline Brown, John Cribari and Rick Raemisch
Case Number: 1:2018cv02307
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge signed only by Plaintiff Christopher Glenn. All parties consent. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nmarb, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #9 Amended Complaint, #8 Notice (Other) Addressed to Christopher Glenn. (sphil, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed Jacqueline Brown waiver sent on 10/16/2018, answer due 12/17/2018; John Cribari waiver sent on 10/16/2018, answer due 12/17/2018; Rick Raemisch waiver sent on 10/16/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (jgonz, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #9 Amended Complaint for Service of Process. (rvill, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER to Dismiss in Part and Draw Case, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/11/2018. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-2307-KLM (angar, )
October 10, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Plaintiff Christopher Glenn (jgonz, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Plaintiff Christopher Glenn (angar, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jacqueline Brown, John Cribari, Rick Raemisch, filed by Christopher Glenn.(evana, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing and Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Christopher Glenn (evana, )
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER. The Motion In Support of Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #6 ) is DENIED as moot. The Court granted Plaintiff leave to proceed under 28 U.S.C. 1915 on September 10, 2018 (ECF No. #4 ). The Court reminds Plaintiff of her outstanding obligations under the Order Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Prisoner Complaint entered September 11, 2018 (ECF No. #5 ), by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/19/2018. (angar, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION in Support of Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, by Plaintiff Christopher Glenn. (angar, )
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Prisoner Complaint that complies with this Order within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/11/2018. (angar, )
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #3 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/10/2018. (angar, ) copy sent to Denver County Jail
September 7, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, by Plaintiff Christopher Glenn. (rvill, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Jacqueline Brown, John Cribari and Rick Raemisch, filed by Christopher Glenn.(rvill, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2018: #1 Letter) (rvill, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glenn v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cribari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Raemisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?