Harris v. Falcon School District 49 et al
Plaintiff: William T. Harris, III
Defendant: Colorado High School Activities Association, Robert Hawkins, Paul Angelico, Paul Andersen, Falcon School District 49, Jared Felice and Sean Dorsey
Case Number: 1:2018cv02310
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Unopposed Motion for Administrative Stay. The Court directs that this case be administratively closed. The Court requests that the parties submit a joint status report by March 18, 2019. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/18/18. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to D.C.Colo.LCivR 41.2 re #6 Unopposed Motion for Administrative Stay. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02310-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Stay (Administrative) OF PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO D.C.COLO.LCIVR 41.2 by Plaintiff William T. Harris, III. (Swain, Hunter)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02310-KMT. (athom, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Paul Andersen, Paul Angelico, Colorado High School Activities Association, Sean Dorsey, Falcon School District 49, Jared Felice, Robert Hawkins (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6287764)Attorney Diane Smith King added to party William T. Harris, III(pty:pla), filed by William T. Harris, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Diane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Falcon School District 49 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado High School Activities Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Angelico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falcon School District 49
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Felice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William T. Harris, III
Represented By: Diane Smith King
Represented By: Hunter Anthony Swain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?