Zurich American Insurance Company et al v. Avila et al
Plaintiff: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company and Zurich American Insurance Company
Defendant: West Proline Logistic, Inc. and Adrian Avila
Case Number: 1:2018cv02390
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
2 Judge: Wiley Y Daniel
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Adrian Avila, West Proline Logistic, Inc., filed by Zurich American Insurance Company, American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company.(Smith, Bradford)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/22/18. Text Only Entry (pabsec)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/22/2018, re: #8 Response to Order to Show Cause, filed by Zurich American Insurance Company, American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company, #7 Order to Show Cause. ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause [Docket No. 7] is hereby discharged. ORDERED that, within five days of this order, plaintiffs shall file their First Amended Complaint. (sphil, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #7 by Plaintiffs American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Incorporation, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Smith, Bradford)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 10/02/2018. ORDERED that, on or before 5:00 p.m. on October 17, 2018, plaintiffs shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed due to the Court's lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (sphil, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #5 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02390-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (rkeec)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. (rkeec)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (rroge, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company, as Subrogee of Scott Transport, LLC, Zurich American Insurance Company, as Subrogee of Scott Transport, LLC (Smith, Bradford)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adrian Avila, West Proline Logistics, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6301810)Attorney Bradford Todd Smith added to party American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company, as Subrogee of Scott Transport, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Bradford Todd Smith added to party Zurich American Insurance Company, as Subrogee of Scott Transport, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Zurich American Insurance Company, as Subrogee of Scott Transport, LLC, American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company, as Subrogee of Scott Transport, LLC.(Smith, Bradford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurich American Insurance Company et al v. Avila et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Empire Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradford Todd Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradford Todd Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Proline Logistic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Avila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?