2430 South Havana, LLC v. Owners Insurance Company

Plaintiff: 2430 South Havana, LLC
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv02352
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: Colorado District Court
0 Judge: Michael E Hegarty
1 Judge: Marcia S Krieger
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 19, 2018 21 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/19/18. (dkals, )
October 18, 2018 20 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/18/2018. Discovery due by 6/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/19/2019. (tsher, )
October 18, 2018 19 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Scheduling Conference held on 10/18/2018. Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 6/18/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 7/19/2019. FTR: Courtroom A501. (mdave, )
October 17, 2018 18 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Owners Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Knight, Linda)
October 11, 2018 17 Proposed Scheduling Order AMENDED by Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (Knight, Linda)
October 11, 2018 16 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (Knight, Linda)
October 4, 2018 15 Defendant Owners Insurance Company's ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Owners Insurance Company.(Knight, Linda)
September 28, 2018 14 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Owners Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(Knight, Linda)
September 27, 2018 13 Featured Case ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond: Owners Insurance Company answer due 10/4/2018. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/27/18. Text Only Entry (msklc2, )
September 27, 2018 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #4 Complaint by Defendant Owners Insurance Company. (Knight, Linda)
September 24, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/24/18. Text Only Entry (pglov)
September 17, 2018 10 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/17/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2018 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (mdave, )
September 17, 2018 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher N. Mammel on behalf of 2430 South Havana, LLCAttorney Christopher N. Mammel added to party 2430 South Havana, LLC(pty:pla) (Mammel, Christopher)
September 17, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to:(1)Convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling Order, and resolve discovery matters;(2)ADR: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. Early Neutral Evaluation is approved. On the informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in a settlement conference conducted by the magistrate judge if the parties have engaged in an Early Neutral Evaluation and are unable to afford or otherwise attain private settlement assistance;(3)Hear and determine referred matters in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/17/18. Text Only Entry (msklc2, )
September 14, 2018 7 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (dbera, )
September 14, 2018 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (dbera, )
September 14, 2018 5 STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. By Elizabeth Beebe Volz, District Court Judge, Arapahoe County on 09/04/2018.(dbera, )
September 14, 2018 4 COMPLAINT to Compel Appraisal, for Breach of Contract, and For Statutory Relief against Owners Insurance Company, filed by 2430 South Havana, LLC.(dbera, )
September 14, 2018 3 Case assigned to Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
September 14, 2018 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Auto-Owners Insurance Company for Owners Insurance Company. (Ridley, Terence)
September 14, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Owners Insurance Company from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2018CV31655. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6295714), filed by Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Division of Insurance Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Articles of Organization, #3 Exhibit C - Email from Plaintiff's Counsel 9-7-18, #4 Exhibit D - Division of Insurance Producer Search, #5 Exhibit E - Pertinent Page from Plaintiff's Estimate, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #7 State Court - Complaint - 7-12-18, #8 State Court - Exhibit A to Complaint - 7-12-18, #9 State Court - Civil Case Cover Sheet - 7-12-18, #10 State Court - Delay Reduction Order - 7-12-18, #11 State Court - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time - 9-4-18, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Knight, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 2430 South Havana, LLC v. Owners Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda Jane Knight
Represented By: Terence M. Ridley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2430 South Havana, LLC
Represented By: Christopher N. Mammel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?