Anderson v. Chapin et al
Plaintiff: Jeanine Anderson
Defendant: Vicky Quinlin, Heath Becker, City of Brush, Dana Sherman, Dan Scalise, Marlene Baker, Robert Bo Chapin and Rick Bain
Case Number: 1:2018cv02392
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone on November 26, 2018, by Plaintiff Jeanine Anderson. (evana, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 16 REPLY to #7 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Rick Bain, Marlene Baker, Heath Becker, Robert Bo Chapin, City of Brush, Vicky Quinlin, Dan Scalise, Dana Sherman. (Kloster, Marni)
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Objection to #7 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Plaintiff Jeanine Anderson. (evana, )
October 2, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,, Morgan County District Court Register of Actions and Party Information by Defendants Rick Bain, Marlene Baker, Heath Becker, Robert Bo Chapin, City of Brush, Vicky Quinlin, Dan Scalise, Dana Sherman (Poppe, Nicholas)
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Rick Bain, Marlene Baker, Heath Becker, Robert Bo Chapin, City of Brush, Vicky Quinlin, Dan Scalise, Dana Sherman All parties do not consent.. (Poppe, Nicholas)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 11/26/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 9/26/2018. (jgonz, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM regarding #7 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Heath Becker, City of Brush, Robert Bo Chapin, Rick Bain, Vicky Quinlin, Marlene Baker, Dana Sherman, Dan Scalise. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/26/2018. Text Only Entry (ebuch)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/26/2018. (ebuch)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas Christaan Poppe on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party Rick Bain(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party Marlene Baker(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party Heath Becker(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party Robert Bo Chapin(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party City of Brush(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party Vicky Quinlin(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party Dan Scalise(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party Dana Sherman(pty:dft) (Poppe, Nicholas)
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint and Jury Demand by Rick Bain, Marlene Baker, Heath Becker, Robert Bo Chapin, City of Brush, Vicky Quinlin.(Kloster, Marni)
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Rick Bain, Marlene Baker, Heath Becker, Robert Bo Chapin, City of Brush, Vicky Quinlin, Dan Scalise, Dana Sherman. (Kloster, Marni)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Motion to Amend the original pleading per CRCP rule 15 (a) by District Court Morgan County Colorado Judge on 8/22/2018. (rroge, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Rule 57 upon Brush, Morgan CO on 7/26/2018 (rroge, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (rroge, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (rroge, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 Amended Pleading Rule 57 Review, Claims, & Prayer for Relief against Rick Bain, Marlene Baker, Heath Becker, Robert Bo Chapin, City of Brush, Vicky Quinlin, Dan Scalise, Dana Sherman, filed by Jeanine Anderson.(rroge, )
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Heath Becker, ROBERT BO CHAPIN, Marlene Baker, DANA SHERMAN, Brush, City of, DAN SCALISE, Rick Bain, Vicky Quinlin from Morgan County District Court, Case Number 18CV12. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6301859), filed by Heath Becker, ROBERT BO CHAPIN, Marlene Baker, DANA SHERMAN, Brush, City of, DAN SCALISE, Rick Bain, Vicky Quinlin. (Attachments: #1 State Court; Amended Complaint, #2 State Court; Summons, #3 State Court; Affidavit of Service, #4 State Court; Order Granting Motion to Amend, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Kloster, Marni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Chapin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanine Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicky Quinlin
Represented By: Marni Nathan Kloster
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heath Becker
Represented By: Marni Nathan Kloster
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Brush
Represented By: Marni Nathan Kloster
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Sherman
Represented By: Marni Nathan Kloster
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Scalise
Represented By: Marni Nathan Kloster
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlene Baker
Represented By: Marni Nathan Kloster
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bo Chapin
Represented By: Marni Nathan Kloster
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Bain
Represented By: Marni Nathan Kloster
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?